EP1634278 - RECEIVING APPARATUS, SENDING APPARATUS AND TRANSMISSION SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.01.2012 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.10.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 06.11.2013 [2013/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Panasonic Corporation 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8501 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2008/47] | For all designated states Panasonic Corporation 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8501 / JP | ||
Former [2006/11] | For all designated states MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD. 1006, Oaza-Kadoma Kadoma-shi, Osaka 571-8501 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KAWAMURA, Akihisa 1-18-21-504, Higashinakaburi Hirakata-shi Osaka 573-0093 / JP | 02 /
ESIMA, Naoki 12-10, Kitakuzuhamachi Hirakata-shi Osaka 573-1102 / JP | [2006/11] | Representative(s) | Pautex Schneider, Nicole Véronique, et al Novagraaf International SA Chemin de l'Echo 3 1213 Onex / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2006/11] | Pautex Schneider, Nicole Véronique, et al Novagraaf International SA 25, Avenue du Pailly 1220 Les Avanchets - Geneva / CH | Application number, filing date | 04746244.5 | 16.06.2004 | [2006/11] | WO2004JP08775 | Priority number, date | JP20030171729 | 17.06.2003 Original published format: JP 2003171729 | [2006/11] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2004112021 | Date: | 23.12.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/52] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1634278 | Date: | 15.03.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.12.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/11] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1634278 | Date: | 23.03.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/12] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 31.03.2005 | Classification | IPC: | G10L19/14 | [2006/11] | CPC: |
G10L19/167 (EP,US);
G11B20/10 (KR);
G10L19/00 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/11] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | EMPFANGSVORRICHTUNG, SENDEVORRICHTUNG UND ÜBERTRAGUNGSSYSTEM | [2006/11] | English: | RECEIVING APPARATUS, SENDING APPARATUS AND TRANSMISSION SYSTEM | [2006/11] | French: | APPAREIL DE RECEPTION, APPAREIL D'ENVOI ET SYSTEME DE TRANSMISSION | [2006/11] | Entry into regional phase | 24.11.2005 | National basic fee paid | 24.11.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.11.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.04.2005 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 24.11.2005 | Examination requested [2006/11] | 02.11.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.01.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 20.01.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 27.12.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.06.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.06.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 21.06.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 23.03.2011 | BE | 23.03.2011 | CY | 23.03.2011 | CZ | 23.03.2011 | DK | 23.03.2011 | EE | 23.03.2011 | FI | 23.03.2011 | HU | 23.03.2011 | IT | 23.03.2011 | NL | 23.03.2011 | PL | 23.03.2011 | RO | 23.03.2011 | SE | 23.03.2011 | SI | 23.03.2011 | SK | 23.03.2011 | TR | 23.03.2011 | IE | 16.06.2011 | LU | 16.06.2011 | BG | 23.06.2011 | GR | 24.06.2011 | CH | 30.06.2011 | LI | 30.06.2011 | MC | 30.06.2011 | ES | 04.07.2011 | PT | 25.07.2011 | [2013/45] |
Former [2013/44] | AT | 23.03.2011 | |
BE | 23.03.2011 | ||
CY | 23.03.2011 | ||
CZ | 23.03.2011 | ||
DK | 23.03.2011 | ||
EE | 23.03.2011 | ||
FI | 23.03.2011 | ||
IT | 23.03.2011 | ||
NL | 23.03.2011 | ||
PL | 23.03.2011 | ||
RO | 23.03.2011 | ||
SE | 23.03.2011 | ||
SI | 23.03.2011 | ||
SK | 23.03.2011 | ||
TR | 23.03.2011 | ||
IE | 16.06.2011 | ||
LU | 16.06.2011 | ||
BG | 23.06.2011 | ||
GR | 24.06.2011 | ||
CH | 30.06.2011 | ||
LI | 30.06.2011 | ||
MC | 30.06.2011 | ||
ES | 04.07.2011 | ||
PT | 25.07.2011 | ||
Former [2013/25] | AT | 23.03.2011 | |
BE | 23.03.2011 | ||
CY | 23.03.2011 | ||
CZ | 23.03.2011 | ||
DK | 23.03.2011 | ||
EE | 23.03.2011 | ||
FI | 23.03.2011 | ||
IT | 23.03.2011 | ||
NL | 23.03.2011 | ||
PL | 23.03.2011 | ||
RO | 23.03.2011 | ||
SE | 23.03.2011 | ||
SI | 23.03.2011 | ||
SK | 23.03.2011 | ||
IE | 16.06.2011 | ||
LU | 16.06.2011 | ||
BG | 23.06.2011 | ||
GR | 24.06.2011 | ||
CH | 30.06.2011 | ||
LI | 30.06.2011 | ||
MC | 30.06.2011 | ||
ES | 04.07.2011 | ||
PT | 25.07.2011 | ||
Former [2013/21] | AT | 23.03.2011 | |
BE | 23.03.2011 | ||
CY | 23.03.2011 | ||
CZ | 23.03.2011 | ||
DK | 23.03.2011 | ||
EE | 23.03.2011 | ||
FI | 23.03.2011 | ||
IT | 23.03.2011 | ||
NL | 23.03.2011 | ||
PL | 23.03.2011 | ||
RO | 23.03.2011 | ||
SE | 23.03.2011 | ||
SI | 23.03.2011 | ||
SK | 23.03.2011 | ||
IE | 16.06.2011 | ||
BG | 23.06.2011 | ||
GR | 24.06.2011 | ||
CH | 30.06.2011 | ||
LI | 30.06.2011 | ||
MC | 30.06.2011 | ||
ES | 04.07.2011 | ||
PT | 25.07.2011 | ||
Former [2012/23] | AT | 23.03.2011 | |
BE | 23.03.2011 | ||
CY | 23.03.2011 | ||
CZ | 23.03.2011 | ||
DK | 23.03.2011 | ||
EE | 23.03.2011 | ||
FI | 23.03.2011 | ||
IT | 23.03.2011 | ||
NL | 23.03.2011 | ||
PL | 23.03.2011 | ||
RO | 23.03.2011 | ||
SE | 23.03.2011 | ||
SI | 23.03.2011 | ||
SK | 23.03.2011 | ||
IE | 16.06.2011 | ||
BG | 23.06.2011 | ||
GR | 24.06.2011 | ||
CH | 30.06.2011 | ||
LI | 30.06.2011 | ||
ES | 04.07.2011 | ||
PT | 25.07.2011 | ||
Former [2012/20] | AT | 23.03.2011 | |
BE | 23.03.2011 | ||
CY | 23.03.2011 | ||
CZ | 23.03.2011 | ||
DK | 23.03.2011 | ||
EE | 23.03.2011 | ||
FI | 23.03.2011 | ||
NL | 23.03.2011 | ||
PL | 23.03.2011 | ||
RO | 23.03.2011 | ||
SE | 23.03.2011 | ||
SI | 23.03.2011 | ||
SK | 23.03.2011 | ||
IE | 16.06.2011 | ||
BG | 23.06.2011 | ||
GR | 24.06.2011 | ||
CH | 30.06.2011 | ||
LI | 30.06.2011 | ||
ES | 04.07.2011 | ||
PT | 25.07.2011 | ||
Former [2012/11] | AT | 23.03.2011 | |
BE | 23.03.2011 | ||
CY | 23.03.2011 | ||
CZ | 23.03.2011 | ||
DK | 23.03.2011 | ||
EE | 23.03.2011 | ||
FI | 23.03.2011 | ||
NL | 23.03.2011 | ||
PL | 23.03.2011 | ||
RO | 23.03.2011 | ||
SE | 23.03.2011 | ||
SI | 23.03.2011 | ||
SK | 23.03.2011 | ||
BG | 23.06.2011 | ||
GR | 24.06.2011 | ||
ES | 04.07.2011 | ||
PT | 25.07.2011 | ||
Former [2012/10] | AT | 23.03.2011 | |
BE | 23.03.2011 | ||
CY | 23.03.2011 | ||
CZ | 23.03.2011 | ||
DK | 23.03.2011 | ||
EE | 23.03.2011 | ||
FI | 23.03.2011 | ||
NL | 23.03.2011 | ||
RO | 23.03.2011 | ||
SE | 23.03.2011 | ||
SI | 23.03.2011 | ||
SK | 23.03.2011 | ||
BG | 23.06.2011 | ||
GR | 24.06.2011 | ||
ES | 04.07.2011 | ||
PT | 25.07.2011 | ||
Former [2012/02] | AT | 23.03.2011 | |
BE | 23.03.2011 | ||
CY | 23.03.2011 | ||
CZ | 23.03.2011 | ||
EE | 23.03.2011 | ||
FI | 23.03.2011 | ||
NL | 23.03.2011 | ||
RO | 23.03.2011 | ||
SE | 23.03.2011 | ||
SI | 23.03.2011 | ||
SK | 23.03.2011 | ||
BG | 23.06.2011 | ||
GR | 24.06.2011 | ||
ES | 04.07.2011 | ||
PT | 25.07.2011 | ||
PL | 22.08.2011 | ||
Former [2011/51] | AT | 23.03.2011 | |
BE | 23.03.2011 | ||
CY | 23.03.2011 | ||
CZ | 23.03.2011 | ||
EE | 23.03.2011 | ||
FI | 23.03.2011 | ||
RO | 23.03.2011 | ||
SE | 23.03.2011 | ||
SI | 23.03.2011 | ||
SK | 23.03.2011 | ||
BG | 23.06.2011 | ||
GR | 24.06.2011 | ||
ES | 04.07.2011 | ||
PT | 25.07.2011 | ||
PL | 22.08.2011 | ||
Former [2011/49] | AT | 23.03.2011 | |
BE | 23.03.2011 | ||
CY | 23.03.2011 | ||
CZ | 23.03.2011 | ||
EE | 23.03.2011 | ||
FI | 23.03.2011 | ||
RO | 23.03.2011 | ||
SE | 23.03.2011 | ||
SI | 23.03.2011 | ||
SK | 23.03.2011 | ||
BG | 23.06.2011 | ||
GR | 24.06.2011 | ||
ES | 04.07.2011 | ||
PT | 25.07.2011 | ||
Former [2011/47] | AT | 23.03.2011 | |
BE | 23.03.2011 | ||
CY | 23.03.2011 | ||
EE | 23.03.2011 | ||
FI | 23.03.2011 | ||
SE | 23.03.2011 | ||
SI | 23.03.2011 | ||
BG | 23.06.2011 | ||
GR | 24.06.2011 | ||
PT | 25.07.2011 | ||
Former [2011/41] | AT | 23.03.2011 | |
BE | 23.03.2011 | ||
CY | 23.03.2011 | ||
FI | 23.03.2011 | ||
SE | 23.03.2011 | ||
SI | 23.03.2011 | ||
BG | 23.06.2011 | ||
GR | 24.06.2011 | ||
Former [2011/40] | AT | 23.03.2011 | |
CY | 23.03.2011 | ||
FI | 23.03.2011 | ||
SE | 23.03.2011 | ||
SI | 23.03.2011 | ||
BG | 23.06.2011 | ||
GR | 24.06.2011 | ||
Former [2011/37] | CY | 23.03.2011 | |
FI | 23.03.2011 | ||
SE | 23.03.2011 | ||
SI | 23.03.2011 | ||
BG | 23.06.2011 | ||
GR | 24.06.2011 | ||
Former [2011/36] | SE | 23.03.2011 | |
GR | 24.06.2011 | Cited in | International search | [A]US6205223 (RAO RAGHUNATH [US], et al) [A] 1,5,9-14 * column 4, line 38 - line 40 * * column 24, line 48 - column 26, line 19 * * column 26, lines 27-41 *; | [A]US2001044712 (VAINIO JANNE [FI], et al) [A] 1,5,9-14 * figure 2 * * paragraph [0018] ** paragraphs [0069] - [0073] *; | [A] - ZIEGLER T ET AL, "ENHANCING MP3 WITH SBR: FEATURES AND CAPABILITIES OF THE NEW MP3PRO ALGORITHM", AUDIO ENGINEERING SOCIETY CONVENTION PAPER, NEW YORK, NY, US, (20020510), vol. 112, no. 5560, pages 1 - 7, XP009020935 [A] 1,4,9-14 * paragraph [03.2]; figure 3 * | [A] - "DATA SHEET: UDA1352TS, 48khZ IEC 60958 audio DAC", PHILIPS SEMICONDUCTORS, (20021122), URL: http://www.semiconductors.philips.com/acrobat_download/datasheets/UDA1352TS_2.pdf, (20050111), XP002312971 [A] 1,5,9-14 * pages 21,22; table 16 * | [A] - "TEXT OF ISO/IEC 14496-3:2001/FPDAM 1, BANDWIDTH EXTENSIONS", ISO/IEC JTC1/SC29/WG11 N5203, XX, XX, (200210), pages 1 - 90, XP001124389 [A] 1,5,9-14 * paragraph [04.1]; table 4.51 * |