EP1634441 - DETECTOR FOR THE DETECTION OF X-RADIATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 21.04.2012 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.04.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 23.05.2012 [2012/21] | Applicant(s) | For:DE
Philips Intellectual Property & Standards GmbH Steindamm 94 20099 Hamburg / DE | For:AT
BE
BG
CH
CY
CZ
DK
EE
ES
FI
FR
GB
GR
HU
IE
IT
LI
LU
MC
NL
PL
Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2006/29] | For:DE
Philips Intellectual Property & Standards GmbH Steindamm 94 20099 Hamburg / DE | ||
For:AT
BE
BG
CH
CY
CZ
DK
EE
ES
FI
FR
GB
GR
HU
IE
IT
LI
LU
MC
NL
PL
Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | |||
Former [2006/11] | For:DE
Philips Intellectual Property & Standards GmbH Steindamm 94 20099 Hamburg / DE | ||
For:AT
BE
BG
CH
CY
CZ
DK
EE
ES
FI
FR
GB
GR
HU
IE
IT
LU
MC
NL
PL
Koninklijke Philips Electronics, N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NASCETTI, Augusto c/o Philips IP & Standards GmbH Weisshausstr. 2 52066 Aachen / DE | 02 /
OVERDICK, Michael c/o Philips IP & Standards GmbH Weisshausstr. 2 52066 Aachen / DE | 03 /
SIMON, Matthias c/o Philips IP & Standards GmbH Weisshausstr. 2 52066 Aachen / DE | [2006/11] | Representative(s) | Maiwald GmbH Elisenhof Elisenstraße 3 80335 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/39] | Maiwald Patentanwalts GmbH Elisenhof Elisenstrasse 3 80335 München / DE | ||
Former [2006/42] | Maiwald Patentanwalts GmbH Elisenhof Elisenstraße 3 80335 München / DE | ||
Former [2006/11] | Volmer, Georg Philips Intellectual Property & Standards GmbH, Postfach 50 04 42 52088 Aachen / DE | Application number, filing date | 04744342.9 | 26.05.2004 | [2006/11] | WO2004IB50775 | Priority number, date | EP20030101643 | 05.06.2003 Original published format: EP 03101643 | [2006/11] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004110056 | Date: | 16.12.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/51] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1634441 | Date: | 15.03.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.12.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/11] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 16.12.2004 | Classification | IPC: | H04N5/32, H04N3/15 | [2006/11] | CPC: |
H04N5/325 (EP,US);
H04N25/626 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/11] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | DETEKTOR ZUR ERKENNUNG VON RÖNTGENSTRAHLUNG | [2006/11] | English: | DETECTOR FOR THE DETECTION OF X-RADIATION | [2006/11] | French: | DETECTEUR POUR LA DETECTION DE RAYONS X | [2006/11] | Entry into regional phase | 05.01.2006 | National basic fee paid | 05.01.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.01.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.01.2006 | Examination requested [2006/11] | 25.04.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 26.10.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.03.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.08.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.12.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2012/21] | 10.01.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2012/21] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 25.04.2006 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.05.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 02.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2011 | 08   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]US5452338 (GRANFORS PAUL R [US], et al); | [A]WO9948286 (KONINKL PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL], et al); | [XY]WO0157554 (KONINKL PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL], et al); | [Y]US2002064254 (AOKI KUNIO [JP], et al) |