EP1651802 - SUPPORT SYSTEM FOR TREATMENT APPARATUSES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.01.2012 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.10.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 06.11.2013 [2013/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states E.T.C. Epitaxial Technology Center SRL Corso Italia, 207 95127 Catania / IT | [2006/18] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Speciale Natale Via Stelvio 22 I-91020 Mazara del Vallo, Trapani / IT | 02 /
VALENTE, Gianluca Viale Monza, 76 I-20127 Milano / IT | 03 /
CRIPPA, Danilo Via Crimea, 24 I-28100 Novara / IT | 04 /
POZZETTI, Vittorio Via Volturno, 80 I-20047 Brugherio / IT | 05 /
PRETI, Franco Via S. Benigno, 4 I-20133 Milano / IT | [2006/18] | Representative(s) | Dragotti, Gianfranco, et al Dragotti & Associati Srl Via Nino Bixio, 7 20129 Milano / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2008/22] | Dragotti, Gianfranco, et al Dragotti & Associati srl Via Marina 6 20121 Milano / IT | ||
Former [2006/32] | Dragotti, Gianfranco, et al Dragotti & Associati SRL Via Turati 32 I-20121 Milano / IT | ||
Former [2006/18] | Ferroni, Filippo, et al Dragotti & Associati srl Via Turati 32 20121 Milano / IT | Application number, filing date | 04745167.9 | 09.06.2004 | [2006/18] | WO2004IT00335 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005121417 | Date: | 22.12.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/51] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1651802 | Date: | 03.05.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.12.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/18] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1651802 | Date: | 09.03.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/10] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 22.12.2005 | Classification | IPC: | C30B25/12, C23C16/458 | [2006/18] | CPC: |
C30B25/12 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/18] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | HALTERUNGSSYSTEM FÜR BEHANDLUNGSAPPARATUREN | [2006/18] | English: | SUPPORT SYSTEM FOR TREATMENT APPARATUSES | [2006/18] | French: | SYSTEME DE SUPPORT POUR APPAREILS DE TRAITEMENT | [2006/18] | Entry into regional phase | 28.12.2005 | National basic fee paid | 28.12.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.12.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.12.2005 | Examination requested [2006/18] | 23.06.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 29.12.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.10.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.02.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.11.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.01.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 12.01.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 12.12.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/07] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.12.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.06.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.06.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.06.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 09.03.2011 | BE | 09.03.2011 | CY | 09.03.2011 | CZ | 09.03.2011 | DK | 09.03.2011 | EE | 09.03.2011 | FI | 09.03.2011 | HU | 09.03.2011 | NL | 09.03.2011 | PL | 09.03.2011 | RO | 09.03.2011 | SI | 09.03.2011 | SK | 09.03.2011 | TR | 09.03.2011 | BG | 09.06.2011 | IE | 09.06.2011 | LU | 09.06.2011 | GR | 10.06.2011 | ES | 20.06.2011 | CH | 30.06.2011 | LI | 30.06.2011 | MC | 30.06.2011 | PT | 11.07.2011 | [2013/45] |
Former [2013/44] | AT | 09.03.2011 | |
BE | 09.03.2011 | ||
CY | 09.03.2011 | ||
CZ | 09.03.2011 | ||
DK | 09.03.2011 | ||
EE | 09.03.2011 | ||
FI | 09.03.2011 | ||
NL | 09.03.2011 | ||
PL | 09.03.2011 | ||
RO | 09.03.2011 | ||
SI | 09.03.2011 | ||
SK | 09.03.2011 | ||
TR | 09.03.2011 | ||
BG | 09.06.2011 | ||
IE | 09.06.2011 | ||
LU | 09.06.2011 | ||
GR | 10.06.2011 | ||
ES | 20.06.2011 | ||
CH | 30.06.2011 | ||
LI | 30.06.2011 | ||
MC | 30.06.2011 | ||
PT | 11.07.2011 | ||
Former [2013/25] | AT | 09.03.2011 | |
BE | 09.03.2011 | ||
CY | 09.03.2011 | ||
CZ | 09.03.2011 | ||
DK | 09.03.2011 | ||
EE | 09.03.2011 | ||
FI | 09.03.2011 | ||
NL | 09.03.2011 | ||
PL | 09.03.2011 | ||
RO | 09.03.2011 | ||
SI | 09.03.2011 | ||
SK | 09.03.2011 | ||
BG | 09.06.2011 | ||
IE | 09.06.2011 | ||
LU | 09.06.2011 | ||
GR | 10.06.2011 | ||
ES | 20.06.2011 | ||
CH | 30.06.2011 | ||
LI | 30.06.2011 | ||
MC | 30.06.2011 | ||
PT | 11.07.2011 | ||
Former [2013/21] | AT | 09.03.2011 | |
BE | 09.03.2011 | ||
CY | 09.03.2011 | ||
CZ | 09.03.2011 | ||
DK | 09.03.2011 | ||
EE | 09.03.2011 | ||
FI | 09.03.2011 | ||
NL | 09.03.2011 | ||
PL | 09.03.2011 | ||
RO | 09.03.2011 | ||
SI | 09.03.2011 | ||
SK | 09.03.2011 | ||
BG | 09.06.2011 | ||
IE | 09.06.2011 | ||
GR | 10.06.2011 | ||
ES | 20.06.2011 | ||
CH | 30.06.2011 | ||
LI | 30.06.2011 | ||
MC | 30.06.2011 | ||
PT | 11.07.2011 | ||
Former [2012/20] | AT | 09.03.2011 | |
BE | 09.03.2011 | ||
CY | 09.03.2011 | ||
CZ | 09.03.2011 | ||
DK | 09.03.2011 | ||
EE | 09.03.2011 | ||
FI | 09.03.2011 | ||
NL | 09.03.2011 | ||
PL | 09.03.2011 | ||
RO | 09.03.2011 | ||
SI | 09.03.2011 | ||
SK | 09.03.2011 | ||
BG | 09.06.2011 | ||
IE | 09.06.2011 | ||
GR | 10.06.2011 | ||
ES | 20.06.2011 | ||
CH | 30.06.2011 | ||
LI | 30.06.2011 | ||
PT | 11.07.2011 | ||
Former [2012/11] | AT | 09.03.2011 | |
BE | 09.03.2011 | ||
CY | 09.03.2011 | ||
CZ | 09.03.2011 | ||
DK | 09.03.2011 | ||
EE | 09.03.2011 | ||
FI | 09.03.2011 | ||
NL | 09.03.2011 | ||
PL | 09.03.2011 | ||
RO | 09.03.2011 | ||
SI | 09.03.2011 | ||
SK | 09.03.2011 | ||
BG | 09.06.2011 | ||
GR | 10.06.2011 | ||
ES | 20.06.2011 | ||
PT | 11.07.2011 | ||
Former [2012/10] | AT | 09.03.2011 | |
BE | 09.03.2011 | ||
CY | 09.03.2011 | ||
CZ | 09.03.2011 | ||
DK | 09.03.2011 | ||
EE | 09.03.2011 | ||
FI | 09.03.2011 | ||
NL | 09.03.2011 | ||
RO | 09.03.2011 | ||
SI | 09.03.2011 | ||
SK | 09.03.2011 | ||
BG | 09.06.2011 | ||
GR | 10.06.2011 | ||
ES | 20.06.2011 | ||
PT | 11.07.2011 | ||
Former [2011/51] | AT | 09.03.2011 | |
BE | 09.03.2011 | ||
CY | 09.03.2011 | ||
CZ | 09.03.2011 | ||
EE | 09.03.2011 | ||
FI | 09.03.2011 | ||
NL | 09.03.2011 | ||
RO | 09.03.2011 | ||
SI | 09.03.2011 | ||
SK | 09.03.2011 | ||
BG | 09.06.2011 | ||
GR | 10.06.2011 | ||
ES | 20.06.2011 | ||
PT | 11.07.2011 | ||
PL | 20.07.2011 | ||
Former [2011/49] | AT | 09.03.2011 | |
BE | 09.03.2011 | ||
CY | 09.03.2011 | ||
CZ | 09.03.2011 | ||
EE | 09.03.2011 | ||
FI | 09.03.2011 | ||
NL | 09.03.2011 | ||
RO | 09.03.2011 | ||
SI | 09.03.2011 | ||
SK | 09.03.2011 | ||
BG | 09.06.2011 | ||
GR | 10.06.2011 | ||
ES | 20.06.2011 | ||
PT | 11.07.2011 | ||
Former [2011/47] | AT | 09.03.2011 | |
BE | 09.03.2011 | ||
CY | 09.03.2011 | ||
EE | 09.03.2011 | ||
FI | 09.03.2011 | ||
NL | 09.03.2011 | ||
SI | 09.03.2011 | ||
BG | 09.06.2011 | ||
GR | 10.06.2011 | ||
ES | 20.06.2011 | ||
PT | 11.07.2011 | ||
Former [2011/41] | AT | 09.03.2011 | |
BE | 09.03.2011 | ||
CY | 09.03.2011 | ||
FI | 09.03.2011 | ||
NL | 09.03.2011 | ||
SI | 09.03.2011 | ||
BG | 09.06.2011 | ||
GR | 10.06.2011 | ||
ES | 20.06.2011 | ||
Former [2011/39] | AT | 09.03.2011 | |
CY | 09.03.2011 | ||
FI | 09.03.2011 | ||
NL | 09.03.2011 | ||
SI | 09.03.2011 | ||
BG | 09.06.2011 | ||
GR | 10.06.2011 | ||
ES | 20.06.2011 | ||
Former [2011/36] | GR | 10.06.2011 | |
ES | 20.06.2011 | Cited in | International search | [AD]US4593168 (AMADA HARUO [JP]) [AD] 1-32 * the whole document *; | [AD]US4860687 (FRIJLINK PETER M [FR]) [AD] 1-32 * the whole document *; | [AD]US5788777 (BURK JR ALBERT A [US]) [AD] 1-32 * the whole document *; | [X]WO03069029 (LPE SPA [IT], et al) [X] 22-27,32 * page 5, line 3 - line 11; figures 3,4 *; | [A]US2003188687 (PAISLEY MICHAEL JAMES [US], et al) [A] 1-32 * the whole document *; | [X]US2003233768 (KAEPPELER JOHANNES [DE]) [X] 1,2,4,5,18-21 * paragraph [0018]; figures 1,2 *; | [E]WO2004053188 (ETC SRL [IT], et al) [E] 1-7* page 11, line 12 - line 21; figures 4,5 * |