EP1609368 - METHOD FOR PRODUCING MEAT FOODS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.10.2008 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.02.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT, TR | published on 30.03.2011 [2011/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Obschestvo S Ogranichennoi Otvetstvennostyu "ASTOR-S" Ul. Nekrasova, 39 Vologda 160019 / RU | For all designated states Shestakov, Sergei Dmitrievich Ul. Oktyabrskaya, 27-269 Vologda 160031 / RU | [N/P] |
Former [2005/52] | For all designated states Obschestvo S Ogranichennoi Otvetstvennostyu "Astor-s" ul. Nekrasova, 39 Vologda, 160019 / RU | ||
For all designated states Shestakov, Sergei Dmitrievich Ul. Oktyabrskaya, 27-269 Vologda 160031 / RU | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SHESTAKOV, Sergei Dmitrievich ul. Oktyabrskaya, 27-269 Vologda, 160031 / RU | [2005/52] | Representative(s) | Jeck, Anton, et al Jeck, Fleck & Partner mbB Patentanwälte Klingengasse 2 71665 Vaihingen/Enz / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/39] | Jeck, Anton, et al Jeck - Fleck - Herrmann Klingengasse 2 71665 Vaihingen/Enz / DE | ||
Former [2005/52] | Jeck, Anton, et al Patentanwalt, Klingengasse 2/1 71665 Vaihingen/Enz / DE | Application number, filing date | 04748941.4 | 25.06.2004 | [2005/52] | WO2004RU00243 | Priority number, date | RU20040101396 | 22.01.2004 Original published format: RU 2004101396 | [2005/52] | Filing language | RU | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005070218 | Date: | 04.08.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/31] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1609368 | Date: | 28.12.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.08.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/52] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1609368 | Date: | 19.12.2007 | Language: | DE | [2007/51] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | RU | 04.08.2005 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.12.2005 | Classification | IPC: | A23B4/02, A23L1/025, A23L1/31, A23L1/317, A23L3/30, A23B4/26, A23B4/01 | [2006/05] | CPC: |
A23B4/01 (EP);
A23B4/023 (EP);
A23B4/26 (EP);
A23L13/428 (EP);
A23L13/432 (EP);
A23L13/65 (EP);
A23L3/015 (EP);
A23L3/30 (EP);
A23L5/32 (EP);
Y02A40/90 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2005/52] | A23B4/02, A23L1/025, A23L1/31, A23L1/317, A23L3/30 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/52] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON FLEISCHNAHRUNGSMITTELN | [2005/52] | English: | METHOD FOR PRODUCING MEAT FOODS | [2005/52] | French: | PROCEDE DE FABRICATION D'ALIMENTS CARNES | [2005/52] | Entry into regional phase | 29.09.2005 | Translation filed | 19.10.2005 | National basic fee paid | 19.10.2005 | Search fee paid | 19.10.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.10.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.10.2005 | Examination requested [2005/52] | 16.10.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.02.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.06.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.11.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 06.11.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 22.09.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/48] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.08.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 19.12.2007 | CZ | 19.12.2007 | DK | 19.12.2007 | EE | 19.12.2007 | FI | 19.12.2007 | GB | 19.12.2007 | IE | 19.12.2007 | NL | 19.12.2007 | PL | 19.12.2007 | RO | 19.12.2007 | SI | 19.12.2007 | SK | 19.12.2007 | TR | 19.12.2007 | BG | 19.03.2008 | SE | 19.03.2008 | GR | 20.03.2008 | ES | 30.03.2008 | PT | 19.05.2008 | HU | 20.06.2008 | AT | 25.06.2008 | LU | 25.06.2008 | BE | 30.06.2008 | CH | 30.06.2008 | IT | 30.06.2008 | LI | 30.06.2008 | MC | 30.06.2008 | [2011/13] |
Former [2010/34] | CY | 19.12.2007 | |
CZ | 19.12.2007 | ||
DK | 19.12.2007 | ||
EE | 19.12.2007 | ||
FI | 19.12.2007 | ||
GB | 19.12.2007 | ||
IE | 19.12.2007 | ||
NL | 19.12.2007 | ||
PL | 19.12.2007 | ||
RO | 19.12.2007 | ||
SI | 19.12.2007 | ||
SK | 19.12.2007 | ||
BG | 19.03.2008 | ||
SE | 19.03.2008 | ||
GR | 20.03.2008 | ||
ES | 30.03.2008 | ||
PT | 19.05.2008 | ||
HU | 20.06.2008 | ||
AT | 25.06.2008 | ||
LU | 25.06.2008 | ||
BE | 30.06.2008 | ||
CH | 30.06.2008 | ||
LI | 30.06.2008 | ||
MC | 30.06.2008 | ||
Former [2010/33] | CY | 19.12.2007 | |
CZ | 19.12.2007 | ||
DK | 19.12.2007 | ||
EE | 19.12.2007 | ||
FI | 19.12.2007 | ||
GB | 19.12.2007 | ||
IE | 19.12.2007 | ||
NL | 19.12.2007 | ||
PL | 19.12.2007 | ||
RO | 19.12.2007 | ||
SI | 19.12.2007 | ||
SK | 19.12.2007 | ||
BG | 19.03.2008 | ||
SE | 19.03.2008 | ||
GR | 20.03.2008 | ||
ES | 30.03.2008 | ||
PT | 19.05.2008 | ||
AT | 25.06.2008 | ||
LU | 25.06.2008 | ||
BE | 30.06.2008 | ||
CH | 30.06.2008 | ||
LI | 30.06.2008 | ||
MC | 30.06.2008 | ||
Former [2009/41] | CY | 19.12.2007 | |
CZ | 19.12.2007 | ||
DK | 19.12.2007 | ||
EE | 19.12.2007 | ||
FI | 19.12.2007 | ||
GB | 19.12.2007 | ||
IE | 19.12.2007 | ||
NL | 19.12.2007 | ||
PL | 19.12.2007 | ||
RO | 19.12.2007 | ||
SI | 19.12.2007 | ||
SK | 19.12.2007 | ||
BG | 19.03.2008 | ||
SE | 19.03.2008 | ||
GR | 20.03.2008 | ||
ES | 30.03.2008 | ||
PT | 19.05.2008 | ||
AT | 25.06.2008 | ||
BE | 30.06.2008 | ||
CH | 30.06.2008 | ||
LI | 30.06.2008 | ||
MC | 30.06.2008 | ||
Former [2009/35] | CY | 19.12.2007 | |
CZ | 19.12.2007 | ||
DK | 19.12.2007 | ||
EE | 19.12.2007 | ||
FI | 19.12.2007 | ||
GB | 19.12.2007 | ||
IE | 19.12.2007 | ||
NL | 19.12.2007 | ||
PL | 19.12.2007 | ||
RO | 19.12.2007 | ||
SI | 19.12.2007 | ||
SK | 19.12.2007 | ||
BG | 19.03.2008 | ||
SE | 19.03.2008 | ||
GR | 20.03.2008 | ||
ES | 30.03.2008 | ||
PT | 19.05.2008 | ||
BE | 30.06.2008 | ||
CH | 30.06.2008 | ||
LI | 30.06.2008 | ||
MC | 30.06.2008 | ||
Former [2009/30] | CZ | 19.12.2007 | |
DK | 19.12.2007 | ||
EE | 19.12.2007 | ||
FI | 19.12.2007 | ||
GB | 19.12.2007 | ||
IE | 19.12.2007 | ||
NL | 19.12.2007 | ||
PL | 19.12.2007 | ||
RO | 19.12.2007 | ||
SI | 19.12.2007 | ||
SK | 19.12.2007 | ||
BG | 19.03.2008 | ||
SE | 19.03.2008 | ||
GR | 20.03.2008 | ||
ES | 30.03.2008 | ||
PT | 19.05.2008 | ||
BE | 30.06.2008 | ||
CH | 30.06.2008 | ||
LI | 30.06.2008 | ||
MC | 30.06.2008 | ||
Former [2009/24] | CZ | 19.12.2007 | |
DK | 19.12.2007 | ||
EE | 19.12.2007 | ||
FI | 19.12.2007 | ||
GB | 19.12.2007 | ||
IE | 19.12.2007 | ||
NL | 19.12.2007 | ||
PL | 19.12.2007 | ||
RO | 19.12.2007 | ||
SI | 19.12.2007 | ||
SK | 19.12.2007 | ||
BG | 19.03.2008 | ||
SE | 19.03.2008 | ||
GR | 20.03.2008 | ||
ES | 30.03.2008 | ||
PT | 19.05.2008 | ||
BE | 30.06.2008 | ||
MC | 30.06.2008 | ||
Former [2009/22] | CZ | 19.12.2007 | |
DK | 19.12.2007 | ||
EE | 19.12.2007 | ||
FI | 19.12.2007 | ||
GB | 19.12.2007 | ||
IE | 19.12.2007 | ||
NL | 19.12.2007 | ||
PL | 19.12.2007 | ||
RO | 19.12.2007 | ||
SI | 19.12.2007 | ||
SK | 19.12.2007 | ||
SE | 19.03.2008 | ||
GR | 20.03.2008 | ||
ES | 30.03.2008 | ||
PT | 19.05.2008 | ||
BE | 30.06.2008 | ||
MC | 30.06.2008 | ||
Former [2009/19] | CZ | 19.12.2007 | |
DK | 19.12.2007 | ||
FI | 19.12.2007 | ||
GB | 19.12.2007 | ||
IE | 19.12.2007 | ||
NL | 19.12.2007 | ||
PL | 19.12.2007 | ||
RO | 19.12.2007 | ||
SI | 19.12.2007 | ||
SK | 19.12.2007 | ||
SE | 19.03.2008 | ||
GR | 20.03.2008 | ||
ES | 30.03.2008 | ||
PT | 19.05.2008 | ||
BE | 30.06.2008 | ||
MC | 30.06.2008 | ||
Former [2009/13] | CZ | 19.12.2007 | |
DK | 19.12.2007 | ||
FI | 19.12.2007 | ||
GB | 19.12.2007 | ||
IE | 19.12.2007 | ||
NL | 19.12.2007 | ||
PL | 19.12.2007 | ||
RO | 19.12.2007 | ||
SI | 19.12.2007 | ||
SK | 19.12.2007 | ||
SE | 19.03.2008 | ||
GR | 20.03.2008 | ||
ES | 30.03.2008 | ||
PT | 19.05.2008 | ||
MC | 30.06.2008 | ||
Former [2009/07] | CZ | 19.12.2007 | |
DK | 19.12.2007 | ||
FI | 19.12.2007 | ||
GB | 19.12.2007 | ||
IE | 19.12.2007 | ||
NL | 19.12.2007 | ||
PL | 19.12.2007 | ||
RO | 19.12.2007 | ||
SI | 19.12.2007 | ||
SK | 19.12.2007 | ||
SE | 19.03.2008 | ||
ES | 30.03.2008 | ||
PT | 19.05.2008 | ||
MC | 30.06.2008 | ||
Former [2009/03] | CZ | 19.12.2007 | |
DK | 19.12.2007 | ||
FI | 19.12.2007 | ||
GB | 19.12.2007 | ||
IE | 19.12.2007 | ||
NL | 19.12.2007 | ||
PL | 19.12.2007 | ||
RO | 19.12.2007 | ||
SI | 19.12.2007 | ||
SK | 19.12.2007 | ||
SE | 19.03.2008 | ||
ES | 30.03.2008 | ||
PT | 19.05.2008 | ||
Former [2008/48] | CZ | 19.12.2007 | |
DK | 19.12.2007 | ||
FI | 19.12.2007 | ||
IE | 19.12.2007 | ||
NL | 19.12.2007 | ||
PL | 19.12.2007 | ||
RO | 19.12.2007 | ||
SI | 19.12.2007 | ||
SK | 19.12.2007 | ||
SE | 19.03.2008 | ||
ES | 30.03.2008 | ||
PT | 19.05.2008 | ||
Former [2008/46] | CZ | 19.12.2007 | |
DK | 19.12.2007 | ||
FI | 19.12.2007 | ||
NL | 19.12.2007 | ||
PL | 19.12.2007 | ||
RO | 19.12.2007 | ||
SI | 19.12.2007 | ||
SK | 19.12.2007 | ||
SE | 19.03.2008 | ||
ES | 30.03.2008 | ||
PT | 19.05.2008 | ||
Former [2008/42] | CZ | 19.12.2007 | |
FI | 19.12.2007 | ||
NL | 19.12.2007 | ||
PL | 19.12.2007 | ||
RO | 19.12.2007 | ||
SI | 19.12.2007 | ||
SK | 19.12.2007 | ||
SE | 19.03.2008 | ||
ES | 30.03.2008 | ||
PT | 19.05.2008 | ||
Former [2008/39] | CZ | 19.12.2007 | |
FI | 19.12.2007 | ||
NL | 19.12.2007 | ||
PL | 19.12.2007 | ||
RO | 19.12.2007 | ||
SI | 19.12.2007 | ||
SK | 19.12.2007 | ||
SE | 19.03.2008 | ||
ES | 30.03.2008 | ||
Former [2008/36] | CZ | 19.12.2007 | |
FI | 19.12.2007 | ||
NL | 19.12.2007 | ||
PL | 19.12.2007 | ||
SI | 19.12.2007 | ||
SE | 19.03.2008 | ||
ES | 30.03.2008 | ||
Former [2008/27] | FI | 19.12.2007 | |
NL | 19.12.2007 | ||
PL | 19.12.2007 | ||
SI | 19.12.2007 | ||
SE | 19.03.2008 | ||
Former [2008/26] | FI | 19.12.2007 | |
PL | 19.12.2007 | ||
SI | 19.12.2007 | ||
SE | 19.03.2008 | ||
Former [2008/24] | FI | 19.12.2007 | |
PL | 19.12.2007 | ||
SE | 19.03.2008 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]ES2127152 ; | [A]CH309167 (DIERKES GUENTER [AT]) [A] 1-7 * the whole document *; | [A]DE935763 (DIERKES GUENTER) [A] 1-7 * the whole document *; | [A]US3743523 (BODINE A) [A] 1-7 * column 2, line 60 - column 3, line 18; figure 1; claim 1 * * column 1, line 61 - column 2, line 6 *; | [A]WO9005458 (KINGSLEY I STEVEN [US]) [A] 1-7 * page 5, lines 4-18 * * page 7, line 26 - page 8, line 4; claims 1,14 *; | [A]WO9518537 (HAAHJEM PER EGIL [NO], et al) [A] 1-7 * figure 1; claims 1,3-5,11 *; | [A]DE19519851 (BIOPRODUCT AG [CH]) [A] 1-7* claims 1,4,11 *; | [X]DE19532782 (LOTTERMOSER MANFRED [DE]) [X] 1,5-7 * column 1, lines 24-36; examples 1,2; claims 1-3,6 * * column 3, lines 18-21 *; | [XY]FR2807955 (CIRAD [FR]) [X] 1,5,7 * page 8, line 28 - page 9, line 2; figures 2-5 * [Y] 6; | [Y] - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1999, no. 20, Database accession no. 1999-231914, XP002357615 & ES2127152 A1 19990401 (UNIV VALENCIA POLITECNICA) [Y] 6 * the whole document * | International search | [A]SU1717063 (BUDILOV MIKHAIL A [SU], et al); | [A]CA2301133 (GYONGYOSI ZOLTAN [HU], et al); | [A]RU2209112 (SHESTAKOV SERGEJ DMITRIEVICH) | [A] - BORISENKO L.A. ET AL, "Ispolzovanie aktivirovannykh zhidkikh sistem dlya proizvodstva myasnykh delikatesov.", MYASNAYA INDUSTRIYA., (2001), vol. 6, pages 12 - 13 |