EP1649748 - AQUEOUS SUSPENSION PREPARATION OF BACTERICIDE FOR FOLIEAGE APPLICATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.07.2012 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.07.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 20.08.2014 [2014/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MITSUI CHEMICALS AGRO, INC. 5-2, Higashi-Shimbashi 1 chome, Minato-ku Tokyo 105-7117 / JP | [2009/37] |
Former [2009/34] | For all designated states MITSUI CHEMICALS AGRO, INC. 5-2, Higashi-Shinbashi 1 chome, Minato-ku Tokyo 105-7117 / JP | ||
Former [2006/17] | For all designated states Mitsui Chemicals, Inc. 5-2, Higashi-Shimbashi 1-chome, Minato-ku Tokyo 105-7117 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MORINAGA, Koichi c/o Mitsui Chemicals, Inc. 1144, Togo Mobara-shi, Chiba 297-0017 / JP | 02 /
YANASE, Yuji c/o Mitsui Chemicals, Inc. 1144, Togo Mobara-shi, Chiba 297-0017 / JP | 03 /
MIYAMA, Kanemitsu c/o Mitsui Chemicals, Inc. 1144, Togo Mobara-shi, Chiba 297-0017 / JP | 04 /
KAWASHIMA, Hideo c/o Mitsui Chemicals, Inc. 1144, Togo Mobara-shi, Chiba 297-0017 / JP | [2011/35] |
Former [2006/17] | 01 /
MORINAGA, Koichi c/o Mitsui Chemicals, Inc. 1144, Togo Mobara-shi, Chiba 297-0017 / JP | ||
02 /
YANASE, Yuji c/o Mitsui Chemicals, Inc. 1144, Togo Mobara-shi, Chiba 297-0017 / JP | |||
03 /
MIYAMA, Kanemitsu c/o Mitsui Chemicals, Inc. 1144, Togo Mobara-shi, Chiba 297-0017 / JP | |||
04 /
KAWASHIMA, Hideo c/o Mitsui Chemicals, Inc. 1144, Togo Mobara-shi, Chiba 297-0017 / JP | Representative(s) | Stuart, Ian Alexander, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP City Tower 40 Basinghall Street London EC2V 5DE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/35] | Stuart, Ian Alexander, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP York House 23 Kingsway London WC2B 6HP / GB | ||
Former [2006/17] | Stuart, Ian Alexander, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP York House 23 Kingsway London WC2B 6HP / GB | Application number, filing date | 04747452.3 | 07.07.2004 | [2006/17] | WO2004JP09986 | Priority number, date | JP20030199289 | 18.07.2003 Original published format: JP 2003199289 | [2006/17] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005006863 | Date: | 27.01.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/04] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1649748 | Date: | 26.04.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.01.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/17] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1649748 | Date: | 31.08.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/35] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 27.01.2005 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.07.2010 | Classification | IPC: | A01N25/04, A01N25/30, A01N43/56 | [2006/17] | CPC: |
A01N43/56 (EP,KR,US);
A01N25/04 (KR);
A01N25/30 (KR)
| C-Set: |
A01N43/56, A01N2300/00 (US,EP);
A01N43/56, A01N25/24, A01N25/30, A01N25/04 (EP,US) | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/17] | Title | German: | WÄSSRIGES BAKTERIZID-SUSPENSIONSPRÄPARAT FÜR DIE BLATTANWENDUNG | [2006/17] | English: | AQUEOUS SUSPENSION PREPARATION OF BACTERICIDE FOR FOLIEAGE APPLICATION | [2006/17] | French: | PREPARATION D'UNE SUSPENSION AQUEUSE D'UN BACTERICIDE A ACTION FOLIAIRE | [2006/17] | Entry into regional phase | 31.01.2006 | Translation filed | 07.02.2006 | National basic fee paid | 07.02.2006 | Search fee paid | 07.02.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.02.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 31.01.2006 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.02.2006 | Examination requested [2006/17] | 16.02.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.06.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 17.06.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 16.02.2011 | Opposition(s) | 01.06.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.07.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.07.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 20.07.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 20.07.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 07.07.2004 | AT | 31.08.2011 | BE | 31.08.2011 | CY | 31.08.2011 | CZ | 31.08.2011 | DK | 31.08.2011 | EE | 31.08.2011 | FI | 31.08.2011 | IT | 31.08.2011 | NL | 31.08.2011 | PL | 31.08.2011 | RO | 31.08.2011 | SE | 31.08.2011 | SI | 31.08.2011 | SK | 31.08.2011 | TR | 31.08.2011 | BG | 30.11.2011 | GR | 01.12.2011 | ES | 11.12.2011 | PT | 02.01.2012 | [2014/34] |
Former [2014/21] | AT | 31.08.2011 | |
BE | 31.08.2011 | ||
CY | 31.08.2011 | ||
CZ | 31.08.2011 | ||
DK | 31.08.2011 | ||
EE | 31.08.2011 | ||
FI | 31.08.2011 | ||
IT | 31.08.2011 | ||
NL | 31.08.2011 | ||
PL | 31.08.2011 | ||
RO | 31.08.2011 | ||
SE | 31.08.2011 | ||
SI | 31.08.2011 | ||
SK | 31.08.2011 | ||
TR | 31.08.2011 | ||
BG | 30.11.2011 | ||
GR | 01.12.2011 | ||
ES | 11.12.2011 | ||
PT | 02.01.2012 | ||
Former [2013/29] | AT | 31.08.2011 | |
BE | 31.08.2011 | ||
CY | 31.08.2011 | ||
CZ | 31.08.2011 | ||
DK | 31.08.2011 | ||
EE | 31.08.2011 | ||
FI | 31.08.2011 | ||
IT | 31.08.2011 | ||
NL | 31.08.2011 | ||
PL | 31.08.2011 | ||
RO | 31.08.2011 | ||
SE | 31.08.2011 | ||
SI | 31.08.2011 | ||
SK | 31.08.2011 | ||
BG | 30.11.2011 | ||
GR | 01.12.2011 | ||
ES | 11.12.2011 | ||
PT | 02.01.2012 | ||
Former [2013/22] | AT | 31.08.2011 | |
BE | 31.08.2011 | ||
CY | 31.08.2011 | ||
CZ | 31.08.2011 | ||
DK | 31.08.2011 | ||
EE | 31.08.2011 | ||
FI | 31.08.2011 | ||
IT | 31.08.2011 | ||
NL | 31.08.2011 | ||
PL | 31.08.2011 | ||
RO | 31.08.2011 | ||
SE | 31.08.2011 | ||
SI | 31.08.2011 | ||
SK | 31.08.2011 | ||
GR | 01.12.2011 | ||
ES | 11.12.2011 | ||
PT | 02.01.2012 | ||
Former [2012/33] | AT | 31.08.2011 | |
BE | 31.08.2011 | ||
CY | 31.08.2011 | ||
CZ | 31.08.2011 | ||
DK | 31.08.2011 | ||
EE | 31.08.2011 | ||
FI | 31.08.2011 | ||
IT | 31.08.2011 | ||
NL | 31.08.2011 | ||
PL | 31.08.2011 | ||
RO | 31.08.2011 | ||
SE | 31.08.2011 | ||
SI | 31.08.2011 | ||
SK | 31.08.2011 | ||
GR | 01.12.2011 | ||
PT | 02.01.2012 | ||
Former [2012/26] | AT | 31.08.2011 | |
BE | 31.08.2011 | ||
CY | 31.08.2011 | ||
CZ | 31.08.2011 | ||
EE | 31.08.2011 | ||
FI | 31.08.2011 | ||
IT | 31.08.2011 | ||
NL | 31.08.2011 | ||
PL | 31.08.2011 | ||
RO | 31.08.2011 | ||
SE | 31.08.2011 | ||
SI | 31.08.2011 | ||
SK | 31.08.2011 | ||
GR | 01.12.2011 | ||
PT | 02.01.2012 | ||
Former [2012/23] | AT | 31.08.2011 | |
BE | 31.08.2011 | ||
CY | 31.08.2011 | ||
CZ | 31.08.2011 | ||
EE | 31.08.2011 | ||
FI | 31.08.2011 | ||
IT | 31.08.2011 | ||
NL | 31.08.2011 | ||
RO | 31.08.2011 | ||
SE | 31.08.2011 | ||
SI | 31.08.2011 | ||
SK | 31.08.2011 | ||
GR | 01.12.2011 | ||
PT | 02.01.2012 | ||
Former [2012/21] | AT | 31.08.2011 | |
BE | 31.08.2011 | ||
CY | 31.08.2011 | ||
CZ | 31.08.2011 | ||
FI | 31.08.2011 | ||
NL | 31.08.2011 | ||
SE | 31.08.2011 | ||
SI | 31.08.2011 | ||
GR | 01.12.2011 | ||
Former [2012/17] | AT | 31.08.2011 | |
BE | 31.08.2011 | ||
CY | 31.08.2011 | ||
FI | 31.08.2011 | ||
NL | 31.08.2011 | ||
SE | 31.08.2011 | ||
SI | 31.08.2011 | ||
GR | 01.12.2011 | ||
Former [2012/12] | AT | 31.08.2011 | |
CY | 31.08.2011 | ||
FI | 31.08.2011 | ||
NL | 31.08.2011 | ||
SE | 31.08.2011 | ||
SI | 31.08.2011 | ||
GR | 01.12.2011 | ||
Former [2012/11] | AT | 31.08.2011 | |
FI | 31.08.2011 | ||
NL | 31.08.2011 | ||
SE | 31.08.2011 | ||
SI | 31.08.2011 | ||
GR | 01.12.2011 | ||
Former [2012/10] | FI | 31.08.2011 | |
NL | 31.08.2011 | ||
SE | 31.08.2011 | ||
GR | 01.12.2011 | ||
Former [2012/09] | FI | 31.08.2011 | |
NL | 31.08.2011 | ||
Former [2012/08] | NL | 31.08.2011 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4324781 (OKAMOTO YUKIKAZU, et al) [A] 1-6 * column 2, line 45 - column 3, line 10 *; | [A]JPH0240301 (KYUSHU SANKYO KK) [A] 1-6 * the whole document *; | [A]FR2698242 (FRANCAIS PROD IND CFPI [FR]) [A] 1-6 * page 1, line 18 - page 1, line 33 ** page 2, line 19 - page 3, line 7 *; | [A]EP0737682 (MITSUI TOATSU CHEMICALS [JP]) [A] 1-6 * page 28; table 5; compound 1.10 *; | [A]US5863909 (KURITA KAZUHIKO [JP], et al) [A] 1-6 * column 1, line 1 - column 3, line 7 *; | [A]WO9933340 (AQUATROL CORP [US], et al) [A] 1-6 * page 5, line 5 - line 18 * | International search | [Y]JPS5536458 (SUMITOMO CHEMICAL CO); | [Y]JPH07165515 (MITSUBISHI CHEM CORP); | [Y]JPH09235282 (MITSUI TOATSU CHEMICALS); | [Y]JP2002308703 (NIHON NOHYAKU CO LTD) |