EP1610930 - ACTUATING DEVICE FOR AN ARTICULATED ARM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2006/01] | ACTUATING DEVICE, PARTICULARLY FOR AN ARTICULATED ARM | ||
[2010/21] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 06.05.2011 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.05.2011 | Change or deletion - application deemed withdrawn | published on 08.06.2011 [2011/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Commissariat à l'Énergie Atomique et aux Énergies Alternatives Bâtiment "Le Ponant D" 25, rue Leblanc 75015 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2010/18] | For all designated states Commissariat à l'énergie atomique et aux énergies alternatives Bâtiment D "Le Ponant" 25, rue Leblanc 75015 Paris / FR | ||
Former [2006/44] | For all designated states COMMISSARIAT A L'ENERGIE ATOMIQUE 25, rue Leblanc Immeuble "Le Ponant D" 75015 Paris / FR | ||
Former [2006/01] | For all designated states COMMISSARIAT A L'ENERGIE ATOMIQUE 31-33, rue de la Fédération 75752 Paris Cédex 15 / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GOSSELIN, Florian 114 avenue Victor Hugo F-92170 VANVES / FR | 02 /
PONSORT, Dominique 22 rue de la couture F-91570 BIEVRES / FR | [2006/01] | Representative(s) | Poulin, Gérard, et al BREVALEX 95, rue d'Amsterdam 75378 Paris Cedex 8 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2008/22] | Poulin, Gérard, et al Brevalex 3, rue du Docteur Lancereaux 75008 Paris / FR | ||
Former [2006/01] | Poulin, Gérard, et al Brevatome 3, rue du Docteur Lancereaux 75008 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 04742826.3 | 01.04.2004 | [2006/01] | WO2004FR50138 | Priority number, date | FR20030004200 | 04.04.2003 Original published format: FR 0304200 | [2006/01] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2004089578 | Date: | 21.10.2004 | Language: | FR | [2004/43] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1610930 | Date: | 04.01.2006 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.10.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/01] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 13.01.2005 | Classification | IPC: | B25J9/04, B25J9/10, B25J9/12, B25J9/14 | [2006/01] | CPC: |
B25J13/04 (EP,US);
B25J13/02 (EP,US);
B25J9/1065 (EP,US);
Y10T74/20305 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/01] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ANTRIEBSEINRICHTUNG FÜR EINEN GELENKARM | [2010/21] | English: | ACTUATING DEVICE FOR AN ARTICULATED ARM | [2010/21] | French: | DISPOSITIF D'ACTIONNEMEN POUR UN BRAS ARTICULE | [2010/21] |
Former [2006/01] | ANTRIEBSEINRICHTUNG, INSBESONDERE FÜR EINEN GELENKARM | ||
Former [2006/01] | ACTUATING DEVICE, PARTICULARLY FOR AN ARTICULATED ARM | ||
Former [2006/01] | DISPOSITIF D'ACTIONNEMENT, NOTAMMENT POUR UN BRAS ARTICULE | Entry into regional phase | 03.10.2005 | National basic fee paid | 03.10.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.10.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.02.2005 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 03.10.2005 | Examination requested [2006/01] | 31.05.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 13.12.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.02.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.06.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.06.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.10.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2011/23] | 03.11.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2011/16] | 02.12.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2011/23] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 13.02.2008 | Request for further processing filed | 13.02.2008 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 27.02.2008 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.04.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.04.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 16.04.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 26.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US4419041 (ROSE STANLEY E [US]) [X] 1,2,4 * figures 1,2,6,7,7A *; | [A]US4962676 (VAINSTOCK MICHAEL [US]) [A] 3,5 * figures 1-3 *; | [X]EP0443576 (KERPE STEFAN [DE]) [X] 1,2,4 * page 5, line 51 - line 59; figure 1 *; | [A]FR2809047 (COMMISSARIAT ENERGIE ATOMIQUE [FR]) [A] 4* the whole document * |