EP1648195 - SOUND DETECTION MECHANISM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 30.07.2010 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.07.2010 | Withdrawal of application | published on 01.09.2010 [2010/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hosiden Corporation 4-33, Kitakyuhoji 1-chome Yao-shi, Osaka 581-0071 / JP | For all designated states TOKYO ELECTRON LIMITED 3-6 Akasaka 5-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 107-8481 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2006/16] | For all designated states HOSIDEN CORPORATION 4-33, Kitakyuhoji 1-chome Yao-shi Osaka 581-0071 / JP | ||
For all designated states TOKYO ELECTRON LIMITED 3-6 Akasaka 5-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 107-8481 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
OHBAYASHI, Yoshiaki 7-13, Chiyogaoka 1-chome, Nara-shi, Nara 6310045 / JP | 02 /
YASUDA, Mamoru 11-2, Sakuragaoka-higashimachi 5-chome, Nishi-ku Kobe-shi, Hyogo 6512225 / JP | 03 /
SAEKI, Shinichi 6-11, Ogata 3-chome, Kashiwara-shi, Osaka 5820018 / JP | 04 /
KOMAI, Masatsugu 3-16, Shoraiso, Nishinomiya-shi, Hyogo 6620822 / JP | 05 /
KAGAWA, Kenichi, c/o TOKYO ELECTRON LIMITED 1-8, Fuso-cho Amagasaki-shi, Hyogo 6600891 / JP | [2006/16] | Representative(s) | LBP Lemcke, Brommer & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Siegfried-Kühn-Straße 4 76135 Karlsruhe / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/02] | Lemcke, Brommer & Partner Patentanwälte Bismarckstrasse 16 76133 Karlsruhe / DE | ||
Former [2006/16] | Blumenröhr, Dietrich Lemcke, Brommer & Partner Patentanwälte Bismarckstrasse 16 76133 Karlsruhe / DE | Application number, filing date | 04747508.2 | 14.07.2004 | [2006/16] | WO2004JP10042 | Priority number, date | JP20030276009 | 17.07.2003 Original published format: JP 2003276009 | [2006/16] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005009077 | Date: | 27.01.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/04] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1648195 | Date: | 19.04.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.01.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/16] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 27.01.2005 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.06.2010 | Classification | IPC: | H04R19/04 | [2006/16] | CPC: |
H04R19/016 (EP,US);
H04R19/04 (EP,KR,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DK, FI, SE [2006/43] |
Former [2006/16] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SCHALLDETEKTIONSMECHANISMUS | [2006/16] | English: | SOUND DETECTION MECHANISM | [2006/16] | French: | MECANISME DE DETECTION DE SON | [2006/16] | Entry into regional phase | 09.12.2005 | Translation filed | 09.12.2005 | National basic fee paid | 09.12.2005 | Search fee paid | 09.12.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.12.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.12.2005 | Examination requested [2006/16] | 26.07.2010 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2010/35] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.07.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 01.06.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 03.06.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 05.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 11.06.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO9739464 (CALIFORNIA INST OF TECHN [US]) [A] 1-13* page 4, line 5 - page 11, line 3; figures 1A-3 *; | [A]EP1282339 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1-13 * column 5, line 50 - column 8, line 52 * * figures 1-3 *; | [X]US2003099368 (CHIANG DAR-MING [TW], et al) [X] 1-13 * page 1, column r, paragraph l - page 3, column r, paragraph 5 * * figures 1G,2F,3 * | International search | [Y]JP2003163996 (IND TECH RES INST); | [Y]JPH0895572 (CANON KK); | [Y]JP2002209298 (SEIKO EPSON CORP); | [Y]JP2002223499 (SEIKO EPSON CORP); | [Y]JP2003163998 (SEIKO EPSON CORP) |