EP1645081 - ARRANGEMENTS FOR CONNECTION-ORIENTED TRANSPORT IN A PACKET SWITCHED COMMUNICATIONS NETWORK [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.01.2012 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.09.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 30.10.2013 [2013/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson (publ) 164 83 Stockholm / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2011/12] | For all designated states Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson (publ) 164 83 Stockholm / SE | ||
Former [2006/15] | For all designated states TELEFONAKTIEBOLAGET LM ERICSSON (publ) 164 83 Stockholm / SE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ERIKSSON, Anders Dovregatan 12 S-164 36 Kista / SE | [2006/15] | Representative(s) | Norin, Klas, et al Ericsson AB Patent Unit Service Layer & Multimedia Torhamnsgatan 21-23 164 80 Stockholm / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/32] | Norin, Klas, et al Ericsson AB Patent Unit Service Layer & Multimedia Torhamnsgatan 21-23 164 80 Stockholm / SE | ||
Former [2006/15] | Norin, Klas, et al Ericsson AB Patent Unit Core Networks, Kista 164 80 Stockholm / SE | Application number, filing date | 04749030.5 | 21.06.2004 | [2006/15] | WO2004SE00992 | Priority number, date | US20030619177 | 15.07.2003 Original published format: US 619177 | [2006/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005008971 | Date: | 27.01.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/04] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1645081 | Date: | 12.04.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.01.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/15] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1645081 | Date: | 23.03.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/12] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 27.01.2005 | Classification | IPC: | H04L12/46 | [2006/15] | CPC: |
H04L45/00 (EP,US);
H04L12/4616 (EP,US);
H04L45/50 (EP,US);
H04L49/351 (EP,US);
H04L49/205 (EP,US);
H04L49/25 (EP,US);
H04L49/354 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/15] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ANORDNUNG FÜR LEITUNGSVERMITTELTEN TRANSPORT IN EINEM PAKETVERMITTELTEN KOMMUNIKATIONSNETZ | [2006/15] | English: | ARRANGEMENTS FOR CONNECTION-ORIENTED TRANSPORT IN A PACKET SWITCHED COMMUNICATIONS NETWORK | [2006/15] | French: | AGENCEMENT POUR TRANSPORT ORIENTE CONNEXION DANS UN RESEAU DE COMMUNICATION COMMUTE PAR PAQUET | [2006/15] | Entry into regional phase | 08.12.2005 | National basic fee paid | 08.12.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.12.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.01.2005 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 08.12.2005 | Examination requested [2006/15] | 22.09.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 15.03.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.10.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.02.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 10.02.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP09162434.6 / EP2104279 | EP11153962.3 / EP2326048 | Opposition(s) | 27.12.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.06.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.06.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.06.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 23.03.2011 | CY | 23.03.2011 | DK | 23.03.2011 | EE | 23.03.2011 | FI | 23.03.2011 | PL | 23.03.2011 | RO | 23.03.2011 | SE | 23.03.2011 | SI | 23.03.2011 | SK | 23.03.2011 | TR | 23.03.2011 | LU | 21.06.2011 | BG | 23.06.2011 | CH | 30.06.2011 | LI | 30.06.2011 | MC | 30.06.2011 | PT | 25.07.2011 | [2013/44] |
Former [2013/25] | AT | 23.03.2011 | |
CY | 23.03.2011 | ||
DK | 23.03.2011 | ||
EE | 23.03.2011 | ||
FI | 23.03.2011 | ||
PL | 23.03.2011 | ||
RO | 23.03.2011 | ||
SE | 23.03.2011 | ||
SI | 23.03.2011 | ||
SK | 23.03.2011 | ||
LU | 21.06.2011 | ||
BG | 23.06.2011 | ||
CH | 30.06.2011 | ||
LI | 30.06.2011 | ||
MC | 30.06.2011 | ||
PT | 25.07.2011 | ||
Former [2013/21] | AT | 23.03.2011 | |
CY | 23.03.2011 | ||
DK | 23.03.2011 | ||
EE | 23.03.2011 | ||
FI | 23.03.2011 | ||
PL | 23.03.2011 | ||
RO | 23.03.2011 | ||
SE | 23.03.2011 | ||
SI | 23.03.2011 | ||
SK | 23.03.2011 | ||
BG | 23.06.2011 | ||
CH | 30.06.2011 | ||
LI | 30.06.2011 | ||
MC | 30.06.2011 | ||
PT | 25.07.2011 | ||
Former [2012/20] | AT | 23.03.2011 | |
CY | 23.03.2011 | ||
DK | 23.03.2011 | ||
EE | 23.03.2011 | ||
FI | 23.03.2011 | ||
PL | 23.03.2011 | ||
RO | 23.03.2011 | ||
SE | 23.03.2011 | ||
SI | 23.03.2011 | ||
SK | 23.03.2011 | ||
BG | 23.06.2011 | ||
CH | 30.06.2011 | ||
LI | 30.06.2011 | ||
PT | 25.07.2011 | ||
Former [2012/11] | AT | 23.03.2011 | |
CY | 23.03.2011 | ||
DK | 23.03.2011 | ||
EE | 23.03.2011 | ||
FI | 23.03.2011 | ||
PL | 23.03.2011 | ||
RO | 23.03.2011 | ||
SE | 23.03.2011 | ||
SI | 23.03.2011 | ||
SK | 23.03.2011 | ||
BG | 23.06.2011 | ||
PT | 25.07.2011 | ||
Former [2012/10] | AT | 23.03.2011 | |
CY | 23.03.2011 | ||
DK | 23.03.2011 | ||
EE | 23.03.2011 | ||
FI | 23.03.2011 | ||
RO | 23.03.2011 | ||
SE | 23.03.2011 | ||
SI | 23.03.2011 | ||
SK | 23.03.2011 | ||
BG | 23.06.2011 | ||
PT | 25.07.2011 | ||
Former [2011/51] | AT | 23.03.2011 | |
CY | 23.03.2011 | ||
EE | 23.03.2011 | ||
FI | 23.03.2011 | ||
RO | 23.03.2011 | ||
SE | 23.03.2011 | ||
SI | 23.03.2011 | ||
SK | 23.03.2011 | ||
BG | 23.06.2011 | ||
PT | 25.07.2011 | ||
PL | 22.08.2011 | ||
Former [2011/49] | AT | 23.03.2011 | |
CY | 23.03.2011 | ||
EE | 23.03.2011 | ||
FI | 23.03.2011 | ||
RO | 23.03.2011 | ||
SE | 23.03.2011 | ||
SI | 23.03.2011 | ||
SK | 23.03.2011 | ||
BG | 23.06.2011 | ||
PT | 25.07.2011 | ||
Former [2011/47] | AT | 23.03.2011 | |
CY | 23.03.2011 | ||
EE | 23.03.2011 | ||
FI | 23.03.2011 | ||
SE | 23.03.2011 | ||
SI | 23.03.2011 | ||
BG | 23.06.2011 | ||
PT | 25.07.2011 | ||
Former [2011/40] | AT | 23.03.2011 | |
CY | 23.03.2011 | ||
FI | 23.03.2011 | ||
SE | 23.03.2011 | ||
SI | 23.03.2011 | ||
BG | 23.06.2011 | ||
Former [2011/37] | CY | 23.03.2011 | |
FI | 23.03.2011 | ||
SE | 23.03.2011 | ||
SI | 23.03.2011 | ||
BG | 23.06.2011 | Cited in | International search | [DA]US6151324 (BELSER DAVID [US], et al) [DA] 1-7,9-25,27-29,1-7,9-25,27-29,1-7,9-25,27-29 * column 4, line 6 - column 5, line 27 * * column 4, line 6 - column 5, line 27 * * column 4, line 6 - column 5, line 27 *; | [A]US2002131414 (HADZIC IIIJA [US]) [A] 1-7,9-25,27-29,1-7,9-25,27-29,1-7,9-25,27-29 * paragraph [0021] - paragraph [0027] * * paragraph [0021] - paragraph [0027] * * paragraph [0021] - paragraph [0027] *; | [A] - MARC LASSERRE, "Virtual Private LAN Services over MPLS", IETF DRAFT, (20030624), pages 1 - 25, URL: http://www.watersprings.org/pub/id/draft-ietf-ppvpn-vpls-ldp-00.txt, (20040901), XP002298951 [A] 1-29,1-29,1-29 * page 7, line 27 - page 8, line 22 * * page 7, line 27 - page 8, line 22 * * page 7, line 27 - page 8, line 22 * |