EP1648440 - SEMI-SOLID FORMULATIONS FOR THE ORAL ADMINISTRATION OF TAXOIDS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.01.2009 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.11.2010 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): GR | published on 15.12.2010 [2010/50] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Aventis Pharma S.A. 20, avenue Raymond Aron 92160 Antony / FR | [2006/17] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BOROVAC, Tatiana 22 rue Sadi Carnot F-92120 Montrouge / FR | 02 /
NEVES, Carole 13C avenue du Docteur Arnold Netter F-75012 Paris / FR | 03 /
PERACCHIA, Maria-Teresa 18 rue Cuvier F-75005 Paris / FR | [2006/17] | Representative(s) | Le Pennec, Magali, et al Aventis Pharma S.A. Direction des Brevets Tri LEO/144 20 Avenue Raymond Aron 92165 Antony Cedex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2008/30] | Le Pennec, Magali, et al Aventis Pharma S.A. Direction des Brevets Tri LEO/144 20 Avenue Raymond Aron 92165 Antony Cedex / FR | ||
Former [2006/17] | Le Pennec, Magali, et al Aventis Pharma S.A. Brevets 20, Avenue Raymond Aron F-92165 Antony Cédex / FR | Application number, filing date | 04741331.5 | 15.07.2004 | [2006/17] | WO2004EP08551 | Priority number, date | EP20030291795 | 18.07.2003 Original published format: EP 03291795 | [2006/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005013968 | Date: | 17.02.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/07] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1648440 | Date: | 26.04.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.02.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/17] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1648440 | Date: | 12.03.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/11] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 17.02.2005 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/337, A61K9/48 | [2006/17] | CPC: |
A61K9/4858 (EP,US);
A61K31/337 (EP,KR,US);
A61K9/107 (KR);
A61K9/48 (KR);
A61P35/00 (EP);
A61K9/1075 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/17] | Extension states | AL | 20.02.2006 | HR | 20.02.2006 | LT | 20.02.2006 | LV | 20.02.2006 | MK | 20.02.2006 | Title | German: | HALBFESTE FORMULIERUNG FÜR DIE ORALE VERABREICHUNG DES TAXOLS | [2006/17] | English: | SEMI-SOLID FORMULATIONS FOR THE ORAL ADMINISTRATION OF TAXOIDS | [2006/17] | French: | FORMULATION SEMI-SOLIDE POUR L'ADMINISTRATION ORALE DU TAXOL | [2006/17] | Entry into regional phase | 20.02.2006 | National basic fee paid | 20.02.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.02.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.02.2005 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 20.02.2006 | Examination requested [2006/17] | 31.05.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.09.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.12.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.01.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 29.01.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 15.12.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/08] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.07.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 12.03.2008 | CZ | 12.03.2008 | EE | 12.03.2008 | FI | 12.03.2008 | PL | 12.03.2008 | RO | 12.03.2008 | SI | 12.03.2008 | SK | 12.03.2008 | TR | 12.03.2008 | BG | 12.06.2008 | GR | 13.06.2008 | LU | 15.07.2008 | CH | 31.07.2008 | LI | 31.07.2008 | MC | 31.07.2008 | HU | 13.09.2008 | [2010/50] |
Former [2010/38] | CY | 12.03.2008 | |
CZ | 12.03.2008 | ||
EE | 12.03.2008 | ||
FI | 12.03.2008 | ||
PL | 12.03.2008 | ||
RO | 12.03.2008 | ||
SI | 12.03.2008 | ||
SK | 12.03.2008 | ||
TR | 12.03.2008 | ||
BG | 12.06.2008 | ||
LU | 15.07.2008 | ||
CH | 31.07.2008 | ||
LI | 31.07.2008 | ||
MC | 31.07.2008 | ||
HU | 13.09.2008 | ||
Former [2010/34] | CY | 12.03.2008 | |
CZ | 12.03.2008 | ||
EE | 12.03.2008 | ||
FI | 12.03.2008 | ||
PL | 12.03.2008 | ||
RO | 12.03.2008 | ||
SI | 12.03.2008 | ||
SK | 12.03.2008 | ||
BG | 12.06.2008 | ||
LU | 15.07.2008 | ||
CH | 31.07.2008 | ||
LI | 31.07.2008 | ||
MC | 31.07.2008 | ||
HU | 13.09.2008 | ||
Former [2010/33] | CY | 12.03.2008 | |
CZ | 12.03.2008 | ||
EE | 12.03.2008 | ||
FI | 12.03.2008 | ||
PL | 12.03.2008 | ||
RO | 12.03.2008 | ||
SI | 12.03.2008 | ||
SK | 12.03.2008 | ||
BG | 12.06.2008 | ||
LU | 15.07.2008 | ||
CH | 31.07.2008 | ||
LI | 31.07.2008 | ||
MC | 31.07.2008 | ||
Former [2009/44] | CY | 12.03.2008 | |
CZ | 12.03.2008 | ||
EE | 12.03.2008 | ||
FI | 12.03.2008 | ||
PL | 12.03.2008 | ||
RO | 12.03.2008 | ||
SI | 12.03.2008 | ||
SK | 12.03.2008 | ||
BG | 12.06.2008 | ||
CH | 31.07.2008 | ||
LI | 31.07.2008 | ||
MC | 31.07.2008 | ||
Former [2009/30] | CZ | 12.03.2008 | |
EE | 12.03.2008 | ||
FI | 12.03.2008 | ||
PL | 12.03.2008 | ||
RO | 12.03.2008 | ||
SI | 12.03.2008 | ||
SK | 12.03.2008 | ||
BG | 12.06.2008 | ||
CH | 31.07.2008 | ||
LI | 31.07.2008 | ||
MC | 31.07.2008 | ||
Former [2009/23] | CZ | 12.03.2008 | |
EE | 12.03.2008 | ||
FI | 12.03.2008 | ||
PL | 12.03.2008 | ||
RO | 12.03.2008 | ||
SI | 12.03.2008 | ||
SK | 12.03.2008 | ||
BG | 12.06.2008 | ||
MC | 31.07.2008 | ||
Former [2009/22] | CZ | 12.03.2008 | |
EE | 12.03.2008 | ||
FI | 12.03.2008 | ||
PL | 12.03.2008 | ||
RO | 12.03.2008 | ||
SI | 12.03.2008 | ||
SK | 12.03.2008 | ||
MC | 31.07.2008 | ||
Former [2009/18] | CZ | 12.03.2008 | |
FI | 12.03.2008 | ||
PL | 12.03.2008 | ||
RO | 12.03.2008 | ||
SI | 12.03.2008 | ||
SK | 12.03.2008 | ||
MC | 31.07.2008 | ||
Former [2008/50] | CZ | 12.03.2008 | |
FI | 12.03.2008 | ||
PL | 12.03.2008 | ||
RO | 12.03.2008 | ||
SI | 12.03.2008 | ||
SK | 12.03.2008 | ||
Former [2008/44] | FI | 12.03.2008 | |
PL | 12.03.2008 | ||
SI | 12.03.2008 | ||
Former [2008/43] | FI | 12.03.2008 | |
PL | 12.03.2008 | ||
Former [2008/39] | FI | 12.03.2008 | Cited in | International search | [DXY]WO9949848 (RTP PHARMA INC [US]) [DX] 1-3,5-8 * page 4, line 27 * * page 7, line 18 - line 23 * * page 5, line 21 - line 27 * * examples 1-6 * * claims 1-21 * [Y] 4; | [A]WO0130319 (SUPERGEN INC [US], et al) [A] 1-3,5-8 * examples 1-5 * * claims 1-5 *; | [A]WO02064132 (UPJOHN CO [US], et al) [A] 1-3,5-8 * page 7, line 26 * * claims 1-8 *; | [A]WO03045357 (TRANSFORM PHARMACEUTICALS INC [US], et al) [A] 1-8 * claims 1,19 * * page 27, line 9 *; | [PX]WO03074027 (NOVAGALI SAS [FR], et al) [PX] 1-8 * claims 1-21 ** page 6, line 26 - line 27 *; | [Y] - MU L ET AL, "A novel controlled release formulation for the anticancer drug paclitaxel (Taxol<(>R)): PLGA nanoparticles containing vitamin E TPGS", JOURNAL OF CONTROLLED RELEASE, ELSEVIER SCIENCE PUBLISHERS B.V. AMSTERDAM, NL, (20030109), vol. 86, no. 1, ISSN 0168-3659, pages 33 - 48, XP004398997 [Y] 1-8 * abstract * * page 34, column 2, line 32 - line 35 * * page 36, column 1, paragraph 2.4 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0168-3659(02)00320-6 | [Y] - ADAMS M W, "D-ALPHA TOCOPHERYL POLYETHYLENE GLYCOL 1000 SUCCINATE (EASTMAN VITAMI E TPGS) AS AN EMULSIFIER AND BIOENHANCER FOR DRUGS AND LIPOPHILIC COMPOUNDS", INTERNATIONAL CONGRESS OF TECHNOLOGY AND PHARMACOLOGY, ASSOC. PHARM. GALENIQUE IND., CHATENAY MALABRY, FR, (1992), pages 254 - 262, XP000576964 [Y] 1-8 * page 261, paragraph 4 * |