EP1631447 - INSTALLATION FOR THE PRODUCTION OF A SOLID PRODUCT FROM A POWDERED MATERIAL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 14.09.2012 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.09.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 17.10.2012 [2012/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Medelco 33, avenue Arsène d'Arsonval 01000 Bourg en Bresse / FR | [2006/10] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MERCADO, Henri 220, rue Clément Ader F-01000 Saint Denis les Bourg / FR | [2006/10] | Representative(s) | Vuillermoz, Bruno, et al Cabinet Laurent & Charras "Le Contemporain" 50, Chemin de la Bruyère 69574 Dardilly Cédex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2008/33] | Vuillermoz, Bruno, et al Cabinet Laurent & Charras "Le Contemporain" 50, Chemin de la Bruyère 69574 Dardilly Cédex / FR | ||
Former [2006/10] | Vuillermoz, Bruno Cabinet Laurent & Charras 20 Rue Louis Chirpaz BP 32 69131 Ecully / FR | Application number, filing date | 04742794.3 | 19.05.2004 | [2006/10] | WO2004FR01251 | Priority number, date | FR20030006032 | 20.05.2003 Original published format: FR 0306032 | [2006/10] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004103689 | Date: | 02.12.2004 | Language: | FR | [2004/49] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1631447 | Date: | 08.03.2006 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.12.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/10] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 02.12.2004 | Classification | IPC: | B30B1/26, B30B1/28, B30B11/02, F16H53/04 | [2006/10] | CPC: |
B30B11/04 (EP,US);
B30B1/261 (EP,US);
B30B1/28 (EP,US);
B30B11/007 (EP,US);
B30B11/027 (EP,US);
B30B15/302 (EP,US);
F16H53/04 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/10] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ANLAGE ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES FESTEN PRODUKTES AUS EINEM PULVERFÖRMIGEN ROHSTOFF | [2006/10] | English: | INSTALLATION FOR THE PRODUCTION OF A SOLID PRODUCT FROM A POWDERED MATERIAL | [2006/10] | French: | INSTALLATION POUR LA REALISATION D'UN PRODUIT SOLIDE A PARTIR D'UN MATERIAU PULVERULENT | [2006/10] | Entry into regional phase | 14.11.2005 | National basic fee paid | 14.11.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.11.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.11.2005 | Examination requested [2006/10] | 27.12.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 22.09.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.10.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.04.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2012/42] | 31.05.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2012/42] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 27.12.2006 | Request for further processing for: | 22.09.2007 | Request for further processing filed | 22.09.2007 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 11.10.2007 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.11.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.04.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.05.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.05.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 24.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2012 | 09   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [YD]FR2791602 (MEDELCO [FR]) [YD] 1-5,8,11-16 * figure -; claim - *; | [Y]DE609211 (LUDWIG FROMM) [Y] 1-5,8,11-16 * figure .; claim . *; | [A]GB955665 (LUCAS INDUSTRIES LTD) [A] 1,6,7,9,10 * figure - *; | [A]EP0594104 (RANZONI ALDO [CH]) [A] 1,6,7,9,10 * abstract *; | [A]GB1141114 (PRAMET ZD Y PRASKOVE METALURGI) [A] 1 * figure - *; | [A]US2970485 (FRANK RAYMOND G) [A] 1 * figure - *; | [A]US4662234 (YOKOYAMA TATSUICHI [JP], et al) [A] 1 * figure - * | Examination | DE188949 | GB1031925 |