EP1603778 - SHOCK ABSORBER STOP FOR A MOTOR VEHICLE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.06.2007 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.09.2009 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 28.10.2009 [2009/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Renault s.a.s. 13-15 Quai Alphonse Le Gallo 92100 Boulogne Billancourt / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2005/50] | For all designated states Renault s.a.s. 13-15 Quai Alphonse Le Gallo 92100 Boulogne Billancourt / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GIRARDI, Lionel 3, rue des Marchands F-78310 Coignières / FR | 02 /
MANGOLD, Manuel 101 New Hyundai Villa, 12-74 Banbae-dong-Seocho gu Seoul / KR | 03 /
SEYRANIAN, Chaene, Serge 1, rue de Feuillaumes F-78920 Ecquevilly / FR | [2005/50] | Application number, filing date | 04742271.2 | 17.03.2004 | [2005/50] | WO2004FR00653 | Priority number, date | FR20030003256 | 17.03.2003 Original published format: FR 0303256 | [2005/50] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004083009 | Date: | 30.09.2004 | Language: | FR | [2004/40] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1603778 | Date: | 14.12.2005 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.09.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/50] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1603778 | Date: | 16.08.2006 | Language: | FR | [2006/33] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 30.09.2004 | Classification | IPC: | B60R21/34 | [2005/50] | CPC: |
E05F5/022 (EP);
B60R21/34 (EP);
B60R2021/343 (EP);
E05Y2900/536 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/50] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | STOSSDÄMPFERANSCHLAG FÜR EIN KRAFTFAHRZEUG | [2005/50] | English: | SHOCK ABSORBER STOP FOR A MOTOR VEHICLE | [2005/50] | French: | BUTEE D 'ABSORPTION DE CHOC POUR VEHICULE AUTOMOBILE | [2005/50] | Entry into regional phase | 01.09.2005 | National basic fee paid | 01.09.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 01.09.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.09.2005 | Examination requested [2005/50] | 21.12.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.02.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.04.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.06.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 26.06.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 18.05.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 16.08.2006 | CY | 16.08.2006 | CZ | 16.08.2006 | EE | 16.08.2006 | FI | 16.08.2006 | IE | 16.08.2006 | IT | 16.08.2006 | NL | 16.08.2006 | PL | 16.08.2006 | RO | 16.08.2006 | SI | 16.08.2006 | SK | 16.08.2006 | TR | 16.08.2006 | BG | 16.11.2006 | DK | 16.11.2006 | SE | 16.11.2006 | GR | 17.11.2006 | PT | 16.01.2007 | HU | 17.02.2007 | LU | 17.03.2007 | BE | 31.03.2007 | MC | 31.03.2007 | FR | 02.04.2007 | [2009/44] |
Former [2009/41] | AT | 16.08.2006 | |
CY | 16.08.2006 | ||
CZ | 16.08.2006 | ||
EE | 16.08.2006 | ||
FI | 16.08.2006 | ||
IE | 16.08.2006 | ||
IT | 16.08.2006 | ||
NL | 16.08.2006 | ||
PL | 16.08.2006 | ||
RO | 16.08.2006 | ||
SI | 16.08.2006 | ||
SK | 16.08.2006 | ||
BG | 16.11.2006 | ||
DK | 16.11.2006 | ||
SE | 16.11.2006 | ||
GR | 17.11.2006 | ||
PT | 16.01.2007 | ||
HU | 17.02.2007 | ||
LU | 17.03.2007 | ||
BE | 31.03.2007 | ||
MC | 31.03.2007 | ||
FR | 02.04.2007 | ||
Former [2008/38] | AT | 16.08.2006 | |
CZ | 16.08.2006 | ||
EE | 16.08.2006 | ||
FI | 16.08.2006 | ||
IE | 16.08.2006 | ||
IT | 16.08.2006 | ||
NL | 16.08.2006 | ||
PL | 16.08.2006 | ||
RO | 16.08.2006 | ||
SI | 16.08.2006 | ||
SK | 16.08.2006 | ||
BG | 16.11.2006 | ||
DK | 16.11.2006 | ||
SE | 16.11.2006 | ||
GR | 17.11.2006 | ||
PT | 16.01.2007 | ||
BE | 31.03.2007 | ||
MC | 31.03.2007 | ||
FR | 02.04.2007 | ||
Former [2008/32] | AT | 16.08.2006 | |
CZ | 16.08.2006 | ||
FI | 16.08.2006 | ||
IE | 16.08.2006 | ||
IT | 16.08.2006 | ||
NL | 16.08.2006 | ||
PL | 16.08.2006 | ||
RO | 16.08.2006 | ||
SI | 16.08.2006 | ||
SK | 16.08.2006 | ||
BG | 16.11.2006 | ||
DK | 16.11.2006 | ||
SE | 16.11.2006 | ||
GR | 17.11.2006 | ||
PT | 16.01.2007 | ||
BE | 31.03.2007 | ||
MC | 31.03.2007 | ||
FR | 02.04.2007 | ||
Former [2008/21] | AT | 16.08.2006 | |
CZ | 16.08.2006 | ||
FI | 16.08.2006 | ||
IE | 16.08.2006 | ||
IT | 16.08.2006 | ||
NL | 16.08.2006 | ||
PL | 16.08.2006 | ||
RO | 16.08.2006 | ||
SI | 16.08.2006 | ||
SK | 16.08.2006 | ||
BG | 16.11.2006 | ||
DK | 16.11.2006 | ||
SE | 16.11.2006 | ||
GR | 17.11.2006 | ||
PT | 16.01.2007 | ||
BE | 31.03.2007 | ||
MC | 31.03.2007 | ||
Former [2008/11] | AT | 16.08.2006 | |
CZ | 16.08.2006 | ||
FI | 16.08.2006 | ||
IE | 16.08.2006 | ||
IT | 16.08.2006 | ||
NL | 16.08.2006 | ||
PL | 16.08.2006 | ||
RO | 16.08.2006 | ||
SI | 16.08.2006 | ||
SK | 16.08.2006 | ||
BG | 16.11.2006 | ||
DK | 16.11.2006 | ||
SE | 16.11.2006 | ||
PT | 16.01.2007 | ||
BE | 31.03.2007 | ||
MC | 31.03.2007 | ||
Former [2008/04] | AT | 16.08.2006 | |
CZ | 16.08.2006 | ||
FI | 16.08.2006 | ||
IE | 16.08.2006 | ||
IT | 16.08.2006 | ||
NL | 16.08.2006 | ||
PL | 16.08.2006 | ||
RO | 16.08.2006 | ||
SI | 16.08.2006 | ||
SK | 16.08.2006 | ||
BG | 16.11.2006 | ||
DK | 16.11.2006 | ||
SE | 16.11.2006 | ||
PT | 16.01.2007 | ||
BE | 31.03.2007 | ||
Former [2007/43] | AT | 16.08.2006 | |
CZ | 16.08.2006 | ||
FI | 16.08.2006 | ||
IE | 16.08.2006 | ||
IT | 16.08.2006 | ||
NL | 16.08.2006 | ||
PL | 16.08.2006 | ||
RO | 16.08.2006 | ||
SI | 16.08.2006 | ||
SK | 16.08.2006 | ||
BG | 16.11.2006 | ||
DK | 16.11.2006 | ||
SE | 16.11.2006 | ||
PT | 16.01.2007 | ||
Former [2007/27] | AT | 16.08.2006 | |
CZ | 16.08.2006 | ||
FI | 16.08.2006 | ||
IE | 16.08.2006 | ||
NL | 16.08.2006 | ||
PL | 16.08.2006 | ||
SI | 16.08.2006 | ||
SK | 16.08.2006 | ||
BG | 16.11.2006 | ||
DK | 16.11.2006 | ||
SE | 16.11.2006 | ||
PT | 16.01.2007 | ||
Former [2007/23] | AT | 16.08.2006 | |
CZ | 16.08.2006 | ||
FI | 16.08.2006 | ||
NL | 16.08.2006 | ||
PL | 16.08.2006 | ||
SI | 16.08.2006 | ||
BG | 16.11.2006 | ||
DK | 16.11.2006 | ||
SE | 16.11.2006 | ||
Former [2007/22] | CZ | 16.08.2006 | |
FI | 16.08.2006 | ||
NL | 16.08.2006 | ||
PL | 16.08.2006 | ||
SI | 16.08.2006 | ||
BG | 16.11.2006 | ||
DK | 16.11.2006 | ||
SE | 16.11.2006 | ||
Former [2007/21] | FI | 16.08.2006 | |
NL | 16.08.2006 | ||
PL | 16.08.2006 | ||
SI | 16.08.2006 | ||
BG | 16.11.2006 | ||
SE | 16.11.2006 | ||
Former [2007/15] | FI | 16.08.2006 | |
PL | 16.08.2006 | ||
SI | 16.08.2006 | ||
BG | 16.11.2006 | ||
SE | 16.11.2006 | Cited in | International search | [DA]EP1104726 (VOLKSWAGEN AG [DE]) [DA] 1-11 * the whole document *; | [X]EP1118530 (MAZDA MOTOR [JP]) [X] 1-3,10,11 * abstract * * column 5, line 20 - line 37 *; | [A]DE10116284 (VOLKSWAGEN AG [DE]) [A] 1,11* the whole document *; | [PX]EP1375266 (ACTS ADV CAR TECH SYS GMBH [DE]) [PX] 1-3,11 * paragraph [0029] - paragraph [0038]; figures 1-5 * |