EP1656041 - APPARATUS AND METHOD FOR THE OZONE PRESERVATION OF CROPS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 20.05.2011 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.05.2011 | Refusal of application | published on 22.06.2011 [2011/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BIOFRESH LTD Suite 570, Ridley Building, Claremont RD Newcastle-Upon-Tyne NE1 7R4 / GB | [2006/20] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BARNES, Jeremy, University of Newcastle-Upon-Tyne 6 Kensington Terrace Newcastle-Upon-Tyne NE1 7R4 / GB | 02 /
SINGLETON, Ian, University of Newcastle-Upon-Tyne 6 Kensington Terrace Newcastle-Upon-Tyne NE1 7R4 / GB | 03 /
HARLEY, Phil, University of Newcastle-Upon-Tyne 6 Kensington Terrace Newcastle-Upon-Tyne NE1 7R4 / GB | 04 /
TZORTZAKIS, Nikos, Univ. of Newcastle-Upon-Tyne 6 Kensington Terrace Newcastle-Upon-Tyne NE1 7R4 / GB | 05 /
ROBERTS, Raveenia, Univ. of Newcastle-Upon-Tyne 6 Kensington Terrace Newcastle-Upon-Tyne NE17R4 / GB | 06 /
TALLENTIRE, Eva, University of Newcastle-Upon-Tyne 6 Kensington Terrace Newcastle-Upon-Tyne NE1 7R4 / GB | 07 /
TAYBI, Tahar, University of Newcastle-Upon-Tyne 6 Kensington Terrace Newcastle-Upon-Tyne NE1 7RU / GB | [2006/20] | Representative(s) | Elsworth, Dominic Stephen, et al Hargreaves Elsworth 26 Northumberland Square North Shields, Tyne & Wear NE30 1PW / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2006/20] | Elsworth, Dominic Stephen, et al Hargreaves Elsworth 6 Charlotte Square GB-Newcastle-upon-Tyne NE1 4XF / GB | Application number, filing date | 04743440.2 | 19.07.2004 | [2006/20] | WO2004GB03102 | Priority number, date | GB20030016970 | 19.07.2003 Original published format: GB 0316970 | [2006/20] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005013729 | Date: | 17.02.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/07] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1656041 | Date: | 17.05.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.02.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/20] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 17.02.2005 | Classification | IPC: | A23L3/3409, A23L3/3445, A23B7/144, A23B7/152, A23B5/10, A23B9/18, A23B9/22 | [2006/20] | CPC: |
A23L3/34095 (EP);
A23B5/10 (EP);
A23B7/144 (EP);
A23B7/152 (EP);
A23B9/18 (EP);
A23B9/22 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/20] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR OZON-KONSERVIERUNG VON FELDFRÜCHTEN | [2006/20] | English: | APPARATUS AND METHOD FOR THE OZONE PRESERVATION OF CROPS | [2006/20] | French: | APPAREIL ET PROCEDE DE CONSERVATION DE RECOLTES A L'OZONE | [2006/20] | Entry into regional phase | 20.02.2006 | National basic fee paid | 20.02.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.02.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.01.2006 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.02.2006 | Examination requested [2006/20] | 20.07.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 28.01.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.05.2009 | Date of oral proceedings | 12.06.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2011/25] | 12.06.2009 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 13.05.2011 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2011/25] | Appeal following examination | 19.08.2009 | Appeal received No. T2200/09 | 16.10.2009 | Statement of grounds filed | 13.05.2011 | Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the applicant withdrawn | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 20.07.2007 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.07.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.07.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 02.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US6503547 (LIMA CARLOS) [X] 1-18 * column 2, line 20 - line 67 * * column 3, line 45 - column 4, line 4 * * claims 1,3,8,9 *; | [X]EP0988800 (AIR LIQUIDE) [X] 1-18 * column 3, paragraphs 26-29 * * column 4, paragraphs 33,37,40 * * column 5, paragraphs 44,45,49,50,53 * * column 9, paragraph 75 * * figure 1; claims 1-3,6,11,12 *; | [XD]GB2340376 (FRUIT STORE LIMITED ; REDBRIDGE HOLDINGS LIMITED (GB)) [XD] 1-18 * claims 1,3-5 * * page 2, paragraphs 2,5 * * page 3, paragraph 3 - paragraph 6 * * page 4, paragraph 6 - page 5, paragraph 1 *; | [X]JP2003102268 ; | [X]WO9002572 (CAMMISS MARK ANTHONY ; RUSSO GAETANO (AU)) [X] 1-4,7,8,10-18 * page 2, paragraph 4 * * page 3, paragraph 2 - page 5, paragraph 3 *; | [X]JP2001061460 ; | [X]US6086833 (SCHNEPPER CAROL A ET AL) [X] 14-18 * figure -; claim 1 *; | [XD]WO9535495 (CAPTEUR SENSORS & ANALYSERS ; WILLIAMS DAVID EDWARD (GB); MOSELEY PATR) [XD] 14-18 * page 12, line 15 - page 15, line 15 * | [X] - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 2003, no. 64, Database accession no. 2003-673956, XP002303744 & JP2003102268 A 20030408 (SASAHARA KOGYO KK) [X] 1-4,7,10-18 * abstract * | [X] - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 2001, no. 47, Database accession no. 2001-435461, XP002303745 & JP2001061460 A 20010313 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP) [X] 14-18 * abstract * |