EP1538553 - EXTERNAL STORAGE DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.06.2011 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.06.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 20.07.2011 [2011/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sony Corporation 7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141-0001 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2010/32] | For all designated states Sony Corporation 7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141-0001 / JP | ||
Former [2005/23] | For all designated states Sony Corporation 7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome, Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141-0001 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SUGAWARA, Norio c/o Sony Corporation 7-35 Kitashinagawa 6-chome Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141001 / JP | 02 /
ANDO, Takashi c/o Sony Corporation 7-35 Kitashinagawa 6-chome Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141001 / JP | 03 /
KASUYA, Shigeru c/o Sony Corporation 7-35 Kitashinagawa 6-chome Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141001 / JP | [2010/08] |
Former [2005/23] | 01 /
SUGAWARA, Norio x x / JP | ||
02 /
ANDO, Takashi x x / JP | |||
03 /
KASUYA, Shigeru x x / JP | Representative(s) | Robinson, Nigel Alexander Julian, et al D Young & Co LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2005/23] | Robinson, Nigel Alexander Julian, et al D Young & Co 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | Application number, filing date | 04746925.9 | 28.06.2004 | [2005/23] | WO2004JP09456 | Priority number, date | JP20030188719 | 30.06.2003 Original published format: JP 2003188719 | [2005/23] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005001755 | Date: | 06.01.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/01] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1538553 | Date: | 08.06.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.01.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/23] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1538553 | Date: | 11.08.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/32] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 06.01.2005 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.02.2009 | Classification | IPC: | G06F21/00 | [2009/42] | CPC: |
G06F21/78 (EP,US);
G06K19/00 (KR);
G06F21/32 (EP,US);
G11B20/04 (KR)
|
Former IPC [2005/23] | G06K19/00, G06T1/00 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2006/40] |
Former [2005/23] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | EXTERNES SPEICHERGERÄT | [2005/23] | English: | EXTERNAL STORAGE DEVICE | [2005/23] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE STOCKAGE EXTERNE | [2005/23] | Entry into regional phase | 31.01.2005 | Translation filed | 07.02.2005 | National basic fee paid | 07.02.2005 | Search fee paid | 07.02.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.02.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.02.2005 | Examination requested [2005/23] | 20.04.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.07.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.02.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.05.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 26.05.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 12.05.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.06.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 16.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.06.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2001043702 (ELTETO LASZLO [US], et al) [A] 1-7 * paragraph [0023] - paragraph [0024] * * paragraph [0095] - paragraph [0099] * * figure 6 *; | [A]WO0242887 (FUJITSU SIEMENS COMPUTERS GMBH [DE], et al) [A] 1-7* the whole document *; | [Y]US6456500 (CHEN PO-TSANG [TW]) [Y] 1-7 * column 2, line 15 - column 3, line 29 * * figure - *; | [Y]WO03003282 (TREK 2000 INT LTD [SG], et al) [Y] 1-7 * page 10, line 25 - page 12, line 10 * * figures 1-10 * | International search | [A]JP2000215296 (STOCKO CONTACT GMBH & CO KG); | [A]JP3060242U ; | [A]JPH11312225 (DAINIPPON PRINTING CO LTD) | by applicant | WO03003282 | US6456500 |