EP1640087 - BRICK BODY FOR ROTARY NOZZLE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Opposition rejected Status updated on 06.02.2015 Database last updated on 18.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.02.2015 | Opposition rejected | published on 11.03.2015 [2015/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states JFE Refractories Corporation 1576-2, Higashioki Nakahiro Ako-shi Hyogo-ken 678-0232 / JP | For all designated states NIPPON ROTARY NOZZLE CO., LTD. 3, Bentencho, Tsurumi-ku Yokohama-shi Kanagawa 230-0044 / JP | For all designated states TOKYO YOGYO KABUSHIKI KAISHA Tekko Building, 1-8-2, Marunouchi Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-0005 / JP | For all designated states JFE Mechanical Co., Ltd. 17-4, Kuramae 2-chome, Taitou-ku Tokyo 1110051 / JP | [2007/52] |
Former [2006/13] | For all designated states JFE Engineering Corporation 1-2, Marunouchi 1-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-0005 / JP | ||
For all designated states NIPPON ROTARY NOZZLE CO., LTD. 3, Bentencho, Tsurumi-ku Yokohama-shi Kanagawa 230-0044 / JP | |||
For all designated states TOKYO YOGYO KABUSHIKI KAISHA Tekko Building, 1-8-2, Marunouchi Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-0005 / JP | |||
For all designated states JFE Mechanical Co., Ltd. 17-4, Kuramae 2-chome, Taitou-ku Tokyo 1110051 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YOTABUNN, Tomohiro, Tokyo Yogyo Kabushiki Kaisha 8-2, Marunouchi 1-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 1000005 / JP | 02 /
MIZUNO, Tsuyoshi, Tokyo Yogyo Kabushiki Kaisha 8-2, Marunouchi 1-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 1000005 / JP | 03 /
TAKASUGI, Hideto, Nippon Rotary Nozzle Co., Ltd. 3, Bentencho, Tsurumi-ku Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa 2300044 / JP | 04 /
KONDO, Tsuneo, c/o JFE Engineering Corporation 1-2, Marunouchi 1-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 1000005 / JP | 05 /
INUBUSHI, Hisao, c/o JFE Mechanical Co., Ltd. 17-4, Kuramae 2-chome, Taitou-ku Tokyo 1110051 / JP | [2006/13] | Representative(s) | Jennings, Nigel Robin, et al Kilburn & Strode LLP 20 Red Lion Street London WC1R 4PJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2006/13] | Jennings, Nigel Robin, et al KILBURN & STRODE 20 Red Lion Street London WC1R 4PJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 04746835.0 | 25.06.2004 | [2006/13] | WO2004JP09366 | Priority number, date | JP20030184600 | 27.06.2003 Original published format: JP 2003184600 | [2006/13] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005000501 | Date: | 06.01.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/01] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1640087 | Date: | 29.03.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.01.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/13] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1640087 | Date: | 09.01.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/02] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 06.01.2005 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.03.2007 | Classification | IPC: | B22D41/28 | [2007/14] | CPC: |
B22D41/28 (EP,US);
B22D41/26 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2006/13] | B22D11/10, B22D41/26 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/13] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | STEINKÖRPER FÜR DREHBARE DÜSE | [2006/15] | English: | BRICK BODY FOR ROTARY NOZZLE | [2006/13] | French: | Plaque réfractaire pour une fermeture à tiroir de type rotatif | [2007/29] |
Former [2006/13] | STEINK RPER F R DREHBARE D SE | ||
Former [2006/13] | CORPS EN BRIQUE POUR TUYERE ROTATIVE | Entry into regional phase | 09.02.2005 | Translation filed | 09.02.2005 | National basic fee paid | 09.02.2005 | Search fee paid | 13.02.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.02.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.02.2006 | Examination requested [2006/15] | 11.07.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.11.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 01.11.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
01.10.2008
ADMISSIBLE Refractory Intellectual Property GmbH & Co. KG Wienerbergstrasse 11 1100 Wien / AT Opponent's representative Becker, Thomas, et al, et al Patentanwälte Becker & Müller Turmstrasse 22 40878 Ratingen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/46] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
01.10.2008
ADMISSIBLE Refractory Intellectual Property GmbH & Co. KG Wienerbergstrasse 11 1100 Wien / AT Opponent's representative Becker, Thomas, et al, et al Patentanwälte Becker & Müller Turmstrasse 22 40878 Ratingen / DE | 17.11.2008 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 15.05.2009 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 02.06.2009 | Communication of observations of patent proprietor (Time limit: M04) | 05.09.2009 | Reply of parties involved to observations of patent proprietor | 25.09.2014 | Legal effect of rejection of opposition [2015/11] | 25.09.2014 | Date of oral proceedings | 23.10.2014 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 23.10.2014 | Date of despatch of rejection of opposition | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.06.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.06.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 13.02.2006 | AT   M01   Fee paid on   13.02.2006 | 13.02.2006 | BE   M01   Fee paid on   13.02.2006 | 13.02.2006 | BG   M01   Fee paid on   13.02.2006 | 13.02.2006 | CH   M01   Fee paid on   13.02.2006 | 13.02.2006 | CY   M01   Fee paid on   13.02.2006 | 13.02.2006 | CZ   M01   Fee paid on   13.02.2006 | 13.02.2006 | DE   M01   Fee paid on   13.02.2006 | 13.02.2006 | DK   M01   Fee paid on   13.02.2006 | 13.02.2006 | EE   M01   Fee paid on   13.02.2006 | 13.02.2006 | ES   M01   Fee paid on   13.02.2006 | 13.02.2006 | FI   M01   Fee paid on   13.02.2006 | 13.02.2006 | FR   M01   Fee paid on   13.02.2006 | 13.02.2006 | GB   M01   Fee paid on   13.02.2006 | 13.02.2006 | GR   M01   Fee paid on   13.02.2006 | 13.02.2006 | HU   M01   Fee paid on   13.02.2006 | 13.02.2006 | IE   M01   Fee paid on   13.02.2006 | 13.02.2006 | IT   M01   Fee paid on   13.02.2006 | 13.02.2006 | LU   M01   Fee paid on   13.02.2006 | 13.02.2006 | MC   M01   Fee paid on   13.02.2006 | 13.02.2006 | NL   M01   Fee paid on   13.02.2006 | 13.02.2006 | PL   M01   Fee paid on   13.02.2006 | 13.02.2006 | PT   M01   Fee paid on   13.02.2006 | 13.02.2006 | RO   M01   Fee paid on   13.02.2006 | 13.02.2006 | SE   M01   Fee paid on   13.02.2006 | 13.02.2006 | SI   M01   Fee paid on   13.02.2006 | 13.02.2006 | SK   M01   Fee paid on   13.02.2006 | 13.02.2006 | TR   M01   Fee paid on   13.02.2006 | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 13.02.2006 | M01   Fee paid on   13.02.2006 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 09.01.2008 | CH | 09.01.2008 | CY | 09.01.2008 | CZ | 09.01.2008 | DK | 09.01.2008 | EE | 09.01.2008 | IT | 09.01.2008 | LI | 09.01.2008 | PL | 09.01.2008 | PT | 09.01.2008 | RO | 09.01.2008 | SI | 09.01.2008 | SK | 09.01.2008 | TR | 09.01.2008 | BG | 09.04.2008 | GR | 10.04.2008 | ES | 20.04.2008 | IE | 25.06.2008 | MC | 30.06.2008 | HU | 10.07.2008 | FI | 25.06.2013 | SE | 26.06.2013 | NL | 01.01.2014 | [2014/22] |
Former [2014/12] | AT | 09.01.2008 | |
CH | 09.01.2008 | ||
CY | 09.01.2008 | ||
CZ | 09.01.2008 | ||
DK | 09.01.2008 | ||
EE | 09.01.2008 | ||
IT | 09.01.2008 | ||
LI | 09.01.2008 | ||
PL | 09.01.2008 | ||
PT | 09.01.2008 | ||
RO | 09.01.2008 | ||
SI | 09.01.2008 | ||
SK | 09.01.2008 | ||
TR | 09.01.2008 | ||
BG | 09.04.2008 | ||
GR | 10.04.2008 | ||
ES | 20.04.2008 | ||
IE | 25.06.2008 | ||
MC | 30.06.2008 | ||
HU | 10.07.2008 | ||
FI | 25.06.2013 | ||
SE | 26.06.2013 | ||
Former [2014/09] | AT | 09.01.2008 | |
CH | 09.01.2008 | ||
CY | 09.01.2008 | ||
CZ | 09.01.2008 | ||
DK | 09.01.2008 | ||
EE | 09.01.2008 | ||
IT | 09.01.2008 | ||
LI | 09.01.2008 | ||
PL | 09.01.2008 | ||
PT | 09.01.2008 | ||
RO | 09.01.2008 | ||
SI | 09.01.2008 | ||
SK | 09.01.2008 | ||
TR | 09.01.2008 | ||
BG | 09.04.2008 | ||
GR | 10.04.2008 | ||
ES | 20.04.2008 | ||
IE | 25.06.2008 | ||
MC | 30.06.2008 | ||
HU | 10.07.2008 | ||
SE | 26.06.2013 | ||
Former [2010/50] | AT | 09.01.2008 | |
CH | 09.01.2008 | ||
CY | 09.01.2008 | ||
CZ | 09.01.2008 | ||
DK | 09.01.2008 | ||
EE | 09.01.2008 | ||
IT | 09.01.2008 | ||
LI | 09.01.2008 | ||
PL | 09.01.2008 | ||
RO | 09.01.2008 | ||
SI | 09.01.2008 | ||
SK | 09.01.2008 | ||
TR | 09.01.2008 | ||
BG | 09.04.2008 | ||
GR | 10.04.2008 | ||
IE | 25.06.2008 | ||
MC | 30.06.2008 | ||
HU | 10.07.2008 | ||
Former [2010/38] | AT | 09.01.2008 | |
CH | 09.01.2008 | ||
CY | 09.01.2008 | ||
CZ | 09.01.2008 | ||
DK | 09.01.2008 | ||
EE | 09.01.2008 | ||
IT | 09.01.2008 | ||
LI | 09.01.2008 | ||
PL | 09.01.2008 | ||
RO | 09.01.2008 | ||
SI | 09.01.2008 | ||
SK | 09.01.2008 | ||
TR | 09.01.2008 | ||
BG | 09.04.2008 | ||
IE | 25.06.2008 | ||
MC | 30.06.2008 | ||
HU | 10.07.2008 | ||
Former [2010/34] | AT | 09.01.2008 | |
CH | 09.01.2008 | ||
CY | 09.01.2008 | ||
CZ | 09.01.2008 | ||
DK | 09.01.2008 | ||
EE | 09.01.2008 | ||
IT | 09.01.2008 | ||
LI | 09.01.2008 | ||
PL | 09.01.2008 | ||
RO | 09.01.2008 | ||
SI | 09.01.2008 | ||
SK | 09.01.2008 | ||
BG | 09.04.2008 | ||
IE | 25.06.2008 | ||
MC | 30.06.2008 | ||
HU | 10.07.2008 | ||
Former [2009/41] | AT | 09.01.2008 | |
CH | 09.01.2008 | ||
CY | 09.01.2008 | ||
CZ | 09.01.2008 | ||
DK | 09.01.2008 | ||
EE | 09.01.2008 | ||
IT | 09.01.2008 | ||
LI | 09.01.2008 | ||
PL | 09.01.2008 | ||
RO | 09.01.2008 | ||
SI | 09.01.2008 | ||
SK | 09.01.2008 | ||
BG | 09.04.2008 | ||
IE | 25.06.2008 | ||
MC | 30.06.2008 | ||
Former [2009/35] | AT | 09.01.2008 | |
CH | 09.01.2008 | ||
CY | 09.01.2008 | ||
CZ | 09.01.2008 | ||
DK | 09.01.2008 | ||
EE | 09.01.2008 | ||
LI | 09.01.2008 | ||
PL | 09.01.2008 | ||
RO | 09.01.2008 | ||
SI | 09.01.2008 | ||
SK | 09.01.2008 | ||
BG | 09.04.2008 | ||
IE | 25.06.2008 | ||
MC | 30.06.2008 | ||
Former [2009/24] | AT | 09.01.2008 | |
CH | 09.01.2008 | ||
CZ | 09.01.2008 | ||
DK | 09.01.2008 | ||
EE | 09.01.2008 | ||
LI | 09.01.2008 | ||
PL | 09.01.2008 | ||
RO | 09.01.2008 | ||
SI | 09.01.2008 | ||
SK | 09.01.2008 | ||
BG | 09.04.2008 | ||
IE | 25.06.2008 | ||
MC | 30.06.2008 | ||
Former [2009/22] | AT | 09.01.2008 | |
CH | 09.01.2008 | ||
CZ | 09.01.2008 | ||
DK | 09.01.2008 | ||
EE | 09.01.2008 | ||
LI | 09.01.2008 | ||
PL | 09.01.2008 | ||
RO | 09.01.2008 | ||
SI | 09.01.2008 | ||
SK | 09.01.2008 | ||
BG | 09.04.2008 | ||
MC | 30.06.2008 | ||
Former [2009/07] | AT | 09.01.2008 | |
CH | 09.01.2008 | ||
CZ | 09.01.2008 | ||
DK | 09.01.2008 | ||
LI | 09.01.2008 | ||
PL | 09.01.2008 | ||
RO | 09.01.2008 | ||
SI | 09.01.2008 | ||
SK | 09.01.2008 | ||
BG | 09.04.2008 | ||
MC | 30.06.2008 | ||
Former [2008/50] | AT | 09.01.2008 | |
CH | 09.01.2008 | ||
CZ | 09.01.2008 | ||
DK | 09.01.2008 | ||
LI | 09.01.2008 | ||
PL | 09.01.2008 | ||
RO | 09.01.2008 | ||
SI | 09.01.2008 | ||
SK | 09.01.2008 | ||
BG | 09.04.2008 | ||
Former [2008/46] | AT | 09.01.2008 | |
CH | 09.01.2008 | ||
DK | 09.01.2008 | ||
LI | 09.01.2008 | ||
PL | 09.01.2008 | ||
SI | 09.01.2008 | ||
BG | 09.04.2008 | ||
Former [2008/43] | AT | 09.01.2008 | |
CH | 09.01.2008 | ||
LI | 09.01.2008 | ||
PL | 09.01.2008 | ||
SI | 09.01.2008 | ||
BG | 09.04.2008 | ||
Former [2008/39] | AT | 09.01.2008 | |
CH | 09.01.2008 | ||
LI | 09.01.2008 | ||
SI | 09.01.2008 | ||
BG | 09.04.2008 | ||
Former [2008/35] | CH | 09.01.2008 | |
LI | 09.01.2008 | ||
SI | 09.01.2008 | ||
Former [2008/26] | SI | 09.01.2008 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPS619964 (METACON AG) [A] 1-3 * abstract *; | [A]US4618126 (TINNES BERNHARD [CH], et al) [A] 1-3 * figures 2-4,6; claims 1-11 *; | [A]US4747580 (TINNES BERNHARD [CH], et al) [A] 1-3 * figures 1-6; claims 1-5 *; | [A]JPH0615440 (NIPPON ROTARY NOZZLE CO LTD, et al) [A] 1-3 * abstract *; | [AD]JPH09225627 (NIPPON KOKAN KK, et al) [AD] * abstract *; | [A]EP0838291 (NIPPON KOKAN KK [JP], et al) [A] 1-3 * figures 1-12; claims 1-4 *; | [A]WO0141956 (VESUVIUS CRUCIBLE CO [US], et al) [A] 1-3 * figures 1,2; claims 1-6 *; | [A]JP3278797B (NIPPON KOKAN KK; NIPPON ROTARY NOZZLE CO LTD; TOKYO YOGYO KK; KOKAN KI) [A] 1-3* abstract *; | [A]WO02070173 (VESUVIUS CRUCIBLE CO [US], et al) [A] 1-3 * figures 1,2; claims 1-7 * | International search | [A]JPS619964 (METACON AG); | [A]JPH0615400 (EMHART INC); | [A]JP3278797B |