EP1654175 - WASTE GATHERLESS CONVEYING APPARATUS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.04.2009 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.11.2010 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): GR | published on 15.12.2010 [2010/50] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Pulsar S.r.l. Via Serenari 29 40013 Castel Maggiore (Bologna) / IT | [2006/19] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FRANZAROLI, Massimo Via Bachelet, 19 I-40013 Castel Maggiore / IT | [2006/19] | Representative(s) | Fanzini, Valeriano, et al Bugnion S.p.A. Via di Corticella, 87 40128 Bologna / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2006/19] | Fanzini, Valeriano, et al Bugnion S.p.A. Via Goito, 18 40126 Bologna / IT | Application number, filing date | 04744032.6 | 26.07.2004 | [2006/19] | WO2004IB02373 | Priority number, date | IT2003BO00453 | 29.07.2003 Original published format: IT BO20030453 | [2006/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2005009874 | Date: | 03.02.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/05] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1654175 | Date: | 10.05.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.02.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/19] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1654175 | Date: | 28.05.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/22] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 30.06.2005 | Classification | IPC: | B65G45/22, B65G23/06, B65G17/08 | [2006/19] | CPC: |
B65G17/08 (EP);
B65G17/40 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/19] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG ZUR BEFÖRDERUNG VON ABFALL UNTER VERHINDERUNG VON ANSAMMELN | [2006/19] | English: | WASTE GATHERLESS CONVEYING APPARATUS | [2006/19] | French: | APPAREIL TRANSPORTEUR SANS ACCUMULATION DE DECHETS | [2006/19] | Entry into regional phase | 28.02.2006 | National basic fee paid | 28.02.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.02.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.02.2006 | Examination requested [2006/19] | 05.04.2006 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.06.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 18.10.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.11.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.02.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 26.02.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 03.03.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/19] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.07.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 28.05.2008 | BE | 28.05.2008 | CY | 28.05.2008 | CZ | 28.05.2008 | DK | 28.05.2008 | EE | 28.05.2008 | FI | 28.05.2008 | NL | 28.05.2008 | PL | 28.05.2008 | RO | 28.05.2008 | SI | 28.05.2008 | SK | 28.05.2008 | TR | 28.05.2008 | IE | 26.07.2008 | LU | 26.07.2008 | CH | 31.07.2008 | LI | 31.07.2008 | MC | 31.07.2008 | BG | 28.08.2008 | SE | 28.08.2008 | GR | 29.08.2008 | PT | 28.10.2008 | HU | 29.11.2008 | [2010/50] |
Former [2010/38] | AT | 28.05.2008 | |
BE | 28.05.2008 | ||
CY | 28.05.2008 | ||
CZ | 28.05.2008 | ||
DK | 28.05.2008 | ||
EE | 28.05.2008 | ||
FI | 28.05.2008 | ||
NL | 28.05.2008 | ||
PL | 28.05.2008 | ||
RO | 28.05.2008 | ||
SI | 28.05.2008 | ||
SK | 28.05.2008 | ||
TR | 28.05.2008 | ||
IE | 26.07.2008 | ||
LU | 26.07.2008 | ||
CH | 31.07.2008 | ||
LI | 31.07.2008 | ||
MC | 31.07.2008 | ||
BG | 28.08.2008 | ||
SE | 28.08.2008 | ||
PT | 28.10.2008 | ||
HU | 29.11.2008 | ||
Former [2010/34] | AT | 28.05.2008 | |
BE | 28.05.2008 | ||
CY | 28.05.2008 | ||
CZ | 28.05.2008 | ||
DK | 28.05.2008 | ||
EE | 28.05.2008 | ||
FI | 28.05.2008 | ||
NL | 28.05.2008 | ||
PL | 28.05.2008 | ||
RO | 28.05.2008 | ||
SI | 28.05.2008 | ||
SK | 28.05.2008 | ||
IE | 26.07.2008 | ||
LU | 26.07.2008 | ||
CH | 31.07.2008 | ||
LI | 31.07.2008 | ||
MC | 31.07.2008 | ||
BG | 28.08.2008 | ||
SE | 28.08.2008 | ||
PT | 28.10.2008 | ||
HU | 29.11.2008 | ||
Former [2010/33] | AT | 28.05.2008 | |
BE | 28.05.2008 | ||
CZ | 28.05.2008 | ||
DK | 28.05.2008 | ||
EE | 28.05.2008 | ||
FI | 28.05.2008 | ||
NL | 28.05.2008 | ||
PL | 28.05.2008 | ||
RO | 28.05.2008 | ||
SI | 28.05.2008 | ||
SK | 28.05.2008 | ||
IE | 26.07.2008 | ||
LU | 26.07.2008 | ||
CH | 31.07.2008 | ||
LI | 31.07.2008 | ||
MC | 31.07.2008 | ||
BG | 28.08.2008 | ||
SE | 28.08.2008 | ||
PT | 28.10.2008 | ||
Former [2010/24] | AT | 28.05.2008 | |
BE | 28.05.2008 | ||
CZ | 28.05.2008 | ||
DK | 28.05.2008 | ||
EE | 28.05.2008 | ||
FI | 28.05.2008 | ||
NL | 28.05.2008 | ||
PL | 28.05.2008 | ||
RO | 28.05.2008 | ||
SI | 28.05.2008 | ||
SK | 28.05.2008 | ||
IE | 26.07.2008 | ||
CH | 31.07.2008 | ||
LI | 31.07.2008 | ||
MC | 31.07.2008 | ||
BG | 28.08.2008 | ||
SE | 28.08.2008 | ||
PT | 28.10.2008 | ||
Former [2009/35] | AT | 28.05.2008 | |
BE | 28.05.2008 | ||
CZ | 28.05.2008 | ||
DK | 28.05.2008 | ||
EE | 28.05.2008 | ||
FI | 28.05.2008 | ||
NL | 28.05.2008 | ||
RO | 28.05.2008 | ||
SI | 28.05.2008 | ||
SK | 28.05.2008 | ||
IE | 26.07.2008 | ||
CH | 31.07.2008 | ||
LI | 31.07.2008 | ||
MC | 31.07.2008 | ||
BG | 28.08.2008 | ||
SE | 28.08.2008 | ||
PT | 28.10.2008 | ||
Former [2009/30] | AT | 28.05.2008 | |
BE | 28.05.2008 | ||
CZ | 28.05.2008 | ||
DK | 28.05.2008 | ||
EE | 28.05.2008 | ||
FI | 28.05.2008 | ||
NL | 28.05.2008 | ||
RO | 28.05.2008 | ||
SI | 28.05.2008 | ||
SK | 28.05.2008 | ||
CH | 31.07.2008 | ||
LI | 31.07.2008 | ||
MC | 31.07.2008 | ||
BG | 28.08.2008 | ||
SE | 28.08.2008 | ||
PT | 28.10.2008 | ||
Former [2009/24] | AT | 28.05.2008 | |
BE | 28.05.2008 | ||
CZ | 28.05.2008 | ||
DK | 28.05.2008 | ||
EE | 28.05.2008 | ||
FI | 28.05.2008 | ||
NL | 28.05.2008 | ||
RO | 28.05.2008 | ||
SI | 28.05.2008 | ||
SK | 28.05.2008 | ||
MC | 31.07.2008 | ||
BG | 28.08.2008 | ||
SE | 28.08.2008 | ||
PT | 28.10.2008 | ||
Former [2009/22] | AT | 28.05.2008 | |
BE | 28.05.2008 | ||
CZ | 28.05.2008 | ||
DK | 28.05.2008 | ||
EE | 28.05.2008 | ||
FI | 28.05.2008 | ||
NL | 28.05.2008 | ||
RO | 28.05.2008 | ||
SI | 28.05.2008 | ||
SK | 28.05.2008 | ||
MC | 31.07.2008 | ||
SE | 28.08.2008 | ||
PT | 28.10.2008 | ||
Former [2009/16] | AT | 28.05.2008 | |
BE | 28.05.2008 | ||
CZ | 28.05.2008 | ||
DK | 28.05.2008 | ||
FI | 28.05.2008 | ||
NL | 28.05.2008 | ||
RO | 28.05.2008 | ||
SI | 28.05.2008 | ||
SK | 28.05.2008 | ||
MC | 31.07.2008 | ||
SE | 28.08.2008 | ||
PT | 28.10.2008 | ||
Former [2009/14] | AT | 28.05.2008 | |
BE | 28.05.2008 | ||
CZ | 28.05.2008 | ||
DK | 28.05.2008 | ||
FI | 28.05.2008 | ||
NL | 28.05.2008 | ||
RO | 28.05.2008 | ||
SI | 28.05.2008 | ||
SK | 28.05.2008 | ||
SE | 28.08.2008 | ||
PT | 28.10.2008 | ||
Former [2009/13] | AT | 28.05.2008 | |
BE | 28.05.2008 | ||
CZ | 28.05.2008 | ||
DK | 28.05.2008 | ||
FI | 28.05.2008 | ||
NL | 28.05.2008 | ||
SI | 28.05.2008 | ||
SK | 28.05.2008 | ||
SE | 28.08.2008 | ||
PT | 28.10.2008 | ||
Former [2009/09] | AT | 28.05.2008 | |
DK | 28.05.2008 | ||
FI | 28.05.2008 | ||
NL | 28.05.2008 | ||
SI | 28.05.2008 | ||
SE | 28.08.2008 | ||
PT | 28.10.2008 | ||
Former [2009/07] | AT | 28.05.2008 | |
FI | 28.05.2008 | ||
NL | 28.05.2008 | ||
SI | 28.05.2008 | ||
SE | 28.08.2008 | ||
Former [2008/50] | AT | 28.05.2008 | |
FI | 28.05.2008 | ||
NL | 28.05.2008 | ||
SI | 28.05.2008 | ||
Former [2008/44] | SI | 28.05.2008 | Cited in | International search | [X]US2854131 (MURRAY WALTER P) [X] 79 * page 1, line 27 - line 36 *; | [X]USRE30341E (LAPEYRE M JAMES) [X] 20-25,28,74-76,78,80,81 * the whole document *; | [XY]EP0095933 (PALMAER K V) [X] 1-7,12-15 * page 1, line 7 - page 2, line 6 * * page 12, line 6 - page 14, line 9 * * figures 10,11 * [Y] 8-11; | [Y]EP0569071 (MARBETT SPA [IT]) [Y] 8-11 * the whole document *; | [X]US5685411 (ZIMMERMAN BRUCE [US], et al) [X] 20-24,28,80,81 * column 4, line 10 - column 6, line 10 * * figures 1-22 *; | [X]US6227354 (HOWDEN KEVIN [US], et al) [X] 20-24* the whole document *; | [X]EP1232965 (REXNORD MARBETT SPA [IT]) [X] 20-24,72,80,81 * the whole document *; | [X]EP1270454 (HABASIT AG [CH]) [X] 1-7,12-15 * page 1, paragraph 2 - paragraph 4 * * page 3, paragraph 16 * * figures 7-11 * |