EP1652294 - CARTESIAN LOOP TRANSMITTER AND METHOD OF ADJUSTING AN OUTPUT LEVEL OF SUCH TRANSMITTER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.06.2010 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.10.2012 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 21.11.2012 [2012/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MOTOROLA, INC. 1303 East Algonquin Road Schaumburg, IL 60196 / US | [2006/18] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BEN-AYUN, Moshe Motorola Israel Limited, 3 Kremenetski Street 67899 Tel Aviv / IL | 02 /
AVAYU, Izak Motorola Israel Limited, 3 Kremenetski Street 67899 Tel Aviv / IL | 03 /
ROZENTAL, Mark Motorola Israel Limited, 3 Kremenetski Street 67899 Tel Aviv / IL | [2006/18] | Representative(s) | McCormack, Derek James Optimus Grove House Lutyens Close Chineham Court GB-Basingstoke, Hampshire RG24 8AG / GB | [2009/32] |
Former [2008/45] | McCormack, Derek James Optimus Patents Limited Grove House Lutyens Close Chineham Court Basingstoke, Hampshire RG24 8AG / GB | ||
Former [2006/18] | McCormack, Derek James Optimus Grove House, Lutyens Close, Chineham Court, Basingstoke Hampshire RG24 8AG / GB | Application number, filing date | 04741619.3 | 20.05.2004 | [2006/18] | WO2004EP50876 | Priority number, date | GB20030015599 | 04.07.2003 Original published format: GB 0315599 | [2006/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005006542 | Date: | 20.01.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/03] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1652294 | Date: | 03.05.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.01.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/18] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1652294 | Date: | 05.08.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/32] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 20.01.2005 | Classification | IPC: | H03F1/34 | [2006/18] | CPC: |
H03F3/24 (EP,US);
H03F1/32 (EP,KR,US);
H03F1/34 (EP,KR,US);
H03F2200/336 (EP,US);
H03F2200/451 (EP,US);
H03F2200/57 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/18] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SENDER MIT KARTESISCHER SCHLEIFE UND VERFAHREN ZUR EINSTELLUNG EINES AUSGANGSPEGELS EINES SOLCHEN SENDERS | [2006/18] | English: | CARTESIAN LOOP TRANSMITTER AND METHOD OF ADJUSTING AN OUTPUT LEVEL OF SUCH TRANSMITTER | [2006/18] | French: | EMETTEUR A BOUCLE CARTESIEN ET PROCEDE DE REGLAGE DU NIVEAU DE SORTIE D'UN TEL EMETTEUR | [2006/18] | Entry into regional phase | 06.02.2006 | National basic fee paid | 06.02.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.02.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.02.2006 | Examination requested [2006/18] | 04.12.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.03.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.08.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.12.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.02.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.06.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 02.06.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 07.05.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 07.05.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 05.08.2009 | BE | 05.08.2009 | CY | 05.08.2009 | CZ | 05.08.2009 | DK | 05.08.2009 | EE | 05.08.2009 | FI | 05.08.2009 | NL | 05.08.2009 | PL | 05.08.2009 | RO | 05.08.2009 | SE | 05.08.2009 | SI | 05.08.2009 | SK | 05.08.2009 | TR | 05.08.2009 | BG | 05.11.2009 | GR | 06.11.2009 | PT | 05.12.2009 | HU | 06.02.2010 | [2012/47] |
Former [2012/42] | AT | 05.08.2009 | |
BE | 05.08.2009 | ||
CY | 05.08.2009 | ||
CZ | 05.08.2009 | ||
DK | 05.08.2009 | ||
EE | 05.08.2009 | ||
FI | 05.08.2009 | ||
NL | 05.08.2009 | ||
PL | 05.08.2009 | ||
RO | 05.08.2009 | ||
SE | 05.08.2009 | ||
SI | 05.08.2009 | ||
SK | 05.08.2009 | ||
BG | 05.11.2009 | ||
GR | 06.11.2009 | ||
PT | 05.12.2009 | ||
HU | 06.02.2010 | ||
Former [2012/37] | AT | 05.08.2009 | |
BE | 05.08.2009 | ||
CY | 05.08.2009 | ||
CZ | 05.08.2009 | ||
DK | 05.08.2009 | ||
EE | 05.08.2009 | ||
FI | 05.08.2009 | ||
NL | 05.08.2009 | ||
PL | 05.08.2009 | ||
RO | 05.08.2009 | ||
SE | 05.08.2009 | ||
SI | 05.08.2009 | ||
SK | 05.08.2009 | ||
BG | 05.11.2009 | ||
GR | 06.11.2009 | ||
PT | 05.12.2009 | ||
Former [2010/50] | AT | 05.08.2009 | |
BE | 05.08.2009 | ||
CZ | 05.08.2009 | ||
DK | 05.08.2009 | ||
EE | 05.08.2009 | ||
FI | 05.08.2009 | ||
NL | 05.08.2009 | ||
PL | 05.08.2009 | ||
RO | 05.08.2009 | ||
SE | 05.08.2009 | ||
SI | 05.08.2009 | ||
SK | 05.08.2009 | ||
BG | 05.11.2009 | ||
GR | 06.11.2009 | ||
PT | 05.12.2009 | ||
Former [2010/28] | AT | 05.08.2009 | |
BE | 05.08.2009 | ||
CZ | 05.08.2009 | ||
DK | 05.08.2009 | ||
EE | 05.08.2009 | ||
FI | 05.08.2009 | ||
NL | 05.08.2009 | ||
PL | 05.08.2009 | ||
RO | 05.08.2009 | ||
SE | 05.08.2009 | ||
SI | 05.08.2009 | ||
SK | 05.08.2009 | ||
BG | 05.11.2009 | ||
PT | 05.12.2009 | ||
Former [2010/23] | AT | 05.08.2009 | |
CZ | 05.08.2009 | ||
DK | 05.08.2009 | ||
EE | 05.08.2009 | ||
FI | 05.08.2009 | ||
NL | 05.08.2009 | ||
PL | 05.08.2009 | ||
RO | 05.08.2009 | ||
SE | 05.08.2009 | ||
SI | 05.08.2009 | ||
SK | 05.08.2009 | ||
BG | 05.11.2009 | ||
PT | 05.12.2009 | ||
Former [2010/22] | AT | 05.08.2009 | |
CZ | 05.08.2009 | ||
DK | 05.08.2009 | ||
EE | 05.08.2009 | ||
FI | 05.08.2009 | ||
NL | 05.08.2009 | ||
PL | 05.08.2009 | ||
RO | 05.08.2009 | ||
SE | 05.08.2009 | ||
SI | 05.08.2009 | ||
BG | 05.11.2009 | ||
PT | 05.12.2009 | ||
Former [2010/20] | AT | 05.08.2009 | |
DK | 05.08.2009 | ||
EE | 05.08.2009 | ||
FI | 05.08.2009 | ||
NL | 05.08.2009 | ||
PL | 05.08.2009 | ||
SE | 05.08.2009 | ||
SI | 05.08.2009 | ||
BG | 05.11.2009 | ||
PT | 05.12.2009 | ||
Former [2010/17] | AT | 05.08.2009 | |
FI | 05.08.2009 | ||
NL | 05.08.2009 | ||
PL | 05.08.2009 | ||
SE | 05.08.2009 | ||
SI | 05.08.2009 | ||
BG | 05.11.2009 | ||
PT | 05.12.2009 | ||
Former [2010/11] | AT | 05.08.2009 | |
FI | 05.08.2009 | ||
NL | 05.08.2009 | ||
PL | 05.08.2009 | ||
SE | 05.08.2009 | ||
SI | 05.08.2009 | ||
Former [2010/10] | AT | 05.08.2009 | |
FI | 05.08.2009 | ||
NL | 05.08.2009 | ||
PL | 05.08.2009 | ||
SE | 05.08.2009 | ||
Former [2010/09] | AT | 05.08.2009 | |
FI | 05.08.2009 | ||
SE | 05.08.2009 | Cited in | International search | [A]WO0163792 (MOTOROLA ISRAEL LTD [IL], et al) [A] 1-17* the whole document *; | [A]EP1235344 (NOKIA CORP [FI]) [A] 1-17 * the whole document *; | [A]US2003031271 (BOZEKI JOHN JANOS [US], et al) [A] 1-17 * the whole document * |