EP1748104 - A SPEED GOVERNOR FOR ELEVATORS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2007/05] | CABLE AND BELT FOR A LIFT SPEED LIMITER AND ASSOCIATED PULLEYS | ||
[2011/31] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.12.2012 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.07.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 20.08.2014 [2014/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ORONA S. COOP. Polígono Lastaola s/n 20120 Hernani (Guipúzcoa) / ES | [N/P] |
Former [2007/15] | For all designated states ORONA, S. COOP. Poligono Lastaola, s/n 20120 Hernani (Guipuzcoa) / ES | ||
Former [2007/05] | For all designated states Coop, Orona S. Poligono Lastaola, s/n E-20120 Hernani (Guipuzcoa) / ES | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ARANBURU AGIRRE, Iñaki ORONA EIC S.COOP Poligono Lastaola, s/n E-20120 HERNANI (Guipuzcoa) / ES | 02 /
MADOZ MICHAUS, Miguel, Angel ORONA EIC S.COOP Poligono Lastaola, s/n E-20120 HERNANI (Guipuzcoa) / ES | 03 /
PAGALDAY ERAÑA, Juan, Manuel IKERLAN S COOP PJM Arizmendiarrieta 2 E-20500 Arrasate-Mondragon (Guipuzcoa) / ES | [2012/07] |
Former [2007/15] | 01 /
ARANBURU AGIRRE, Iñaki ORONA EIC S COOP Poligono Lastaola, s/n E-20120 HERNANI (Guipuzcoa) / ES | ||
02 /
MADOZ MICHAUS, Miguel, Angel ORONA EIC S COOP Poligono Lastaola, s/n E-20120 HERNANI (Guipuzcoa) / ES | |||
03 /
PAGALDAY ERAÑA, Juan, Manuel IKERLAN S COOP PJM Arizmendiarrieta 2 E-20500 Arrasate-Mondragon (Guipuzcoa) / ES | |||
Former [2007/05] | 01 /
ARANBURU AGIRRE, Iñaki Poligono Lastaola, s/n E-20120 HERNANI (Guipuzcoa) / ES | ||
02 /
MADOZ MICHAUS, Miguel, Angel Poligono Lastaola, s/n E-20120 HERNANI (Guipuzcoa) / ES | |||
03 /
PAGALDAY ERAÑA, Juan, Manuel IKERLAN S COOP PJM Arizmendiarrieta 2 E-20500 Arrasate-Mondragon (Guipuzcoa) / ES | Representative(s) | Carpintero Lopez, Francisco, et al Herrero & Asociados, S.L. Agustín de Foxá, 4-10 28036 Madrid / ES | [N/P] |
Former [2007/05] | Carpintero Lopez, Francisco, et al Herrero & Asociados, S.L., Alcalá, 35 28014 Madrid / ES | Application number, filing date | 04742059.1 | 12.07.2004 | [2007/05] | WO2004ES00331 | Priority number, date | ES20040001118 | 10.05.2004 Original published format: ES 200401118 | [2007/05] | Filing language | ES | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005108672 | Date: | 17.11.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/46] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1748104 | Date: | 31.01.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.11.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/05] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1748104 | Date: | 22.02.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/08] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | ES | 17.11.2005 | Classification | IPC: | D07B1/16, D07B1/22, B66B7/06 | [2007/05] | CPC: |
D07B1/22 (EP,ES,KR,US);
D07B1/16 (EP,ES,KR,US);
B66B7/06 (EP,ES,KR,US);
B66B5/04 (EP,KR,US);
B66B5/18 (EP);
D07B2201/1008 (EP,KR,US);
D07B2201/2055 (EP,KR,US);
D07B2201/2061 (EP,KR,US);
D07B2205/205 (EP,US);
D07B2501/2007 (EP,KR,US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
D07B2201/2055, D07B2801/24 (EP,US);
D07B2201/2061, D07B2801/24 (US,EP);
D07B2205/205, D07B2801/14 (US,EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/05] | Title | German: | GESCHWINDIGKEITSREGLER FÜR AUFZÜGE | [2011/31] | English: | A SPEED GOVERNOR FOR ELEVATORS | [2011/31] | French: | RÉGULATEUR DE VITESSE D'ASCENSEURS | [2011/31] |
Former [2007/05] | KABEL UND RIEMEN FÜR FAHRKORBGESCHWINDIGKEITSSBEGRENZER SOWIE ZUGEHÖRIGE TREIBSCHEIBEN | ||
Former [2007/05] | CABLE AND BELT FOR A LIFT SPEED LIMITER AND ASSOCIATED PULLEYS | ||
Former [2007/05] | CABLE ET COURROIE POUR LIMITATEUR DE VITESSES D'ASCENSEURS ET POULIES ASSOCIEES | Entry into regional phase | 04.12.2006 | Translation filed | 04.12.2006 | National basic fee paid | 04.12.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.12.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.12.2006 | Examination requested [2007/05] | 25.07.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 02.01.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.11.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.01.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.09.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.01.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 10.01.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 25.07.2007 | Opposition(s) | 23.11.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/05] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.12.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.07.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.07.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 26.07.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 26.07.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 12.07.2004 | AT | 22.02.2012 | BE | 22.02.2012 | CY | 22.02.2012 | CZ | 22.02.2012 | DK | 22.02.2012 | EE | 22.02.2012 | FI | 22.02.2012 | NL | 22.02.2012 | PL | 22.02.2012 | RO | 22.02.2012 | SE | 22.02.2012 | SI | 22.02.2012 | SK | 22.02.2012 | TR | 22.02.2012 | BG | 22.05.2012 | GR | 23.05.2012 | LU | 12.07.2012 | CH | 31.07.2012 | LI | 31.07.2012 | MC | 31.07.2012 | [2014/34] |
Former [2014/27] | AT | 22.02.2012 | |
BE | 22.02.2012 | ||
CY | 22.02.2012 | ||
CZ | 22.02.2012 | ||
DK | 22.02.2012 | ||
EE | 22.02.2012 | ||
FI | 22.02.2012 | ||
NL | 22.02.2012 | ||
PL | 22.02.2012 | ||
RO | 22.02.2012 | ||
SE | 22.02.2012 | ||
SI | 22.02.2012 | ||
SK | 22.02.2012 | ||
TR | 22.02.2012 | ||
BG | 22.05.2012 | ||
GR | 23.05.2012 | ||
LU | 12.07.2012 | ||
CH | 31.07.2012 | ||
LI | 31.07.2012 | ||
MC | 31.07.2012 | ||
Former [2014/21] | AT | 22.02.2012 | |
BE | 22.02.2012 | ||
CY | 22.02.2012 | ||
CZ | 22.02.2012 | ||
DK | 22.02.2012 | ||
EE | 22.02.2012 | ||
FI | 22.02.2012 | ||
NL | 22.02.2012 | ||
PL | 22.02.2012 | ||
RO | 22.02.2012 | ||
SE | 22.02.2012 | ||
SI | 22.02.2012 | ||
SK | 22.02.2012 | ||
TR | 22.02.2012 | ||
BG | 22.05.2012 | ||
GR | 23.05.2012 | ||
CH | 31.07.2012 | ||
LI | 31.07.2012 | ||
MC | 31.07.2012 | ||
Former [2013/33] | AT | 22.02.2012 | |
BE | 22.02.2012 | ||
CY | 22.02.2012 | ||
CZ | 22.02.2012 | ||
DK | 22.02.2012 | ||
EE | 22.02.2012 | ||
FI | 22.02.2012 | ||
NL | 22.02.2012 | ||
PL | 22.02.2012 | ||
RO | 22.02.2012 | ||
SE | 22.02.2012 | ||
SI | 22.02.2012 | ||
SK | 22.02.2012 | ||
BG | 22.05.2012 | ||
GR | 23.05.2012 | ||
CH | 31.07.2012 | ||
LI | 31.07.2012 | ||
MC | 31.07.2012 | ||
Former [2013/20] | AT | 22.02.2012 | |
BE | 22.02.2012 | ||
CY | 22.02.2012 | ||
CZ | 22.02.2012 | ||
DK | 22.02.2012 | ||
EE | 22.02.2012 | ||
FI | 22.02.2012 | ||
NL | 22.02.2012 | ||
PL | 22.02.2012 | ||
RO | 22.02.2012 | ||
SE | 22.02.2012 | ||
SI | 22.02.2012 | ||
SK | 22.02.2012 | ||
GR | 23.05.2012 | ||
CH | 31.07.2012 | ||
LI | 31.07.2012 | ||
MC | 31.07.2012 | ||
Former [2013/11] | AT | 22.02.2012 | |
BE | 22.02.2012 | ||
CY | 22.02.2012 | ||
CZ | 22.02.2012 | ||
DK | 22.02.2012 | ||
EE | 22.02.2012 | ||
FI | 22.02.2012 | ||
NL | 22.02.2012 | ||
PL | 22.02.2012 | ||
RO | 22.02.2012 | ||
SE | 22.02.2012 | ||
SI | 22.02.2012 | ||
SK | 22.02.2012 | ||
GR | 23.05.2012 | ||
MC | 31.07.2012 | ||
Former [2013/07] | AT | 22.02.2012 | |
BE | 22.02.2012 | ||
CY | 22.02.2012 | ||
CZ | 22.02.2012 | ||
DK | 22.02.2012 | ||
EE | 22.02.2012 | ||
FI | 22.02.2012 | ||
NL | 22.02.2012 | ||
PL | 22.02.2012 | ||
RO | 22.02.2012 | ||
SE | 22.02.2012 | ||
SI | 22.02.2012 | ||
SK | 22.02.2012 | ||
GR | 23.05.2012 | ||
Former [2012/50] | BE | 22.02.2012 | |
CY | 22.02.2012 | ||
CZ | 22.02.2012 | ||
DK | 22.02.2012 | ||
EE | 22.02.2012 | ||
FI | 22.02.2012 | ||
NL | 22.02.2012 | ||
PL | 22.02.2012 | ||
RO | 22.02.2012 | ||
SE | 22.02.2012 | ||
SI | 22.02.2012 | ||
SK | 22.02.2012 | ||
GR | 23.05.2012 | ||
Former [2012/49] | BE | 22.02.2012 | |
CY | 22.02.2012 | ||
CZ | 22.02.2012 | ||
DK | 22.02.2012 | ||
EE | 22.02.2012 | ||
FI | 22.02.2012 | ||
NL | 22.02.2012 | ||
PL | 22.02.2012 | ||
RO | 22.02.2012 | ||
SE | 22.02.2012 | ||
SI | 22.02.2012 | ||
GR | 23.05.2012 | ||
Former [2012/48] | BE | 22.02.2012 | |
CY | 22.02.2012 | ||
EE | 22.02.2012 | ||
FI | 22.02.2012 | ||
NL | 22.02.2012 | ||
SE | 22.02.2012 | ||
GR | 23.05.2012 | ||
Former [2012/41] | BE | 22.02.2012 | |
CY | 22.02.2012 | ||
FI | 22.02.2012 | ||
NL | 22.02.2012 | ||
GR | 23.05.2012 | ||
Former [2012/37] | BE | 22.02.2012 | |
FI | 22.02.2012 | ||
NL | 22.02.2012 | ||
GR | 23.05.2012 | ||
Former [2012/36] | NL | 22.02.2012 | |
GR | 23.05.2012 | ||
Former [2012/35] | NL | 22.02.2012 | Cited in | International search | [A]JPH0921084 ; | [A]US4202164 (DYKEMAN FRED E [US], et al); | [A]US6364061 (BARANDA PEDRO S [US], et al); | [A]DE10215419 (OSMA AUFZUEGE ALBERT SCHENK GM [DE]) | Examination | EP1213250 | by applicant | JPH0921084 | EP1213250 | DE10215419 |