EP1652873 - RUBBER MASTER BATCH AND METHOD FOR PRODUCTION THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 10.08.2012 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.08.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 12.09.2012 [2012/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bridgestone Corporation 10-1, Kyobashi 1-chome Chuo-ku Tokyo 104-8340 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2006/18] | For all designated states Bridgestone Corporation 10-1, Kyobashi 1-chome, Chuo-ku Tokyo 104-8340 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YANAGISAWA, Kazuhiro 3-1-1, ogawahigashi-cho Kodaira-shi, Tokyo 1878531 / JP | 02 /
SOMENO, Kazuaki 3-1-1, ogawahigashi-cho Kodaira-shi, Tokyo 1878531 / JP | [2006/18] | Representative(s) | Oxley, Robin John George, et al Marks & Clerk LLP 15 Fetter Lane London EC4A 1BW / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2012/17] | Oxley, Robin John George, et al Marks & Clerk LLP 90 Long Acre London WC2E 9RA / GB | ||
Former [2006/18] | Whalley, Kevin Marks & Clerk 90 Long Acre London WC2E 9RA / GB | Application number, filing date | 04746900.2 | 02.07.2004 | [2006/18] | WO2004JP09431 | Priority number, date | JP20030286743 | 05.08.2003 Original published format: JP 2003286743 | [2006/18] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005012396 | Date: | 10.02.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/06] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1652873 | Date: | 03.05.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.02.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/18] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 10.02.2005 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.09.2009 | Classification | IPC: | C08J3/22, B60C1/00, C08K3/04, C08K3/22, C08K3/36, C08L21/00 | [2006/18] | CPC: |
B29B7/005 (EP,US);
B29B7/90 (EP,US);
C08J3/215 (EP,US);
C08K3/013 (EP,US);
C08J2321/00 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
C08K3/013, C08L21/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [2006/45] |
Former [2006/18] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | KAUTSCHUKMASTERBATCH UND HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN DAFÜR | [2006/18] | English: | RUBBER MASTER BATCH AND METHOD FOR PRODUCTION THEREOF | [2006/18] | French: | MELANGE MAITRE DE CAOUTCHOUC ET SON PROCEDE D'OBTENTION | [2006/18] | Entry into regional phase | 31.01.2006 | Translation filed | 30.01.2006 | National basic fee paid | 30.01.2006 | Search fee paid | 30.01.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.01.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 31.01.2006 | Examination requested [2006/18] | 10.03.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.07.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.01.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.05.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.06.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.10.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.11.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.03.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2012/37] | 24.04.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2012/37] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 10.03.2010 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.07.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 10.07.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.07.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 12.07.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0426024 (DU PONT [US]) [X] 1-4,8-11 * page 3, line 53 - line 54 * * page 4, line 18 - line 38 * * page 6, line 47 - line 49 ** page 8, line 28 - line 39; figure 1; claim 1 *; | [X]WO03024683 (BUEHLER AG [CH], et al) [X] 1-4,8-11 * page 4, line 18 - line 23 * * page 5, line 16 - line 22 * * page 6, line 6 - line 12 * * page 8, line 8 - line 12 * * page 8, line 20 - page 9, line 5 * * page 10, line 11 - line 14; figure 1; claims 1-9,38 * | International search | [A]JP2002363295 (SUMITOMO RUBBER IND); | [A]EP1283219 (BRIDGESTONE CORP [JP]); | [A]US2003134943 (LABARRE DOMINIQUE [FR], et al) | Examination | US6348522 | JP2003138025 |