EP1677988 - METHOD OF MANUFACTURING A HYGIENE PAPER PRODUCT, APPARATUS FOR SUCH MANUFACTURE AND HYGIENE PAPER PRODUCT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.10.2015 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.10.2017 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BG, HU, TR | published on 15.11.2017 [2017/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SCA Hygiene Products GmbH Sandhofer Strasse 176 68264 Mannheim / DE | [2006/28] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ZÖLLER, Günther Beethovenstrasse 26 69198 Schriesheim / DE | 02 /
REICHLING, Bernhard Webergasse 5A 67346 Speyer / DE | [2006/28] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [2014/49] |
Former [2006/28] | HOFFMANN EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 04741421.4 | 20.08.2004 | [2006/28] | WO2004EP09360 | Priority number, date | EP20030024997 | 30.10.2003 Original published format: EP 03024997 | [2006/28] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005049326 | Date: | 02.06.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/22] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1677988 | Date: | 12.07.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.06.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/28] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1677988 | Date: | 03.12.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/49] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 02.06.2005 | Classification | IPC: | B41M1/24, B41F19/02, D21H27/02 | [2006/28] | CPC: |
B41F19/02 (EP);
D21H27/02 (EP);
B41M1/24 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/28] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES HYGIENEPAPIERPRODUKTS, VORRICHTUNG FÜR SOLCH EINE HERSTELLUNG UND HYGIENEPAPIERPRODUKT | [2006/28] | English: | METHOD OF MANUFACTURING A HYGIENE PAPER PRODUCT, APPARATUS FOR SUCH MANUFACTURE AND HYGIENE PAPER PRODUCT | [2006/28] | French: | PROCEDE DE FABRICATION D'UN PRODUIT HYGIENIQUE EN PAPIER, L'APPAREIL POUR UNE TELLE FABRICATION ET LE PRODUIT HYGIENIQUE EN PAPIER | [2006/28] | Entry into regional phase | 07.04.2006 | National basic fee paid | 07.04.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.04.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.04.2006 | Examination requested [2006/28] | 09.06.2006 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.07.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.11.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.03.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.07.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.06.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 17.12.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.07.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.10.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 24.10.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 24.10.2014 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 06.07.2007 | Opposition(s) | 04.09.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/46] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.08.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.08.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.08.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.08.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 26.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 29.08.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 20.08.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 23.08.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 25.08.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 20.08.2004 | AT | 03.12.2014 | BE | 03.12.2014 | BG | 03.12.2014 | CY | 03.12.2014 | CZ | 03.12.2014 | DK | 03.12.2014 | EE | 03.12.2014 | ES | 03.12.2014 | FI | 03.12.2014 | MC | 03.12.2014 | NL | 03.12.2014 | PL | 03.12.2014 | RO | 03.12.2014 | SE | 03.12.2014 | SI | 03.12.2014 | SK | 03.12.2014 | TR | 03.12.2014 | GR | 04.03.2015 | PT | 03.04.2015 | IE | 20.08.2015 | LU | 20.08.2015 | CH | 31.08.2015 | LI | 31.08.2015 | [2017/39] |
Former [2016/33] | AT | 03.12.2014 | |
BE | 03.12.2014 | ||
CY | 03.12.2014 | ||
CZ | 03.12.2014 | ||
DK | 03.12.2014 | ||
EE | 03.12.2014 | ||
ES | 03.12.2014 | ||
FI | 03.12.2014 | ||
MC | 03.12.2014 | ||
NL | 03.12.2014 | ||
PL | 03.12.2014 | ||
RO | 03.12.2014 | ||
SE | 03.12.2014 | ||
SI | 03.12.2014 | ||
SK | 03.12.2014 | ||
GR | 04.03.2015 | ||
PT | 03.04.2015 | ||
IE | 20.08.2015 | ||
LU | 20.08.2015 | ||
CH | 31.08.2015 | ||
LI | 31.08.2015 | ||
Former [2016/24] | AT | 03.12.2014 | |
BE | 03.12.2014 | ||
CY | 03.12.2014 | ||
CZ | 03.12.2014 | ||
DK | 03.12.2014 | ||
EE | 03.12.2014 | ||
ES | 03.12.2014 | ||
FI | 03.12.2014 | ||
MC | 03.12.2014 | ||
NL | 03.12.2014 | ||
PL | 03.12.2014 | ||
RO | 03.12.2014 | ||
SE | 03.12.2014 | ||
SI | 03.12.2014 | ||
SK | 03.12.2014 | ||
GR | 04.03.2015 | ||
PT | 03.04.2015 | ||
LU | 20.08.2015 | ||
CH | 31.08.2015 | ||
LI | 31.08.2015 | ||
Former [2016/22] | AT | 03.12.2014 | |
CY | 03.12.2014 | ||
CZ | 03.12.2014 | ||
DK | 03.12.2014 | ||
EE | 03.12.2014 | ||
ES | 03.12.2014 | ||
FI | 03.12.2014 | ||
MC | 03.12.2014 | ||
NL | 03.12.2014 | ||
PL | 03.12.2014 | ||
RO | 03.12.2014 | ||
SE | 03.12.2014 | ||
SI | 03.12.2014 | ||
SK | 03.12.2014 | ||
GR | 04.03.2015 | ||
PT | 03.04.2015 | ||
LU | 20.08.2015 | ||
CH | 31.08.2015 | ||
LI | 31.08.2015 | ||
Former [2016/18] | AT | 03.12.2014 | |
CY | 03.12.2014 | ||
CZ | 03.12.2014 | ||
DK | 03.12.2014 | ||
EE | 03.12.2014 | ||
ES | 03.12.2014 | ||
FI | 03.12.2014 | ||
MC | 03.12.2014 | ||
NL | 03.12.2014 | ||
PL | 03.12.2014 | ||
RO | 03.12.2014 | ||
SE | 03.12.2014 | ||
SI | 03.12.2014 | ||
SK | 03.12.2014 | ||
GR | 04.03.2015 | ||
PT | 03.04.2015 | ||
LU | 20.08.2015 | ||
Former [2016/17] | AT | 03.12.2014 | |
CY | 03.12.2014 | ||
CZ | 03.12.2014 | ||
DK | 03.12.2014 | ||
EE | 03.12.2014 | ||
ES | 03.12.2014 | ||
FI | 03.12.2014 | ||
NL | 03.12.2014 | ||
PL | 03.12.2014 | ||
RO | 03.12.2014 | ||
SE | 03.12.2014 | ||
SI | 03.12.2014 | ||
SK | 03.12.2014 | ||
GR | 04.03.2015 | ||
PT | 03.04.2015 | ||
LU | 20.08.2015 | ||
Former [2016/12] | AT | 03.12.2014 | |
CY | 03.12.2014 | ||
CZ | 03.12.2014 | ||
DK | 03.12.2014 | ||
EE | 03.12.2014 | ||
ES | 03.12.2014 | ||
FI | 03.12.2014 | ||
NL | 03.12.2014 | ||
PL | 03.12.2014 | ||
RO | 03.12.2014 | ||
SE | 03.12.2014 | ||
SI | 03.12.2014 | ||
SK | 03.12.2014 | ||
GR | 04.03.2015 | ||
PT | 03.04.2015 | ||
Former [2015/50] | AT | 03.12.2014 | |
CY | 03.12.2014 | ||
CZ | 03.12.2014 | ||
DK | 03.12.2014 | ||
EE | 03.12.2014 | ||
ES | 03.12.2014 | ||
FI | 03.12.2014 | ||
NL | 03.12.2014 | ||
PL | 03.12.2014 | ||
RO | 03.12.2014 | ||
SE | 03.12.2014 | ||
SK | 03.12.2014 | ||
GR | 04.03.2015 | ||
PT | 03.04.2015 | ||
Former [2015/37] | AT | 03.12.2014 | |
CY | 03.12.2014 | ||
CZ | 03.12.2014 | ||
EE | 03.12.2014 | ||
ES | 03.12.2014 | ||
FI | 03.12.2014 | ||
NL | 03.12.2014 | ||
PL | 03.12.2014 | ||
RO | 03.12.2014 | ||
SE | 03.12.2014 | ||
SK | 03.12.2014 | ||
GR | 04.03.2015 | ||
PT | 03.04.2015 | ||
Former [2015/36] | AT | 03.12.2014 | |
CY | 03.12.2014 | ||
CZ | 03.12.2014 | ||
EE | 03.12.2014 | ||
ES | 03.12.2014 | ||
FI | 03.12.2014 | ||
NL | 03.12.2014 | ||
RO | 03.12.2014 | ||
SE | 03.12.2014 | ||
GR | 04.03.2015 | ||
PT | 03.04.2015 | ||
Former [2015/35] | AT | 03.12.2014 | |
CY | 03.12.2014 | ||
EE | 03.12.2014 | ||
ES | 03.12.2014 | ||
FI | 03.12.2014 | ||
NL | 03.12.2014 | ||
SE | 03.12.2014 | ||
GR | 04.03.2015 | ||
PT | 03.04.2015 | ||
Former [2015/26] | AT | 03.12.2014 | |
CY | 03.12.2014 | ||
ES | 03.12.2014 | ||
FI | 03.12.2014 | ||
NL | 03.12.2014 | ||
SE | 03.12.2014 | ||
GR | 04.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/25] | AT | 03.12.2014 | |
ES | 03.12.2014 | ||
FI | 03.12.2014 | ||
NL | 03.12.2014 | ||
SE | 03.12.2014 | ||
GR | 04.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/24] | ES | 03.12.2014 | |
FI | 03.12.2014 | ||
NL | 03.12.2014 | ||
SE | 03.12.2014 | ||
GR | 04.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/23] | ES | 03.12.2014 | |
FI | 03.12.2014 | ||
NL | 03.12.2014 | Cited in | International search | [DA]US3594552 (ADAMSON ROBERT G, et al); | [A]GB2036649 (DITZEL GMBH GEBR) [A] 1-5,7,9-12,14 * the whole document *; | [A]US5123343 (WILLER ROBERT A [US]); | [A]WO9735695 (PROCTER & GAMBLE [US]); | [X]WO9938679 (SPRINGS WINDOW FASHIONS DIV [US]) [X] 1-5,7,9-12,14,15 * the whole document *; | [D]EP0958112 (PROCTER & GAMBLE [US]); | [XA]EP1304215 (SCA HYGIENE PROD AB [SE]) [X] 15-23 * paragraphs [0027] - [0032]; figures 1,2,4; claims 14-20 * * the whole document * [A] 1,7,9,14 |