EP1656395 - PROCESS FOR THE PREPARATION OF A METALLOORGANIC COMPOUND COMPRISING AT LEAST ONE IMINE LIGAND [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.03.2011 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.09.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state Updated state(s): BG | published on 16.10.2013 [2013/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DSM IP Assets B.V. Het Overloon 1 6411 TE Heerlen / NL | [2010/17] |
Former [2006/20] | For all designated states DSM IP Assets B.V. Het Overloon 1 6411 TE Heerlen / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
IJPEIJ, Edwin, Gerard Vrangendael 153 NL-6136 JN Sittard / NL | 02 /
ARTS, Henricus, Johannes Montjoiestraat 4 NL-6151 JD Munstergeleen / NL | 03 /
VAN DOREMAELE, Gerardus, Henricus, Josephus Op de Hoef 6 NL-6132 HN Sittard / NL | 04 /
BEIJER, Felix, Hugo Darwinstraat 14 NL-6132 GW Sittard / NL | 05 /
VAN DER BURGT, Francis Robert Schumanstraat 3 NL-6049 HL Herten / NL | 06 /
ZUIDEVELD, Martin, Alexander Erasmusdomein 102a NL-6229 GD Maastricht / NL | [2006/20] | Representative(s) | Mooij, Johannes Jacobus DSM Intellectual Property Office Geleen P.O. Box 9 6160 MA Geleen / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2006/20] | Mooij, Johannes Jacobus DSM Intellectual Property Office Geleen P.O. Box 9 6160 MA Geleen / NL | Application number, filing date | 04741360.4 | 03.08.2004 | [2006/20] | WO2004EP08707 | Priority number, date | EP20030077434 | 04.08.2003 Original published format: EP 03077434 | [2006/20] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005014663 | Date: | 17.02.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/07] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1656395 | Date: | 17.05.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.02.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/20] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1656395 | Date: | 28.04.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/17] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 17.02.2005 | Classification | IPC: | C08F4/64, C07F9/535, C07F9/00, C07F7/00, C07F7/28, C07F7/30, C07F19/00 | [2006/20] | CPC: |
C08F10/00 (EP,US);
C07F17/00 (EP,US);
C07F19/00 (EP,US);
C07F7/00 (EP,US);
C07F7/28 (EP,US);
C07F7/30 (EP,US);
C07F9/00 (EP,US);
C07F9/5355 (EP,US);
C08F210/06 (EP,US);
C08F210/16 (EP,US);
C08F2420/04 (EP,US);
C08F4/65908 (EP,US);
C08F4/6592 (EP,US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
C08F210/06, C08F4/6592 (EP,US);
C08F210/06, C08F210/16, C08F2500/17 (US,EP);
C08F210/16, C08F210/06, C08F2500/17 (US,EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/20] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINER METALLORGANISCHEN VERBINDUNG MIT MINDESTENS EINEM IMINLIGANDEN | [2006/20] | English: | PROCESS FOR THE PREPARATION OF A METALLOORGANIC COMPOUND COMPRISING AT LEAST ONE IMINE LIGAND | [2006/20] | French: | PROCEDE DE PREPARATION D'UN COMPOSE ORGANOMETALLIQUE COMPRENANT AU MOINS UN LIGAND IMINE | [2006/20] | Entry into regional phase | 06.02.2006 | National basic fee paid | 06.02.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.02.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.02.2006 | Examination requested [2006/20] | 26.06.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 04.12.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.11.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.03.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 16.03.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 31.01.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.08.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.08.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.08.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.08.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 28.04.2010 | BE | 28.04.2010 | CY | 28.04.2010 | CZ | 28.04.2010 | DK | 28.04.2010 | EE | 28.04.2010 | FI | 28.04.2010 | PL | 28.04.2010 | RO | 28.04.2010 | SE | 28.04.2010 | SI | 28.04.2010 | SK | 28.04.2010 | TR | 28.04.2010 | BG | 28.07.2010 | GR | 29.07.2010 | IE | 03.08.2010 | LU | 03.08.2010 | ES | 08.08.2010 | PT | 30.08.2010 | CH | 31.08.2010 | LI | 31.08.2010 | MC | 31.08.2010 | HU | 29.10.2010 | [2013/42] |
Former [2012/47] | AT | 28.04.2010 | |
BE | 28.04.2010 | ||
BG | 28.04.2010 | ||
CY | 28.04.2010 | ||
CZ | 28.04.2010 | ||
DK | 28.04.2010 | ||
EE | 28.04.2010 | ||
FI | 28.04.2010 | ||
PL | 28.04.2010 | ||
RO | 28.04.2010 | ||
SE | 28.04.2010 | ||
SI | 28.04.2010 | ||
SK | 28.04.2010 | ||
TR | 28.04.2010 | ||
GR | 29.07.2010 | ||
IE | 03.08.2010 | ||
LU | 03.08.2010 | ||
ES | 08.08.2010 | ||
PT | 30.08.2010 | ||
CH | 31.08.2010 | ||
LI | 31.08.2010 | ||
MC | 31.08.2010 | ||
HU | 29.10.2010 | ||
Former [2012/44] | AT | 28.04.2010 | |
BE | 28.04.2010 | ||
BG | 28.04.2010 | ||
CY | 28.04.2010 | ||
CZ | 28.04.2010 | ||
DK | 28.04.2010 | ||
EE | 28.04.2010 | ||
FI | 28.04.2010 | ||
PL | 28.04.2010 | ||
RO | 28.04.2010 | ||
SE | 28.04.2010 | ||
SI | 28.04.2010 | ||
SK | 28.04.2010 | ||
GR | 29.07.2010 | ||
IE | 03.08.2010 | ||
LU | 03.08.2010 | ||
ES | 08.08.2010 | ||
PT | 30.08.2010 | ||
CH | 31.08.2010 | ||
LI | 31.08.2010 | ||
MC | 31.08.2010 | ||
HU | 29.10.2010 | ||
Former [2012/42] | AT | 28.04.2010 | |
BE | 28.04.2010 | ||
BG | 28.04.2010 | ||
CY | 28.04.2010 | ||
CZ | 28.04.2010 | ||
DK | 28.04.2010 | ||
EE | 28.04.2010 | ||
FI | 28.04.2010 | ||
PL | 28.04.2010 | ||
RO | 28.04.2010 | ||
SE | 28.04.2010 | ||
SI | 28.04.2010 | ||
SK | 28.04.2010 | ||
GR | 29.07.2010 | ||
IE | 03.08.2010 | ||
ES | 08.08.2010 | ||
PT | 30.08.2010 | ||
CH | 31.08.2010 | ||
LI | 31.08.2010 | ||
MC | 31.08.2010 | ||
HU | 29.10.2010 | ||
Former [2012/41] | AT | 28.04.2010 | |
BE | 28.04.2010 | ||
BG | 28.04.2010 | ||
CY | 28.04.2010 | ||
CZ | 28.04.2010 | ||
DK | 28.04.2010 | ||
EE | 28.04.2010 | ||
FI | 28.04.2010 | ||
PL | 28.04.2010 | ||
RO | 28.04.2010 | ||
SE | 28.04.2010 | ||
SI | 28.04.2010 | ||
SK | 28.04.2010 | ||
GR | 29.07.2010 | ||
IE | 03.08.2010 | ||
ES | 08.08.2010 | ||
PT | 30.08.2010 | ||
CH | 31.08.2010 | ||
LI | 31.08.2010 | ||
MC | 31.08.2010 | ||
Former [2011/36] | AT | 28.04.2010 | |
BE | 28.04.2010 | ||
CY | 28.04.2010 | ||
CZ | 28.04.2010 | ||
DK | 28.04.2010 | ||
EE | 28.04.2010 | ||
FI | 28.04.2010 | ||
PL | 28.04.2010 | ||
RO | 28.04.2010 | ||
SE | 28.04.2010 | ||
SI | 28.04.2010 | ||
SK | 28.04.2010 | ||
GR | 29.07.2010 | ||
IE | 03.08.2010 | ||
ES | 08.08.2010 | ||
PT | 30.08.2010 | ||
CH | 31.08.2010 | ||
LI | 31.08.2010 | ||
MC | 31.08.2010 | ||
Former [2011/20] | AT | 28.04.2010 | |
BE | 28.04.2010 | ||
CY | 28.04.2010 | ||
CZ | 28.04.2010 | ||
DK | 28.04.2010 | ||
EE | 28.04.2010 | ||
FI | 28.04.2010 | ||
PL | 28.04.2010 | ||
RO | 28.04.2010 | ||
SE | 28.04.2010 | ||
SI | 28.04.2010 | ||
SK | 28.04.2010 | ||
GR | 29.07.2010 | ||
ES | 08.08.2010 | ||
PT | 30.08.2010 | ||
CH | 31.08.2010 | ||
LI | 31.08.2010 | ||
MC | 31.08.2010 | ||
Former [2011/15] | AT | 28.04.2010 | |
BE | 28.04.2010 | ||
CY | 28.04.2010 | ||
CZ | 28.04.2010 | ||
DK | 28.04.2010 | ||
EE | 28.04.2010 | ||
FI | 28.04.2010 | ||
PL | 28.04.2010 | ||
RO | 28.04.2010 | ||
SE | 28.04.2010 | ||
SI | 28.04.2010 | ||
SK | 28.04.2010 | ||
GR | 29.07.2010 | ||
ES | 08.08.2010 | ||
PT | 30.08.2010 | ||
MC | 31.08.2010 | ||
Former [2011/10] | AT | 28.04.2010 | |
CY | 28.04.2010 | ||
CZ | 28.04.2010 | ||
DK | 28.04.2010 | ||
EE | 28.04.2010 | ||
FI | 28.04.2010 | ||
PL | 28.04.2010 | ||
RO | 28.04.2010 | ||
SE | 28.04.2010 | ||
SI | 28.04.2010 | ||
SK | 28.04.2010 | ||
GR | 29.07.2010 | ||
ES | 08.08.2010 | ||
PT | 30.08.2010 | ||
Former [2011/08] | AT | 28.04.2010 | |
CY | 28.04.2010 | ||
DK | 28.04.2010 | ||
EE | 28.04.2010 | ||
FI | 28.04.2010 | ||
PL | 28.04.2010 | ||
SE | 28.04.2010 | ||
SI | 28.04.2010 | ||
GR | 29.07.2010 | ||
ES | 08.08.2010 | ||
PT | 30.08.2010 | ||
Former [2011/07] | AT | 28.04.2010 | |
CY | 28.04.2010 | ||
DK | 28.04.2010 | ||
FI | 28.04.2010 | ||
PL | 28.04.2010 | ||
SE | 28.04.2010 | ||
SI | 28.04.2010 | ||
GR | 29.07.2010 | ||
ES | 08.08.2010 | ||
Former [2011/03] | AT | 28.04.2010 | |
CY | 28.04.2010 | ||
FI | 28.04.2010 | ||
PL | 28.04.2010 | ||
SE | 28.04.2010 | ||
SI | 28.04.2010 | ||
GR | 29.07.2010 | ||
ES | 08.08.2010 | ||
Former [2011/01] | AT | 28.04.2010 | |
FI | 28.04.2010 | ||
SE | 28.04.2010 | ||
SI | 28.04.2010 | ||
GR | 29.07.2010 | ||
ES | 08.08.2010 | ||
Former [2010/52] | AT | 28.04.2010 | |
FI | 28.04.2010 | ||
SE | 28.04.2010 | ||
SI | 28.04.2010 | ||
ES | 08.08.2010 | ||
Former [2010/50] | AT | 28.04.2010 | |
FI | 28.04.2010 | ||
SE | 28.04.2010 | ||
ES | 08.08.2010 | ||
Former [2010/46] | ES | 08.08.2010 | Cited in | International search | [A]CA2210131 (NOVA CHEM LTD [CA]) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [X]CA2243726 (NOVA CHEM LTD [CA]) [X] 1-15 * pages 18 & 19; syntheses 2, 3 & 4 *; | [X]CA2243775 (NOVA CHEM LTD [CA]) [X] 1-15 * page 21; method 2 *; | [A]CA2243783 (NOVA CHEM LTD [CA]) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [DA]CA2261518 (NOVA CHEMICALS CORP [CA]) [DA] 1-15 * page 3, line 30 - line 36 *; | [DX]US6114481 (MCMEEKING JOHN [CA], et al) [DX] 1-15 * column 8, line 1 - column 9, line 30 *; | [DX]WO02070569 (STICHTING DUTCH POLYMER INST [NL], et al) [DX] 1-15 * page 8, line 33 - page 9, line 12 * * page 10, line 1 - line 23 * * page 14, line 1 - line 11 *; | [A] - SARSFIELD MARK J ET AL, "The reactivity of trimethylsilyliminophosphines towards titanium and zirconium halides", JOURNAL OF THE CHEMICAL SOCIETY, DALTON TRANSACTIONS, (20010321), no. 6, ISSN 1472-7773, pages 822 - 827, XP002262843 [A] 1-15 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1039/b009082o | Examination | - HICKS F A ET AL, "An intramolecular titanium-catalyzed asymmetric Pauson-Khand type reaction", JOURNAL OF THE AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY, (19990804), vol. 121, no. 30, doi:10.1021/ja990683m, ISSN 0002-7863, pages 7026 - 7033, XP009125404 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/ja990683m | by applicant | CA243775 | CA2243726 | US6063879 | CA2261518 | US6114481 | WO02070569 |