EP1642113 - A METHOD FOR PARTICLE SIZE AND CONCENTRATION MEASUREMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.02.2015 Database last updated on 17.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.07.2016 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 17.08.2016 [2016/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states P.M.L. - Particles Monitoring Technologies Ltd. 20 Yochanan Hasandlar Street P.O.B. 25300 3125102 Haifa / IL | [2014/09] |
Former [2014/08] | For all designated states P.M.L. - Particles Monitoring Technologies Ltd. 20 Yochanan Hasandlar Street P.O.B. 25300 3296220 Haifa / IL | ||
Former [2014/04] | For all designated states P.M.L. - Particles Monitoring Technologies Ltd. 20 Yochanan Hasandlar Street P.O.B. 25300 Haifa 31250 / IL | ||
Former [2006/14] | For all designated states P.M.L. - Particles Monitoring Technologies Ltd. Kinarot Technological Incubator 15132 Emek HaYarden / IL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SHAMIR, Joseph 27/A Hasiday Umot HaOlam Street 32985 Haifa / IL | 02 /
KARASIKOV, Nir 49 Hague Street 34980 Haifa / IL | [2006/14] | Representative(s) | Howard, Paul Nicholas, et al Carpmaels & Ransford LLP One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | [2014/12] |
Former [2006/14] | James, Anthony Christopher W.P., et al Carpmaels & Ransford 43-45 Bloomsbury Square London WC1A 2RA / GB | Application number, filing date | 04744956.6 | 08.07.2004 | [2006/14] | WO2004IL00616 | Priority number, date | IL20030156856 | 09.07.2003 Original published format: IL 15685603 | [2006/14] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005005965 | Date: | 20.01.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/03] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1642113 | Date: | 05.04.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.01.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/14] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1642113 | Date: | 09.04.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/15] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 20.01.2005 | Classification | IPC: | G01N15/14, // G01N21/88, G01N21/94, G01B11/30 | [2013/11] | CPC: |
G01N15/1459 (EP,US);
G01N2015/145 (EP,US);
G01N2015/1493 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2006/14] | G01N15/14 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/14] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR MESSUNG DER PARTIKELGRÖSSE UND -KONZENTRATION | [2006/14] | English: | A METHOD FOR PARTICLE SIZE AND CONCENTRATION MEASUREMENT | [2006/14] | French: | PROCEDE DE MESURE DE LA GRANULOMETRIE ET DE LA CONCENTRATION | [2006/14] | Entry into regional phase | 18.01.2006 | National basic fee paid | 18.01.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.01.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.05.2005 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 18.01.2006 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.01.2006 | Examination requested [2006/14] | 22.01.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 28.07.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.02.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 24.04.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.09.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.12.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 19.12.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 22.01.2009 | Opposition(s) | 12.01.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.01.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.07.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 10.07.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.07.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 12.07.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 13.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 10.07.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 08.07.2004 | AT | 09.04.2014 | BE | 09.04.2014 | CY | 09.04.2014 | CZ | 09.04.2014 | DK | 09.04.2014 | EE | 09.04.2014 | ES | 09.04.2014 | FI | 09.04.2014 | IT | 09.04.2014 | MC | 09.04.2014 | NL | 09.04.2014 | PL | 09.04.2014 | RO | 09.04.2014 | SE | 09.04.2014 | SI | 09.04.2014 | SK | 09.04.2014 | TR | 09.04.2014 | IE | 08.07.2014 | LU | 08.07.2014 | BG | 09.07.2014 | GR | 10.07.2014 | PT | 11.08.2014 | [2016/33] |
Former [2016/32] | HU | 08.07.2004 | |
AT | 09.04.2014 | ||
BE | 09.04.2014 | ||
CY | 09.04.2014 | ||
CZ | 09.04.2014 | ||
DK | 09.04.2014 | ||
EE | 09.04.2014 | ||
ES | 09.04.2014 | ||
FI | 09.04.2014 | ||
IT | 09.04.2014 | ||
MC | 09.04.2014 | ||
NL | 09.04.2014 | ||
PL | 09.04.2014 | ||
RO | 09.04.2014 | ||
SE | 09.04.2014 | ||
SI | 09.04.2014 | ||
SK | 09.04.2014 | ||
IE | 08.07.2014 | ||
LU | 08.07.2014 | ||
BG | 09.07.2014 | ||
GR | 10.07.2014 | ||
PT | 11.08.2014 | ||
Former [2016/31] | AT | 09.04.2014 | |
BE | 09.04.2014 | ||
CY | 09.04.2014 | ||
CZ | 09.04.2014 | ||
DK | 09.04.2014 | ||
EE | 09.04.2014 | ||
ES | 09.04.2014 | ||
FI | 09.04.2014 | ||
IT | 09.04.2014 | ||
MC | 09.04.2014 | ||
NL | 09.04.2014 | ||
PL | 09.04.2014 | ||
RO | 09.04.2014 | ||
SE | 09.04.2014 | ||
SI | 09.04.2014 | ||
SK | 09.04.2014 | ||
IE | 08.07.2014 | ||
LU | 08.07.2014 | ||
BG | 09.07.2014 | ||
GR | 10.07.2014 | ||
PT | 11.08.2014 | ||
Former [2016/21] | AT | 09.04.2014 | |
BE | 09.04.2014 | ||
CZ | 09.04.2014 | ||
DK | 09.04.2014 | ||
EE | 09.04.2014 | ||
ES | 09.04.2014 | ||
FI | 09.04.2014 | ||
IT | 09.04.2014 | ||
MC | 09.04.2014 | ||
NL | 09.04.2014 | ||
PL | 09.04.2014 | ||
RO | 09.04.2014 | ||
SE | 09.04.2014 | ||
SI | 09.04.2014 | ||
SK | 09.04.2014 | ||
IE | 08.07.2014 | ||
LU | 08.07.2014 | ||
BG | 09.07.2014 | ||
GR | 10.07.2014 | ||
PT | 11.08.2014 | ||
Former [2015/37] | AT | 09.04.2014 | |
BE | 09.04.2014 | ||
CZ | 09.04.2014 | ||
DK | 09.04.2014 | ||
EE | 09.04.2014 | ||
ES | 09.04.2014 | ||
FI | 09.04.2014 | ||
IT | 09.04.2014 | ||
NL | 09.04.2014 | ||
PL | 09.04.2014 | ||
RO | 09.04.2014 | ||
SE | 09.04.2014 | ||
SI | 09.04.2014 | ||
SK | 09.04.2014 | ||
IE | 08.07.2014 | ||
LU | 08.07.2014 | ||
BG | 09.07.2014 | ||
GR | 10.07.2014 | ||
PT | 11.08.2014 | ||
Former [2015/36] | AT | 09.04.2014 | |
BE | 09.04.2014 | ||
CZ | 09.04.2014 | ||
DK | 09.04.2014 | ||
EE | 09.04.2014 | ||
ES | 09.04.2014 | ||
FI | 09.04.2014 | ||
IT | 09.04.2014 | ||
NL | 09.04.2014 | ||
PL | 09.04.2014 | ||
RO | 09.04.2014 | ||
SE | 09.04.2014 | ||
SI | 09.04.2014 | ||
SK | 09.04.2014 | ||
LU | 08.07.2014 | ||
BG | 09.07.2014 | ||
GR | 10.07.2014 | ||
PT | 11.08.2014 | ||
Former [2015/18] | AT | 09.04.2014 | |
BE | 09.04.2014 | ||
CZ | 09.04.2014 | ||
DK | 09.04.2014 | ||
EE | 09.04.2014 | ||
ES | 09.04.2014 | ||
FI | 09.04.2014 | ||
IT | 09.04.2014 | ||
NL | 09.04.2014 | ||
PL | 09.04.2014 | ||
RO | 09.04.2014 | ||
SE | 09.04.2014 | ||
SK | 09.04.2014 | ||
LU | 08.07.2014 | ||
BG | 09.07.2014 | ||
GR | 10.07.2014 | ||
PT | 11.08.2014 | ||
Former [2015/13] | AT | 09.04.2014 | |
BE | 09.04.2014 | ||
CZ | 09.04.2014 | ||
DK | 09.04.2014 | ||
EE | 09.04.2014 | ||
ES | 09.04.2014 | ||
FI | 09.04.2014 | ||
NL | 09.04.2014 | ||
PL | 09.04.2014 | ||
RO | 09.04.2014 | ||
SE | 09.04.2014 | ||
SK | 09.04.2014 | ||
LU | 08.07.2014 | ||
BG | 09.07.2014 | ||
GR | 10.07.2014 | ||
PT | 11.08.2014 | ||
Former [2015/11] | AT | 09.04.2014 | |
BE | 09.04.2014 | ||
CZ | 09.04.2014 | ||
DK | 09.04.2014 | ||
EE | 09.04.2014 | ||
ES | 09.04.2014 | ||
FI | 09.04.2014 | ||
NL | 09.04.2014 | ||
PL | 09.04.2014 | ||
RO | 09.04.2014 | ||
SE | 09.04.2014 | ||
SK | 09.04.2014 | ||
BG | 09.07.2014 | ||
GR | 10.07.2014 | ||
PT | 11.08.2014 | ||
Former [2015/10] | AT | 09.04.2014 | |
BE | 09.04.2014 | ||
CZ | 09.04.2014 | ||
DK | 09.04.2014 | ||
EE | 09.04.2014 | ||
ES | 09.04.2014 | ||
FI | 09.04.2014 | ||
NL | 09.04.2014 | ||
PL | 09.04.2014 | ||
SE | 09.04.2014 | ||
SK | 09.04.2014 | ||
BG | 09.07.2014 | ||
GR | 10.07.2014 | ||
PT | 11.08.2014 | ||
Former [2015/08] | AT | 09.04.2014 | |
BE | 09.04.2014 | ||
DK | 09.04.2014 | ||
ES | 09.04.2014 | ||
FI | 09.04.2014 | ||
NL | 09.04.2014 | ||
PL | 09.04.2014 | ||
SE | 09.04.2014 | ||
BG | 09.07.2014 | ||
GR | 10.07.2014 | ||
PT | 11.08.2014 | ||
Former [2015/02] | AT | 09.04.2014 | |
ES | 09.04.2014 | ||
FI | 09.04.2014 | ||
NL | 09.04.2014 | ||
PL | 09.04.2014 | ||
SE | 09.04.2014 | ||
BG | 09.07.2014 | ||
GR | 10.07.2014 | ||
PT | 11.08.2014 | ||
Former [2014/51] | AT | 09.04.2014 | |
ES | 09.04.2014 | ||
FI | 09.04.2014 | ||
NL | 09.04.2014 | ||
PL | 09.04.2014 | ||
SE | 09.04.2014 | ||
BG | 09.07.2014 | ||
GR | 10.07.2014 | ||
Former [2014/50] | ES | 09.04.2014 | |
FI | 09.04.2014 | ||
NL | 09.04.2014 | ||
PL | 09.04.2014 | ||
SE | 09.04.2014 | ||
BG | 09.07.2014 | ||
GR | 10.07.2014 | ||
Former [2014/49] | FI | 09.04.2014 | |
BG | 09.07.2014 | ||
Former [2014/48] | BG | 09.07.2014 | Cited in | International search | [A]WO9850779 (HOLCOMB MATTHEW J [US]); | [XYI] - JONES A R, "Light scattering for particle characterization", PROGRESS IN ENERGY AND COMBUSTION SCIENCE, ELSEVIER SCIENCE PUBLISHERS, AMSTERDAM, NL, (199902), vol. 25, no. 1, ISSN 0360-1285, pages 1 - 53, XP004151620 [X] 1-3,5,29,31,32 * page 3, column 1, paragraphs 1,2 * * page 3, column 2, paragraph 5 * * page 10, column 2, paragraph 4 - page 11, column 1, paragraph 3 * * page 32, column 2, paragraphs 4,5 * * page 35, column 2, paragraphs 2,3 * * page 36, column 2, paragraph 2 - page 37, column 1, paragraph 2 * * figures 7,23-25 * [Y] 4,8-14,16,17,30,33-35 [I] 6,15,18-22,24,26,36,37 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0360-1285(98)00017-3 | [Y] - PIESTUN RAFAEL, "Multidimensional Synthesis of Light Fields", (20011017), page 28, URL: http://ece-www.colorado.edu/~piestun/28-32.PIESTUN.PDF, (20041026), XP002302678 [Y] 4,34,35 * page 28, column 3, line 1 - page 29, column 1, paragraph 2 * * page 30, column 2, paragraph 2 - page 30, column 3, paragraph 2 * | [Y] - MATIZEN Y E ET AL, "FORMATION OF NON-GAUSSIAN LIGHT BEAMS WITH THE AID OF A SPATIALLY INHOMOGENEOUS AMPLITUDE FILTER", SOVIET JOURNAL OF QUANTUM ELECTRONICS, AMERICAN INSTITUTE OF PHYSICS. WOODBURY, NY, US, (19870113), vol. 17, no. 7, pages 886 - 887, XP000709131 [Y] 8-11 * abstract * * page 887, column 1, paragraph 4 - column 2, paragraph 2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1070/QE1987v017n07ABEH009475 | [DY] - FRIEDMANN MICHAEL ET AL, "Surface Analysis Using Multiple Coherent Beams", ELECTRICAL AND ELECTRONICS ENGINEERS IN ISRAEL, (19961105), pages 537 - 540, XP002302679 [DY] 12-14,17,33 * page 537, column 1, paragraph 1 - page 537, column 2, paragraph 1 * * page 538, column 2, paragraph IV - page 538, column 1, paragraph IV * * page 539, column 2, paragraph 2 * * page 540, column 1, paragraph 2 * * figure 4 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/EEIS.1996.567034 | [ ] - URL: http://ieeexplore.ieee.org/iel3/4282/12326/00567034.pdf?tp=&arnumber=567034&isnumber=12326&arSt=537&ared=540&arAuthor=Friedmann%2C+M.%3B+Piestun%2C+R.%3B+Paquet%2C+E.%3B+Shamir%2C+J.%3B | [DY] - FRIEDMANN MICHAEL ET AL, "Resolution enhancement by extrapolation of the optically measured spectrum of surface profiles", APPLIED OPTICS, (19960610), vol. 36, no. 8, XP002302680 [DY] 16 * page 1747, column 1, paragraph 1 * * page 1748, column 1, line 21 - page 1749, column 1, line 9 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1364/AO.36.001747 | [DY] - PIESTUN RAFAEL ET AL, "Pattern generation with an extended focal depth", APPLIED OPTICS, (19980810), vol. 37, no. 23, pages 5394 - 5398, XP002302681 [DY] 30 * paragraph [0004] * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1364/AO.37.005394 | [DA] - SPEKTOR BORIS ET AL, "Dark beams with a constant notch", OPTICS LETTERS, vol. 21, no. 7, (19951212), pages 456 - 458, URL: http://ol.osa.org/abstract.cfm?id=44758, (20041025), XP002302682 [DA] 4 * page 456, column 1, paragraph 2 - page 456, column 1, paragraph 3 * * figures 1-3 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1364/OL.21.000456 | Examination | EP1083424 | - RAFAEL PIESTUN ET AL, "Synthesis of Three-Dimensional Light Fields and Applications", PROCEEDINGS OF THE IEEE, IEEE. NEW YORK, US, (20020201), vol. 90, no. 2, ISSN 0018-9219, XP011044618 | by applicant | - R. PIESTUN; J. SHAMIR, "Synthesis of three-dimensional light-fields and applications", PROC. IEEE, (2002), vol. 90, no. 2, pages 220 - 244, XP011044618 |