EP1762004 - FREQUENCY SYNTHESIZER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.11.2011 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.10.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 06.11.2013 [2013/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nokia Siemens Networks Oy Karaportti 3 02610 Espoo / FI | [2008/08] |
Former [2007/11] | For all designated states Nokia Corporation Keilalahdentie 4 02150 Espoo / FI | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MATTILA, Tomi Antreantie 19 E FI-02140 Espoo / FI | 02 /
JAAKKOLA, Olli Maistraatinkatu 5 B 55 FI-00240 Helsinki / FI | 03 /
KAAJAKARI, Ville Kivenlahdenkatu 11 A 4 FI-02320 Espoo / FI | 04 /
OJA, Aarne Hempontie 6 B FI-02660 Espoo / FI | 05 /
SEPPÄ, Heikki Partiotie 26 FI-00370 Helsinki / FI | [2007/11] | Representative(s) | Borgström, Markus, et al Nokia Solutions and Networks Management International GmbH NET T&I IPR St-Martin-Strasse 76 81541 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2010/31] | Borgström, Markus, et al Nokia Siemens Networks GmbH & Co. KG CEF CTO IPR / Patent Administration 80240 München / DE | ||
Former [2008/43] | Valkeiskangas, Tapio Lassi Paavali, et al Kolster Oy Ab Iso Roobertinkatu 23 P.O. Box 148 00121 Helsinki / FI | ||
Former [2007/11] | Järveläinen, Pertti Tauno Juhani, et al Heinänen Oy Annankatu 31-33 C 00100 Helsinki / FI | Application number, filing date | 04742127.6 | 24.06.2004 | [2007/11] | WO2004FI00384 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006000611 | Date: | 05.01.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/01] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1762004 | Date: | 14.03.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.01.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/11] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1762004 | Date: | 05.01.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/01] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 05.01.2006 | Classification | IPC: | H03L1/02, H03L7/18, H03L7/197 | [2007/11] | CPC: |
H03L7/1976 (EP,US);
G01K7/32 (EP,US);
H03L1/026 (EP,US);
H03L1/027 (EP,US);
H03L7/085 (EP,US);
H03L7/197 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/11] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | FREQUENZSYNTHESIZER | [2007/11] | English: | FREQUENCY SYNTHESIZER | [2007/11] | French: | SYNTHETISEUR DE FREQUENCES | [2007/11] | Entry into regional phase | 15.12.2006 | National basic fee paid | 15.12.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.12.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.12.2006 | Examination requested [2007/11] | 20.02.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.06.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.08.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.12.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.04.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.08.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.09.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.11.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 22.11.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 06.10.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.12.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.06.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.06.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 16.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.06.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 05.01.2011 | BE | 05.01.2011 | CY | 05.01.2011 | CZ | 05.01.2011 | DK | 05.01.2011 | EE | 05.01.2011 | FI | 05.01.2011 | HU | 05.01.2011 | IT | 05.01.2011 | NL | 05.01.2011 | PL | 05.01.2011 | RO | 05.01.2011 | SE | 05.01.2011 | SI | 05.01.2011 | SK | 05.01.2011 | TR | 05.01.2011 | BG | 05.04.2011 | GR | 06.04.2011 | ES | 16.04.2011 | PT | 05.05.2011 | IE | 24.06.2011 | LU | 24.06.2011 | CH | 30.06.2011 | FR | 30.06.2011 | LI | 30.06.2011 | MC | 30.06.2011 | [2013/45] |
Former [2013/44] | AT | 05.01.2011 | |
BE | 05.01.2011 | ||
CY | 05.01.2011 | ||
CZ | 05.01.2011 | ||
DK | 05.01.2011 | ||
EE | 05.01.2011 | ||
FI | 05.01.2011 | ||
IT | 05.01.2011 | ||
NL | 05.01.2011 | ||
PL | 05.01.2011 | ||
RO | 05.01.2011 | ||
SE | 05.01.2011 | ||
SI | 05.01.2011 | ||
SK | 05.01.2011 | ||
TR | 05.01.2011 | ||
BG | 05.04.2011 | ||
GR | 06.04.2011 | ||
ES | 16.04.2011 | ||
PT | 05.05.2011 | ||
IE | 24.06.2011 | ||
LU | 24.06.2011 | ||
CH | 30.06.2011 | ||
FR | 30.06.2011 | ||
LI | 30.06.2011 | ||
MC | 30.06.2011 | ||
Former [2013/25] | AT | 05.01.2011 | |
BE | 05.01.2011 | ||
CY | 05.01.2011 | ||
CZ | 05.01.2011 | ||
DK | 05.01.2011 | ||
EE | 05.01.2011 | ||
FI | 05.01.2011 | ||
IT | 05.01.2011 | ||
NL | 05.01.2011 | ||
PL | 05.01.2011 | ||
RO | 05.01.2011 | ||
SE | 05.01.2011 | ||
SI | 05.01.2011 | ||
SK | 05.01.2011 | ||
BG | 05.04.2011 | ||
GR | 06.04.2011 | ||
ES | 16.04.2011 | ||
PT | 05.05.2011 | ||
IE | 24.06.2011 | ||
LU | 24.06.2011 | ||
CH | 30.06.2011 | ||
FR | 30.06.2011 | ||
LI | 30.06.2011 | ||
MC | 30.06.2011 | ||
Former [2013/21] | AT | 05.01.2011 | |
BE | 05.01.2011 | ||
CY | 05.01.2011 | ||
CZ | 05.01.2011 | ||
DK | 05.01.2011 | ||
EE | 05.01.2011 | ||
FI | 05.01.2011 | ||
IT | 05.01.2011 | ||
NL | 05.01.2011 | ||
PL | 05.01.2011 | ||
RO | 05.01.2011 | ||
SE | 05.01.2011 | ||
SI | 05.01.2011 | ||
SK | 05.01.2011 | ||
BG | 05.04.2011 | ||
GR | 06.04.2011 | ||
ES | 16.04.2011 | ||
PT | 05.05.2011 | ||
IE | 24.06.2011 | ||
CH | 30.06.2011 | ||
FR | 30.06.2011 | ||
LI | 30.06.2011 | ||
MC | 30.06.2011 | ||
Former [2012/23] | AT | 05.01.2011 | |
BE | 05.01.2011 | ||
CY | 05.01.2011 | ||
CZ | 05.01.2011 | ||
DK | 05.01.2011 | ||
EE | 05.01.2011 | ||
FI | 05.01.2011 | ||
IT | 05.01.2011 | ||
NL | 05.01.2011 | ||
PL | 05.01.2011 | ||
RO | 05.01.2011 | ||
SE | 05.01.2011 | ||
SI | 05.01.2011 | ||
SK | 05.01.2011 | ||
BG | 05.04.2011 | ||
GR | 06.04.2011 | ||
ES | 16.04.2011 | ||
PT | 05.05.2011 | ||
IE | 24.06.2011 | ||
CH | 30.06.2011 | ||
FR | 30.06.2011 | ||
LI | 30.06.2011 | ||
Former [2012/20] | AT | 05.01.2011 | |
BE | 05.01.2011 | ||
CY | 05.01.2011 | ||
CZ | 05.01.2011 | ||
DK | 05.01.2011 | ||
EE | 05.01.2011 | ||
FI | 05.01.2011 | ||
IT | 05.01.2011 | ||
NL | 05.01.2011 | ||
PL | 05.01.2011 | ||
RO | 05.01.2011 | ||
SE | 05.01.2011 | ||
SI | 05.01.2011 | ||
SK | 05.01.2011 | ||
BG | 05.04.2011 | ||
GR | 06.04.2011 | ||
ES | 16.04.2011 | ||
PT | 05.05.2011 | ||
IE | 24.06.2011 | ||
CH | 30.06.2011 | ||
LI | 30.06.2011 | ||
Former [2012/03] | AT | 05.01.2011 | |
BE | 05.01.2011 | ||
CY | 05.01.2011 | ||
CZ | 05.01.2011 | ||
DK | 05.01.2011 | ||
EE | 05.01.2011 | ||
FI | 05.01.2011 | ||
IT | 05.01.2011 | ||
NL | 05.01.2011 | ||
PL | 05.01.2011 | ||
RO | 05.01.2011 | ||
SE | 05.01.2011 | ||
SI | 05.01.2011 | ||
SK | 05.01.2011 | ||
BG | 05.04.2011 | ||
GR | 06.04.2011 | ||
ES | 16.04.2011 | ||
PT | 05.05.2011 | ||
Former [2011/49] | AT | 05.01.2011 | |
BE | 05.01.2011 | ||
CY | 05.01.2011 | ||
CZ | 05.01.2011 | ||
DK | 05.01.2011 | ||
EE | 05.01.2011 | ||
FI | 05.01.2011 | ||
NL | 05.01.2011 | ||
PL | 05.01.2011 | ||
RO | 05.01.2011 | ||
SE | 05.01.2011 | ||
SI | 05.01.2011 | ||
SK | 05.01.2011 | ||
BG | 05.04.2011 | ||
GR | 06.04.2011 | ||
ES | 16.04.2011 | ||
PT | 05.05.2011 | ||
Former [2011/47] | AT | 05.01.2011 | |
BE | 05.01.2011 | ||
CY | 05.01.2011 | ||
DK | 05.01.2011 | ||
EE | 05.01.2011 | ||
FI | 05.01.2011 | ||
NL | 05.01.2011 | ||
PL | 05.01.2011 | ||
SE | 05.01.2011 | ||
SI | 05.01.2011 | ||
BG | 05.04.2011 | ||
GR | 06.04.2011 | ||
ES | 16.04.2011 | ||
PT | 05.05.2011 | ||
Former [2011/40] | AT | 05.01.2011 | |
BE | 05.01.2011 | ||
CY | 05.01.2011 | ||
FI | 05.01.2011 | ||
NL | 05.01.2011 | ||
PL | 05.01.2011 | ||
SE | 05.01.2011 | ||
SI | 05.01.2011 | ||
BG | 05.04.2011 | ||
GR | 06.04.2011 | ||
ES | 16.04.2011 | ||
PT | 05.05.2011 | ||
Former [2011/37] | BE | 05.01.2011 | |
CY | 05.01.2011 | ||
FI | 05.01.2011 | ||
PL | 05.01.2011 | ||
SE | 05.01.2011 | ||
SI | 05.01.2011 | ||
BG | 05.04.2011 | ||
GR | 06.04.2011 | ||
ES | 16.04.2011 | ||
PT | 05.05.2011 | ||
Former [2011/36] | PL | 05.01.2011 | |
SE | 05.01.2011 | ||
SI | 05.01.2011 | ||
GR | 06.04.2011 | ||
ES | 16.04.2011 | ||
PT | 05.05.2011 | ||
Former [2011/35] | SE | 05.01.2011 | |
SI | 05.01.2011 | ||
GR | 06.04.2011 | ||
ES | 16.04.2011 | ||
PT | 05.05.2011 | ||
Former [2011/32] | SI | 05.01.2011 | |
ES | 16.04.2011 | Cited in | International search | [A]WO9315555 (MOTOROLA INC [US]); | [A]US5604468 (GILLIG STEVEN F [US]); | [A]US6278337 (CHAN TSIU CHIU [US], et al); | [A] - KAAJAKARI V. ET L., "Square-extensional mode single-crystal silicon micromechanical RF-resonator", TRANSDUCERS 03, THE 12TH INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON SOLID STATE SENSORS, ACTUATORS AND MICROSYSTMS, BOXTON, (20030608), pages 951 - 954, XP010647855 | [A] - DOMINGUEZ M. ET AL., "A sigma-delta digital oscillator for MEMS", PROC OF IEEE SENSORS, (20031022), vol. 2, pages 834 - 838, XP010691026 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/ICSENS.2003.1279060 | by applicant | US5604468 | - KAAJAKARI, V.; MATTILA, T.; OJA, A.; KIIHAMAKI, J.; KATTELUS, H.; KOSKENVUORI, M.; RANTAKARI, P.; TITTONEN, I.; SEPPA, H, TRANSDUCERS, SOLID-STATE SENSORS, ACTUATORS AND MICROSYSTEMS, 12TH INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON, 2003, (20030608), vol. 2, pages 951 - 954 |