EP1636978 - SYSTEM FOR THE DIGITAL PROCESSING OF AN ACOUSTIC OR ELECTRICAL SIGNAL, AND TELEPHONE SET PROVIDED WITH SUCH A PROCESSING SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 28.11.2014 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.11.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 31.12.2014 [2015/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Chartoleaux KG Limited Liability Company 2711 Centerville Rd, Suite 400 Wilmington, DE 19808 / US | [2009/43] |
Former [2006/12] | For all designated states FRANCE TELECOM 6 Place d'Alleray 75015 Paris / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LE TOURNEUR, Grégoire Ker Noel F-22700 St-Quay-Perros / FR | 02 /
CHANY, Patrick 8, rue Léon Dubreuil F-22700 Perros Guirec / FR | [2006/12] | Representative(s) | Ablett, Graham Keith Ablett & Stebbing 7-8 Market Place London, W1W 8AG / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2010/24] | Ablett, Graham Keith Ablett & Stebbing Caparo House 101-103 Baker Street London, W1U 6FQ / GB | ||
Former [2009/43] | Loisel, Bertrand, et al Cabinet Plasseraud 52 rue de la Victoire 75440 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | ||
Former [2008/35] | Loisel, Bertrand Cabinet Plasseraud 52 rue de la Victoire 75440 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | ||
Former [2006/12] | Loisel, Bertrand Cabinet Plasseraud 65/67, rue de la Victoire F-75440 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | Application number, filing date | 04742583.0 | 27.04.2004 | [2006/12] | WO2004FR01016 | Priority number, date | FR20030007635 | 24.06.2003 Original published format: FR 0307635 | [2006/12] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005011248 | Date: | 03.02.2005 | Language: | FR | [2005/05] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1636978 | Date: | 22.03.2006 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.02.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/12] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 03.02.2005 | Classification | IPC: | H04M9/08 | [2006/12] | CPC: |
H04M9/082 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/12] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | DIGITALES VERARBEITUNGSSYSTEM EINES AKUSTISCHEN/ELEKTRISCHEN SIGNALS UND TELEFONAPPARAT DAZU | [2006/12] | English: | SYSTEM FOR THE DIGITAL PROCESSING OF AN ACOUSTIC OR ELECTRICAL SIGNAL, AND TELEPHONE SET PROVIDED WITH SUCH A PROCESSING SYSTEM | [2006/12] | French: | SYSTEME DE TRAITEMENT NUMERIQUE D'UN SIGNAL ACOUSTIQUE OU ELECTRIQUE ET POSTE TELEPHONIQUE EQUIPE D'UN TEL SYSTEME DE TRAITEMENT | [2006/12] | Entry into regional phase | 18.11.2005 | National basic fee paid | 18.11.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.11.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.11.2005 | Examination requested [2006/12] | 05.07.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 07.01.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.03.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.07.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/01] | 27.08.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2015/01] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 05.07.2010 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.04.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.04.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 07.04.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 15.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 06.04.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 19.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 26.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2014 | 11   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US2002076037 (NISHIMURA EIICHI [JP]) [X] 1-11 * abstract * * paragraphs [0004] , [0007] , [0009] , [0026] , [0030] , [0034] , [0036] - [0047] - [0050] *; | [A]US6381224 (LANE JOHN EUGENE [US], et al) [A] 1-11 * abstract *; | [A]US5657384 (STAUDACHER DANIEL W [US], et al) [A] 1-11 * abstract *; | [A]US5353348 (SENDYK ANDRZEJ [CA], et al) [A] 1-11 * abstract *; | [A] - HEITKAEMPER P ED - INSTITUTE OF ELECTRICAL AND ELECTRONICS ENGINEERS, "OPTIMIZATION OF AN ACOUSTIC ECHO CANCELLER COMBINED WITH ADAPTIVE GAIN CONTROL", PROCEEDINGS OF THE INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON ACOUSTICS, SPEECH, AND SIGNAL PROCESSING (ICASSP). DETROIT, MAY 9 - 12, 1995. SPECIAL SESSIONS/ AUDIO AND ELECTROACOUSTICS/ UNDERWATER ACOUSTIC SIGNAL PROCESSING/ VERY LARGE SCALE INTEGRATION FOR SIGNAL, (19950509), VOL. 5 CONF. 20, ISBN 0-7803-2432-3, pages 3047 - 3050, XP000534725 [A] 1-11 * the whole document * | Examination | US4600815 |