EP1644591 - BALCONY THAT CAN BE FOLDED [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.11.2008 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.11.2010 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): GR | published on 15.12.2010 [2010/50] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HOFMAN DUJARDIN ARCHITECTEN V.O.F. Haarlemmer Houttuinen 23 1013 GL Amsterdam / NL | [2006/15] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HOFMAN, Michiel, Marc p/a Haarlemmer Houttuinen 23 NL-1013 GL Amsterdam / NL | 02 /
DUJARDIN, Barbara, Christine p/a Haarlemmer Houttuinen 23 NL-1013 GL Amsterdam / NL | [2006/15] | Representative(s) | Nederlof, Etienne C. Octrooibureau Vriesendorp & Gaade B.V. Postbus 266 2501 AW Den Haag / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2006/15] | Nederlof, Etienne C. Octrooibureau Vriesendorp & Gaade B.V., Postbus 266 2501 AW Den Haag / NL | Application number, filing date | 04748634.5 | 04.06.2004 | [2006/15] | WO2004NL00402 | Priority number, date | NL20031023599 | 05.06.2003 Original published format: NL 1023599 | [2006/15] | Filing language | NL | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004109024 | Date: | 16.12.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/51] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1644591 | Date: | 12.04.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.12.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/15] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1644591 | Date: | 02.01.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/01] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 16.12.2004 | Classification | IPC: | E04B1/00, E06B1/36 | [2006/15] | CPC: |
E04B1/003 (EP);
E06B1/363 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/15] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | EINKLAPPBARER BALKON | [2006/15] | English: | BALCONY THAT CAN BE FOLDED | [2006/15] | French: | BALCON POUVANT ETRE PLIE ET DEPLIE | [2006/15] | Entry into regional phase | 16.12.2004 | Translation filed | 05.01.2006 | National basic fee paid | 05.01.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.01.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.03.2005 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 05.01.2006 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.01.2006 | Examination requested [2006/15] | 26.07.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.11.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 08.11.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 03.10.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.05.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 02.01.2008 | EE | 02.01.2008 | FI | 02.01.2008 | RO | 02.01.2008 | SI | 02.01.2008 | SK | 02.01.2008 | BG | 02.04.2008 | SE | 02.04.2008 | GR | 03.04.2008 | HU | 03.07.2008 | [2010/50] |
Former [2010/34] | CY | 02.01.2008 | |
EE | 02.01.2008 | ||
FI | 02.01.2008 | ||
RO | 02.01.2008 | ||
SI | 02.01.2008 | ||
SK | 02.01.2008 | ||
BG | 02.04.2008 | ||
SE | 02.04.2008 | ||
HU | 03.07.2008 | ||
Former [2009/35] | CY | 02.01.2008 | |
EE | 02.01.2008 | ||
FI | 02.01.2008 | ||
RO | 02.01.2008 | ||
SI | 02.01.2008 | ||
SK | 02.01.2008 | ||
BG | 02.04.2008 | ||
SE | 02.04.2008 | ||
Former [2009/22] | EE | 02.01.2008 | |
FI | 02.01.2008 | ||
RO | 02.01.2008 | ||
SI | 02.01.2008 | ||
SK | 02.01.2008 | ||
BG | 02.04.2008 | ||
SE | 02.04.2008 | ||
Former [2008/50] | FI | 02.01.2008 | |
RO | 02.01.2008 | ||
SI | 02.01.2008 | ||
SK | 02.01.2008 | ||
BG | 02.04.2008 | ||
SE | 02.04.2008 | ||
Former [2008/46] | FI | 02.01.2008 | |
SI | 02.01.2008 | ||
BG | 02.04.2008 | ||
SE | 02.04.2008 | ||
Former [2008/39] | FI | 02.01.2008 | |
SI | 02.01.2008 | ||
BG | 02.04.2008 | ||
Former [2008/26] | SI | 02.01.2008 | Cited in | International search | [X]RU1789620 ; | [X]DE10013004 (GOECKEL JUERGEN [DE]) [X] 1,47 * the whole document *; | [DX]DE19930679 (ROGGENBAU PETER [DE]) [DX] 45-47* the whole document *; | [X] - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1994, no. 08, Database accession no. 1994-063763, XP002298324 & SU1789620 A1 19930123 (VIKTORIYA INVENTORS COOP) [X] 1-47 * abstract * | by applicant | US4090585 | DE19930679 |