EP1628819 - METHOD AND DEVICE FOR THE PRODUCTION OF MULTI-PART OBJECTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.07.2011 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.10.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 06.11.2013 [2013/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FOBOHA GMBH FORMENBAU Im Mühlegrün 8 77716 Haslach / DE | [2006/09] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ARMBRUSTER, Rainer Ziegelmättle 1 77709 Wolfach / DE | [2006/09] | Representative(s) | Rentsch Partner AG Kirchenweg 8 Postfach 8034 Zürich / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2009/52] | Rentsch & Partner Fraumünsterstrasse 9 Postfach 2441 8022 Zürich / CH | ||
Former [2006/09] | Rentsch & Partner Postfach 2441 8022 Zürich / CH | Application number, filing date | 04741630.0 | 21.05.2004 | [2006/09] | WO2004EP50891 | Priority number, date | CH20030000910 | 22.05.2003 Original published format: CH 9102003 | [2006/09] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2004103676 | Date: | 02.12.2004 | Language: | DE | [2004/49] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1628819 | Date: | 01.03.2006 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.12.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/09] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1628819 | Date: | 01.09.2010 | Language: | DE | [2010/35] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 12.05.2005 | Classification | IPC: | B29C45/00, B29C45/16, B29C45/04 | [2006/09] | CPC: |
B29C45/1628 (EP);
B29C45/0062 (EP);
B29C45/045 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/09] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUM HERSTELLEN VON MEHRTEILIGEN GEGENSTÄNDEN | [2006/09] | English: | METHOD AND DEVICE FOR THE PRODUCTION OF MULTI-PART OBJECTS | [2006/09] | French: | PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIF PERMETTANT DE PRODUIRE DES OBJETS COMPORTANT PLUSIEURS PARTIES | [2006/09] | Entry into regional phase | 22.12.2005 | National basic fee paid | 22.12.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.12.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.12.2005 | Examination requested [2006/09] | 23.06.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 03.01.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.01.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 23.07.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.04.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.07.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 15.07.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 06.06.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.05.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.07.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 02.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 19.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2008 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   24.07.2008 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 01.09.2010 | CZ | 01.09.2010 | DK | 01.09.2010 | EE | 01.09.2010 | FI | 01.09.2010 | HU | 01.09.2010 | IE | 01.09.2010 | IT | 01.09.2010 | NL | 01.09.2010 | PL | 01.09.2010 | RO | 01.09.2010 | SE | 01.09.2010 | SI | 01.09.2010 | SK | 01.09.2010 | TR | 01.09.2010 | BG | 01.12.2010 | GR | 02.12.2010 | ES | 12.12.2010 | PT | 03.01.2011 | GB | 21.05.2011 | LU | 21.05.2011 | BE | 31.05.2011 | FR | 31.05.2011 | MC | 31.05.2011 | [2013/45] |
Former [2013/44] | CY | 01.09.2010 | |
CZ | 01.09.2010 | ||
DK | 01.09.2010 | ||
EE | 01.09.2010 | ||
FI | 01.09.2010 | ||
IE | 01.09.2010 | ||
IT | 01.09.2010 | ||
NL | 01.09.2010 | ||
PL | 01.09.2010 | ||
RO | 01.09.2010 | ||
SE | 01.09.2010 | ||
SI | 01.09.2010 | ||
SK | 01.09.2010 | ||
TR | 01.09.2010 | ||
BG | 01.12.2010 | ||
GR | 02.12.2010 | ||
ES | 12.12.2010 | ||
PT | 03.01.2011 | ||
GB | 21.05.2011 | ||
LU | 21.05.2011 | ||
BE | 31.05.2011 | ||
FR | 31.05.2011 | ||
MC | 31.05.2011 | ||
Former [2013/42] | CY | 01.09.2010 | |
CZ | 01.09.2010 | ||
DK | 01.09.2010 | ||
EE | 01.09.2010 | ||
FI | 01.09.2010 | ||
IE | 01.09.2010 | ||
IT | 01.09.2010 | ||
NL | 01.09.2010 | ||
PL | 01.09.2010 | ||
RO | 01.09.2010 | ||
SE | 01.09.2010 | ||
SI | 01.09.2010 | ||
SK | 01.09.2010 | ||
BG | 01.12.2010 | ||
GR | 02.12.2010 | ||
ES | 12.12.2010 | ||
PT | 03.01.2011 | ||
GB | 21.05.2011 | ||
LU | 21.05.2011 | ||
BE | 31.05.2011 | ||
FR | 31.05.2011 | ||
MC | 31.05.2011 | ||
Former [2013/25] | CY | 01.09.2010 | |
CZ | 01.09.2010 | ||
DK | 01.09.2010 | ||
EE | 01.09.2010 | ||
FI | 01.09.2010 | ||
IE | 01.09.2010 | ||
IT | 01.09.2010 | ||
NL | 01.09.2010 | ||
PL | 01.09.2010 | ||
RO | 01.09.2010 | ||
SE | 01.09.2010 | ||
SI | 01.09.2010 | ||
SK | 01.09.2010 | ||
GR | 02.12.2010 | ||
ES | 12.12.2010 | ||
PT | 03.01.2011 | ||
GB | 21.05.2011 | ||
LU | 21.05.2011 | ||
BE | 31.05.2011 | ||
FR | 31.05.2011 | ||
MC | 31.05.2011 | ||
Former [2012/30] | CY | 01.09.2010 | |
CZ | 01.09.2010 | ||
DK | 01.09.2010 | ||
EE | 01.09.2010 | ||
FI | 01.09.2010 | ||
IE | 01.09.2010 | ||
IT | 01.09.2010 | ||
NL | 01.09.2010 | ||
PL | 01.09.2010 | ||
RO | 01.09.2010 | ||
SE | 01.09.2010 | ||
SI | 01.09.2010 | ||
SK | 01.09.2010 | ||
GR | 02.12.2010 | ||
ES | 12.12.2010 | ||
PT | 03.01.2011 | ||
GB | 21.05.2011 | ||
BE | 31.05.2011 | ||
FR | 31.05.2011 | ||
MC | 31.05.2011 | ||
Former [2012/22] | CY | 01.09.2010 | |
CZ | 01.09.2010 | ||
DK | 01.09.2010 | ||
EE | 01.09.2010 | ||
FI | 01.09.2010 | ||
IE | 01.09.2010 | ||
IT | 01.09.2010 | ||
NL | 01.09.2010 | ||
PL | 01.09.2010 | ||
RO | 01.09.2010 | ||
SE | 01.09.2010 | ||
SI | 01.09.2010 | ||
SK | 01.09.2010 | ||
GR | 02.12.2010 | ||
ES | 12.12.2010 | ||
PT | 03.01.2011 | ||
BE | 31.05.2011 | ||
FR | 31.05.2011 | ||
MC | 31.05.2011 | ||
Former [2012/17] | CY | 01.09.2010 | |
CZ | 01.09.2010 | ||
DK | 01.09.2010 | ||
EE | 01.09.2010 | ||
FI | 01.09.2010 | ||
IE | 01.09.2010 | ||
IT | 01.09.2010 | ||
NL | 01.09.2010 | ||
PL | 01.09.2010 | ||
RO | 01.09.2010 | ||
SE | 01.09.2010 | ||
SI | 01.09.2010 | ||
SK | 01.09.2010 | ||
GR | 02.12.2010 | ||
ES | 12.12.2010 | ||
PT | 03.01.2011 | ||
BE | 31.05.2011 | ||
MC | 31.05.2011 | ||
Former [2012/05] | CY | 01.09.2010 | |
CZ | 01.09.2010 | ||
DK | 01.09.2010 | ||
EE | 01.09.2010 | ||
FI | 01.09.2010 | ||
IE | 01.09.2010 | ||
IT | 01.09.2010 | ||
NL | 01.09.2010 | ||
PL | 01.09.2010 | ||
RO | 01.09.2010 | ||
SE | 01.09.2010 | ||
SI | 01.09.2010 | ||
SK | 01.09.2010 | ||
GR | 02.12.2010 | ||
ES | 12.12.2010 | ||
PT | 03.01.2011 | ||
MC | 31.05.2011 | ||
Former [2011/40] | CY | 01.09.2010 | |
CZ | 01.09.2010 | ||
DK | 01.09.2010 | ||
EE | 01.09.2010 | ||
FI | 01.09.2010 | ||
IE | 01.09.2010 | ||
IT | 01.09.2010 | ||
NL | 01.09.2010 | ||
PL | 01.09.2010 | ||
RO | 01.09.2010 | ||
SE | 01.09.2010 | ||
SI | 01.09.2010 | ||
SK | 01.09.2010 | ||
GR | 02.12.2010 | ||
ES | 12.12.2010 | ||
PT | 03.01.2011 | ||
Former [2011/32] | CY | 01.09.2010 | |
CZ | 01.09.2010 | ||
EE | 01.09.2010 | ||
FI | 01.09.2010 | ||
IE | 01.09.2010 | ||
IT | 01.09.2010 | ||
NL | 01.09.2010 | ||
PL | 01.09.2010 | ||
RO | 01.09.2010 | ||
SE | 01.09.2010 | ||
SI | 01.09.2010 | ||
SK | 01.09.2010 | ||
GR | 02.12.2010 | ||
ES | 12.12.2010 | ||
PT | 03.01.2011 | ||
Former [2011/24] | CY | 01.09.2010 | |
CZ | 01.09.2010 | ||
EE | 01.09.2010 | ||
FI | 01.09.2010 | ||
IE | 01.09.2010 | ||
NL | 01.09.2010 | ||
PL | 01.09.2010 | ||
SE | 01.09.2010 | ||
SI | 01.09.2010 | ||
SK | 01.09.2010 | ||
GR | 02.12.2010 | ||
PT | 03.01.2011 | ||
Former [2011/23] | CY | 01.09.2010 | |
CZ | 01.09.2010 | ||
EE | 01.09.2010 | ||
FI | 01.09.2010 | ||
IE | 01.09.2010 | ||
NL | 01.09.2010 | ||
PL | 01.09.2010 | ||
SE | 01.09.2010 | ||
SI | 01.09.2010 | ||
SK | 01.09.2010 | ||
GR | 02.12.2010 | ||
Former [2011/19] | CY | 01.09.2010 | |
FI | 01.09.2010 | ||
IE | 01.09.2010 | ||
NL | 01.09.2010 | ||
PL | 01.09.2010 | ||
SE | 01.09.2010 | ||
SI | 01.09.2010 | ||
GR | 02.12.2010 | ||
Former [2011/17] | CY | 01.09.2010 | |
FI | 01.09.2010 | ||
NL | 01.09.2010 | ||
PL | 01.09.2010 | ||
SE | 01.09.2010 | ||
SI | 01.09.2010 | ||
GR | 02.12.2010 | ||
Former [2011/15] | CY | 01.09.2010 | |
FI | 01.09.2010 | ||
PL | 01.09.2010 | ||
SE | 01.09.2010 | ||
SI | 01.09.2010 | ||
GR | 02.12.2010 | ||
Former [2011/13] | CY | 01.09.2010 | |
FI | 01.09.2010 | ||
PL | 01.09.2010 | ||
SI | 01.09.2010 | ||
Former [2011/10] | FI | 01.09.2010 | |
PL | 01.09.2010 | ||
SI | 01.09.2010 | Cited in | International search | [X]JPS5595544 ; | [X]US4444711 (SCHAD ROBERT D [CA]) [X] 1-3,8-11,13 * column 8, line 3 - line 5 *; | [Y]US5221538 (GASAMI SHINJI [JP], et al) [Y] 4 * figures 7,8 *; | [X]WO0073040 (GRAM JES TOUGAARD [DK]) [X] 1,8-11,13 * figure 5 *; | [Y]US6299816 (TAKEMOTO YOSHIHIRO [JP], et al) [Y] 4 * figure 28 *; | [A]WO0204186 (FOBOHA GMBH [DE], et al) [A] 1-11,13 * page 4, line 17 - line 23 *; | [XY]EP1226916 (FOBOHA GMBH [DE]) [X] 1-3,8-11,13 * paragraphs [0016] , [0021] * [Y] 4; | [XY] - DASSOW J, "FUER ALLE FAELLE GERUESTET, TECHNOLOGIEFUEHRERSCHAFT DURCH MEHRKOMPONENTENTECHNIK", KUNSTSTOFFE, CARL HANSER VERLAG. MUNCHEN, DE, (200209), vol. 92, ISSN 0023-5563, pages 105 - 109, XP002237523 [X] 1-3,8-11,13 * "Takt 2 Assembling..." in;; figure 5 * [Y] 4 | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19800930), vol. 0041, no. 39, Database accession no. (M - 034), & JP55095544 A 19800719 (JAPAN STEEL WORKS LTD:THE) [X] 1,8-11,13 * abstract * | [X] - JAEGER A, "NEUES VOM MEHRKOMPONENTEN-SPRITZGIESSEN VERFAHRENSKOMBINATIONEN BIETEN WIRTSCHAFTLICHE VORTEILE", KUNSTSTOFFE, CARL HANSER VERLAG. MUNCHEN, DE, (199909), vol. 89, no. 9, ISSN 0023-5563, pages 85 - 89, XP000958432 [X] 1-3,8-11,13 * "von der Seite mit Einlegeteilen bestücken" auf; page 89, column R, paragraph 1; figures 6,7 * | [A] - "INJECTIELASSEN VAN POLYAMIDE INLAATSPRUITSTUKKEN", KUNSTSTOF EN RUBBER, WYT EN ZONEN UITGEVERS. ROTTERDAM, NL, (199911), vol. 52, no. 11, ISSN 0167-9597, pages 30 - 31, XP000928465 [A] 1-11,13 * "Werking van het DRI" in der unteren Figur auf; page 31 * | [A] - "TECHNIQUE PRODUCES ASSEMBLED HOLLOW PARTS OUT OF THE MOLD", MODERN PLASTICS INTERNATIONAL, MCGRAW-HILL,INC. LAUSANNE, CH, (200212), no. 12, ISSN 0026-8283, page 31, XP001121771 [A] 1-11,13 * column M, paragraph 3 * | by applicant | US5221538 | EP1155802 | - "Für alle Fälle gerüstet, Technologieführerschaft durch Mehrkomponententechnik", DASSOW J., Kunststoffe, CARL HANSER VERLAG, (200209), vol. 92, pages 105 - 109 |