EP1644788 - DEVICE FOR RUNNING COPY-PROTECTED SOFTWARE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 09.07.2010 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.07.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 11.08.2010 [2010/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2006/15] | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TREFFERS, Menno, A. c/o Prof. Holstlaan 6 NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | [2006/15] | Representative(s) | Bekkers, Joost J.J. Philips Intellectual Property & Standards High Tech Campus 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2006/15] | Bekkers, Joost J.J Philips Intellectual Property & Standards, P.O. Box 220 5600 AE Eindhoven / NL | Application number, filing date | 04744452.6 | 01.07.2004 | [2006/15] | WO2004IB51083 | Priority number, date | EP20030102000 | 04.07.2003 Original published format: EP 03102000 | [2006/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005003939 | Date: | 13.01.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/02] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1644788 | Date: | 12.04.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.01.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/15] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 13.01.2005 | Classification | IPC: | G06F1/00 | [2006/15] | CPC: |
G06F21/78 (EP,US);
G06F9/46 (KR);
G06F21/00 (KR);
G06F21/10 (EP,US);
G11B20/00086 (EP,US);
G11B20/0021 (EP,US);
G11B20/00369 (EP,US);
G11B20/00855 (EP,US);
G11B20/00876 (EP,US);
G06F2221/2109 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/15] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | EINRICHTUNG ZUR AUSFÜHRUNG VON KOPIEGESCHÜTZTER SOFTWARE | [2006/15] | English: | DEVICE FOR RUNNING COPY-PROTECTED SOFTWARE | [2006/15] | French: | DISPOSITIF D'EXECUTION DE LOGICIELS PROTEGES | [2006/15] | Entry into regional phase | 06.02.2006 | National basic fee paid | 06.02.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.02.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.02.2006 | Examination requested [2006/15] | 16.05.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.08.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.01.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.05.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.02.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/32] | 24.03.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2010/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.07.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2009 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]EP0866454 (SONY CORP [JP]) [A] 4,9 * the whole document *; | [A]US5825879 (DAVIS DEREK L [US]) [A] 1-9 * column 2, line 65 - column 3, line 42 * * column 6, line 50 - line 58 * * column 7, line 14 - line 20 * * figures 2,5 *; | [A]US2002163522 (PORTER ALLEN J C [CA], et al) [A] 1-9 * paragraphs [0011] - [0024] * * paragraph [0029] * * paragraph [0036] * * paragraph [0055] *; | [I]US2003067474 (FENNEY SIMON [GB], et al) [I] 1-9 * paragraphs [0010] , [0012] * * paragraphs [0016] , [0017] * * paragraphs [0033] - [0035] * * paragraphs [0039] - [0014] *; | [A]WO03048939 (MICROSOFT CORP [US], et al) [A] 1-9 * page 3, line 1 - page 4, line 16 ** page 18, line 10 - page 19, line 16 *; | [DA]US2003135742 (EVANS GLENN F [US]) [DA] 4,9 * the whole document * |