EP1658586 - DETECTING A WATERMARK USING A SUBSET OF AVAILABLE DETECTION METHODS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 23.07.2010 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.07.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 25.08.2010 [2010/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2006/21] | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KRASINSKI, Raymond, J. P.O. Box 3001 Briarcliff Manor, NY 10510-8001 / US | [2006/21] | Representative(s) | Schmitz, Herman Jan Renier Philips Intellectual Property & Standards High Tech Campus 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2009/49] | Schmitz, Herman Jan Renier Philips Intellectual Property & Standards P.O. Box 220 5600 AE Eindhoven / NL | ||
Former [2006/21] | Schmitz, Herman Jan Renier Philips Intellectual Property & Standards P.O. Box 220 NL-5600 AE Eindhoven / NL | Application number, filing date | 04744788.3 | 13.08.2004 | [2006/21] | WO2004IB51460 | Priority number, date | US20030496129P | 19.08.2003 Original published format: US 496129 P | [2006/21] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005017827 | Date: | 24.02.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/08] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1658586 | Date: | 24.05.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.02.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/21] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 24.02.2005 | Classification | IPC: | G06T1/00 | [2006/21] | CPC: |
G06T1/005 (EP,US);
G06F15/00 (KR);
G06T2201/0065 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/21] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ERKENNEN EINES WASSERZEICHENS UNTER VERWENDUNG EINER TEILMENGE VERFÜGBARER ERKENNUNGSVERFAHREN | [2006/21] | English: | DETECTING A WATERMARK USING A SUBSET OF AVAILABLE DETECTION METHODS | [2006/21] | French: | DETECTION D'UN FILIGRANE A L'AIDE D'UN SOUS-ENSEMBLE DE METHODES DE DETECTION DISPONIBLES | [2006/21] | Entry into regional phase | 20.03.2006 | National basic fee paid | 20.03.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.03.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.03.2006 | Examination requested [2006/21] | 29.06.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 19.04.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.03.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/34] | 08.04.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2010/34] | Request for further processing for: | 19.04.2007 | Request for further processing filed | 12.02.2007 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 30.04.2007 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.08.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.08.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2009 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US6546113 (LUCAS KEITH [CA], et al) [A] 1-20 * column 2, line 1 - line 16 * * column 2, line 44 - line 62 * * figure 4 *; | [XY] - HARTUNG F ET AL, "Spread spectrum watermarking: malicious attacks and counterattacks", PROCEEDINGS OF THE SPIE - THE INTERNATIONAL SOCIETY FOR OPTICAL ENGINEERING ,USA, (199901), vol. 3657, ISSN 0277-786X, pages 147 - 158, XP002308705 [X] 1-6,10-20 * Section 4.4.1, lines 1-31 * [Y] 7-9 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1117/12.344665 | [Y] - CALDELLI R ET AL, "Authorized MPEG-4 video fruition via watermarking recovering and smart card certification", PROCEEDINGS OF THE SPIE - THE INTERNATIONAL SOCIETY FOR OPTICAL ENGINEERING, USA, (200301), vol. 4793, ISSN 0277-786X, pages 57 - 63, XP002308708 [Y] 7-9 * section 3.2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1117/12.454830 | [A] - DOMINGO-FERRER J ET AL, "Enhancing watermark robustness through mixture of watermarked digital objects", PROCEEDINGS INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON INFORMATION TECHNOLOGY: CODING AND COMPUTING IEEE COMPUT. SOC LOS ALAMITOS, CA, USA, (2002), ISBN 0-7695-1506-1, pages 85 - 89, XP002308706 [A] 1-20 * section 2.1.2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/ITCC.2002.1000365 | [A] - VOLOSHYNOVSKIY S ET AL, "Attacks on digital watermarks: classification, estimation based attacks, and benchmarks", IEEE COMMUNICATIONS MAGAZINE, USA, (200108), vol. 39, no. 8, ISSN 0163-6804, pages 118 - 126, XP002308707 [A] 1-20 * abstract * | [A] - VENKATESAN R ET AL, "Image watermarking with better resilience", PROCEEDINGS ICIP 2000, (20000910), vol. 1, pages 403 - 406, XP010530636 [A] 1-20 * page 404, paragraph L * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/ICIP.2000.900980 |