EP1672403 - PROJECTION LENS, PROJECTION DISPLAY EMPLOYING THAT PROJECTION LENS, AND REAR PROJECTION DISPLAY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 01.08.2008 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.08.2009 | Change - representative | published on 09.09.2009 [2009/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD. 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8501 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2006/25] | For all designated states MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD. 1006, Oaza-Kadoma Kadoma-shi, Osaka 571-8501 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WADA, M., Matsushita Electric Industrial Co., Ltd. 19F Matsushita IMP Bldg, 1-3-7, Shiromi, Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 540-6319 / JP | [2006/25] | Representative(s) | Schorr, Frank Jürgen, et al Diehl & Partner GbR Augustenstrasse 46 80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/37] | Schorr, Frank Jürgen, et al Diehl & Partner Augustenstrasse 46 80333 München / DE | ||
Former [2006/25] | Schorr, Frank Jürgen, et al Diehl & Partner GbR Augustenstrasse 46 80333 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 04746728.7 | 24.06.2004 | [2006/25] | WO2004JP09259 | Priority number, date | JP20030340428 | 30.09.2003 Original published format: JP 2003340428 | [2006/25] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005033765 | Date: | 14.04.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/15] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1672403 | Date: | 21.06.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.04.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/25] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 14.04.2005 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.05.2008 | Classification | IPC: | G02B13/16, G02B13/04 | [2008/24] | CPC: |
G02B13/04 (EP,US);
G02B13/16 (EP,US);
H04N9/3114 (EP,US);
H04N9/3147 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2006/25] | G02B13/16, G02B13/18 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2007/01] |
Former [2006/25] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | PROJEKTIONSLINSE, PROJEKTIONS-DISPLAY MIT DIESER PROJEKTIONSLINSE UND RÜCKPROJEKTIONS-DISPLAY | [2006/25] | English: | PROJECTION LENS, PROJECTION DISPLAY EMPLOYING THAT PROJECTION LENS, AND REAR PROJECTION DISPLAY | [2006/25] | French: | LENTILLE DE PROJECTION, AFFICHAGE DE PROJECTION UTILISANT LADITE LENTILLE ET AFFICHAGE DE PROJECTION DE FOND | [2006/25] | Entry into regional phase | 12.04.2006 | Translation filed | 12.04.2006 | National basic fee paid | 12.04.2006 | Search fee paid | 12.04.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.04.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.12.2004 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP | 12.04.2006 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.04.2006 | Examination requested [2006/25] | 24.07.2008 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2008/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.06.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.06.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.06.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5371559 (SAN-NOHE SINYA [JP], et al) [A] 1-26* figures 5,7 *; | [X]JP2003202492 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD) [X] 1-26 * paragraph [0099]; figures 6,8; example 3 *; | [X]JP2003255226 (COSINA CO, et al) [X] 1-26 * figures 1(a)-(b) * | International search | [Y]JP2001042211 (CANON KK); | [A]JP2003156683 (SONY CORP); | [X]JP2003202492 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD); | [Y]JP2003202493 (CANON KK); | [Y]JP2003255226 (COSINA CO, et al) |