Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8257703 | Global Dossier | 04.09.2012 | B2 | US2010172899 | 08.07.2010 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US72716210 | 18.03.2010 | US56466504 | 15.07.2004 | US48733303 | 15.07.2003 | WO2004JP10444 | 15.07.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7709615 | Global Dossier | 04.05.2010 | B2 | US2007154469 | 05.07.2007 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US56466504 | 15.07.2004 | US48733303 | 15.07.2003 | WO2004JP10444 | 15.07.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP5452835B | Global Dossier | 26.03.2014 | B2 | JPWO2005005636 | 24.08.2006 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US48733303 | 15.07.2003 | WO2004JP10444 | 15.07.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2204190 | Global Dossier | 07.07.2010 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP04747833 | 15.07.2004 | US48733303 | 15.07.2003 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2004256354B | Global Dossier | 07.07.2011 | B2 | AU2004256354 | 20.01.2005 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US48733303 | 15.07.2003 | WO2004JP10444 | 15.07.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1652925 | Global Dossier | 08.12.2010 | B1 | EP1652925 | 04.07.2007 | A4 | EP1652925 | 03.05.2006 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US48733303 | 15.07.2003 | WO2004JP10444 | 15.07.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ATE490787T | 15.12.2010 | T1 | Priority number | Date | US48733303 | 15.07.2003 | WO2004JP10444 | 15.07.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2532966 | 04.12.2012 | C | CA2532966 | 20.01.2005 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US48733303 | 15.07.2003 | WO2004JP10444 | 15.07.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE602004030451D1 | 20.01.2011 | D1 | Priority number | Date | US48733303 | 15.07.2003 | WO2004JP10444 | 15.07.2004 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2005005636 | Global Dossier | 20.01.2005 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US48733303 | 15.07.2003 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | TWI342336B | 21.05.2011 | B | TW200510532 | 16.03.2005 | A | Priority number | Date | US48733303 | 15.07.2003 | Type | Divisional application | EP2204190 |