EP1766204 - ARRANGEMENT FOR CONTROLLING EXHAUST PRESSURE PULSES AT AN INTERNAL COMBUSTION ENGINE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.02.2011 Database last updated on 01.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.09.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state Updated state(s): BG | published on 16.10.2013 [2013/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states VOLVO LASTVAGNAR AB 405 08 Göteborg / SE | [2007/13] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PERSSON, Per Fornfyndsvägen 18 S-433 41 Partille / SE | [2007/13] | Representative(s) | Fröhling, Werner Otto Volvo Technology Corporation Corporate Patents 06820, M1.7 405 08 Göteborg / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2007/13] | Fröhling, Werner Otto Volvo Technology Corporation, Corporate Patents, 06820, M1.7 405 08 Göteborg / SE | Application number, filing date | 04749130.3 | 02.07.2004 | [2007/13] | WO2004SE01094 | Filing language | SV | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006004469 | Date: | 12.01.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/02] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1766204 | Date: | 28.03.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.01.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/13] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1766204 | Date: | 14.04.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/15] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 12.01.2006 | Classification | IPC: | F02M25/07, F02B27/00 | [2010/15] | CPC: |
F01N13/10 (EP,US);
F02B29/0406 (EP,US);
F02M26/05 (EP,US);
F02M26/40 (EP,US);
F02M26/42 (EP,US);
F01N3/023 (EP,US);
F01N3/0871 (EP,US);
F02D41/0065 (EP,US);
F02D41/0082 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2007/13] | F01N7/10, F02M25/07, F02B27/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/13] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ANORDNUNG ZUR STEUERUNG VON ABGASDRUCKIMPULSEN AN EINEM VERBRENNUNGSMOTOR | [2007/13] | English: | ARRANGEMENT FOR CONTROLLING EXHAUST PRESSURE PULSES AT AN INTERNAL COMBUSTION ENGINE | [2007/13] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE COMMANDE DES PULSATIONS DE PRESSION D'ECHAPPEMENT | [2007/13] | Entry into regional phase | 12.01.2006 | Translation filed | 02.02.2007 | National basic fee paid | 02.02.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.02.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.02.2007 | Examination requested [2007/13] | 30.11.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.03.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 01.03.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 17.01.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.02.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.07.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.07.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 14.04.2010 | BE | 14.04.2010 | CZ | 14.04.2010 | DK | 14.04.2010 | EE | 14.04.2010 | FI | 14.04.2010 | IT | 14.04.2010 | NL | 14.04.2010 | PL | 14.04.2010 | RO | 14.04.2010 | SE | 14.04.2010 | SI | 14.04.2010 | SK | 14.04.2010 | TR | 14.04.2010 | CY | 05.05.2010 | IE | 02.07.2010 | LU | 02.07.2010 | BG | 14.07.2010 | GB | 14.07.2010 | GR | 15.07.2010 | ES | 25.07.2010 | CH | 31.07.2010 | LI | 31.07.2010 | MC | 31.07.2010 | FR | 02.08.2010 | PT | 16.08.2010 | HU | 15.10.2010 | [2013/42] |
Former [2012/47] | AT | 14.04.2010 | |
BE | 14.04.2010 | ||
BG | 14.04.2010 | ||
CZ | 14.04.2010 | ||
DK | 14.04.2010 | ||
EE | 14.04.2010 | ||
FI | 14.04.2010 | ||
IT | 14.04.2010 | ||
NL | 14.04.2010 | ||
PL | 14.04.2010 | ||
RO | 14.04.2010 | ||
SE | 14.04.2010 | ||
SI | 14.04.2010 | ||
SK | 14.04.2010 | ||
TR | 14.04.2010 | ||
CY | 05.05.2010 | ||
IE | 02.07.2010 | ||
LU | 02.07.2010 | ||
GB | 14.07.2010 | ||
GR | 15.07.2010 | ||
ES | 25.07.2010 | ||
CH | 31.07.2010 | ||
LI | 31.07.2010 | ||
MC | 31.07.2010 | ||
FR | 02.08.2010 | ||
PT | 16.08.2010 | ||
HU | 15.10.2010 | ||
Former [2012/44] | AT | 14.04.2010 | |
BE | 14.04.2010 | ||
BG | 14.04.2010 | ||
CZ | 14.04.2010 | ||
DK | 14.04.2010 | ||
EE | 14.04.2010 | ||
FI | 14.04.2010 | ||
IT | 14.04.2010 | ||
NL | 14.04.2010 | ||
PL | 14.04.2010 | ||
RO | 14.04.2010 | ||
SE | 14.04.2010 | ||
SI | 14.04.2010 | ||
SK | 14.04.2010 | ||
CY | 05.05.2010 | ||
IE | 02.07.2010 | ||
LU | 02.07.2010 | ||
GB | 14.07.2010 | ||
GR | 15.07.2010 | ||
ES | 25.07.2010 | ||
CH | 31.07.2010 | ||
LI | 31.07.2010 | ||
MC | 31.07.2010 | ||
FR | 02.08.2010 | ||
PT | 16.08.2010 | ||
HU | 15.10.2010 | ||
Former [2012/42] | AT | 14.04.2010 | |
BE | 14.04.2010 | ||
BG | 14.04.2010 | ||
CZ | 14.04.2010 | ||
DK | 14.04.2010 | ||
EE | 14.04.2010 | ||
FI | 14.04.2010 | ||
IT | 14.04.2010 | ||
NL | 14.04.2010 | ||
PL | 14.04.2010 | ||
RO | 14.04.2010 | ||
SE | 14.04.2010 | ||
SI | 14.04.2010 | ||
SK | 14.04.2010 | ||
CY | 05.05.2010 | ||
IE | 02.07.2010 | ||
GB | 14.07.2010 | ||
GR | 15.07.2010 | ||
ES | 25.07.2010 | ||
CH | 31.07.2010 | ||
LI | 31.07.2010 | ||
MC | 31.07.2010 | ||
FR | 02.08.2010 | ||
PT | 16.08.2010 | ||
HU | 15.10.2010 | ||
Former [2012/41] | AT | 14.04.2010 | |
BE | 14.04.2010 | ||
BG | 14.04.2010 | ||
CZ | 14.04.2010 | ||
DK | 14.04.2010 | ||
EE | 14.04.2010 | ||
FI | 14.04.2010 | ||
IT | 14.04.2010 | ||
NL | 14.04.2010 | ||
PL | 14.04.2010 | ||
RO | 14.04.2010 | ||
SE | 14.04.2010 | ||
SI | 14.04.2010 | ||
SK | 14.04.2010 | ||
CY | 05.05.2010 | ||
IE | 02.07.2010 | ||
GB | 14.07.2010 | ||
GR | 15.07.2010 | ||
ES | 25.07.2010 | ||
CH | 31.07.2010 | ||
LI | 31.07.2010 | ||
MC | 31.07.2010 | ||
FR | 02.08.2010 | ||
PT | 16.08.2010 | ||
Former [2011/35] | AT | 14.04.2010 | |
BE | 14.04.2010 | ||
CZ | 14.04.2010 | ||
DK | 14.04.2010 | ||
EE | 14.04.2010 | ||
FI | 14.04.2010 | ||
IT | 14.04.2010 | ||
NL | 14.04.2010 | ||
PL | 14.04.2010 | ||
RO | 14.04.2010 | ||
SE | 14.04.2010 | ||
SI | 14.04.2010 | ||
SK | 14.04.2010 | ||
CY | 05.05.2010 | ||
IE | 02.07.2010 | ||
GB | 14.07.2010 | ||
GR | 15.07.2010 | ||
ES | 25.07.2010 | ||
CH | 31.07.2010 | ||
LI | 31.07.2010 | ||
MC | 31.07.2010 | ||
FR | 02.08.2010 | ||
PT | 16.08.2010 | ||
Former [2011/32] | AT | 14.04.2010 | |
BE | 14.04.2010 | ||
CZ | 14.04.2010 | ||
DK | 14.04.2010 | ||
EE | 14.04.2010 | ||
FI | 14.04.2010 | ||
IT | 14.04.2010 | ||
NL | 14.04.2010 | ||
PL | 14.04.2010 | ||
RO | 14.04.2010 | ||
SE | 14.04.2010 | ||
SI | 14.04.2010 | ||
SK | 14.04.2010 | ||
CY | 05.05.2010 | ||
GB | 14.07.2010 | ||
GR | 15.07.2010 | ||
ES | 25.07.2010 | ||
CH | 31.07.2010 | ||
LI | 31.07.2010 | ||
MC | 31.07.2010 | ||
FR | 02.08.2010 | ||
PT | 16.08.2010 | ||
Former [2011/20] | AT | 14.04.2010 | |
BE | 14.04.2010 | ||
CZ | 14.04.2010 | ||
DK | 14.04.2010 | ||
EE | 14.04.2010 | ||
FI | 14.04.2010 | ||
IT | 14.04.2010 | ||
NL | 14.04.2010 | ||
PL | 14.04.2010 | ||
RO | 14.04.2010 | ||
SE | 14.04.2010 | ||
SI | 14.04.2010 | ||
SK | 14.04.2010 | ||
CY | 05.05.2010 | ||
GR | 15.07.2010 | ||
ES | 25.07.2010 | ||
CH | 31.07.2010 | ||
LI | 31.07.2010 | ||
MC | 31.07.2010 | ||
PT | 16.08.2010 | ||
Former [2011/15] | AT | 14.04.2010 | |
BE | 14.04.2010 | ||
CZ | 14.04.2010 | ||
DK | 14.04.2010 | ||
EE | 14.04.2010 | ||
FI | 14.04.2010 | ||
IT | 14.04.2010 | ||
NL | 14.04.2010 | ||
PL | 14.04.2010 | ||
RO | 14.04.2010 | ||
SE | 14.04.2010 | ||
SI | 14.04.2010 | ||
SK | 14.04.2010 | ||
CY | 05.05.2010 | ||
GR | 15.07.2010 | ||
ES | 25.07.2010 | ||
MC | 31.07.2010 | ||
PT | 16.08.2010 | ||
Former [2011/11] | AT | 14.04.2010 | |
CZ | 14.04.2010 | ||
DK | 14.04.2010 | ||
EE | 14.04.2010 | ||
FI | 14.04.2010 | ||
NL | 14.04.2010 | ||
PL | 14.04.2010 | ||
RO | 14.04.2010 | ||
SE | 14.04.2010 | ||
SI | 14.04.2010 | ||
SK | 14.04.2010 | ||
CY | 05.05.2010 | ||
GR | 15.07.2010 | ||
ES | 25.07.2010 | ||
MC | 31.07.2010 | ||
PT | 16.08.2010 | ||
Former [2011/10] | AT | 14.04.2010 | |
CZ | 14.04.2010 | ||
DK | 14.04.2010 | ||
EE | 14.04.2010 | ||
FI | 14.04.2010 | ||
NL | 14.04.2010 | ||
PL | 14.04.2010 | ||
RO | 14.04.2010 | ||
SE | 14.04.2010 | ||
SI | 14.04.2010 | ||
SK | 14.04.2010 | ||
CY | 05.05.2010 | ||
GR | 15.07.2010 | ||
ES | 25.07.2010 | ||
PT | 16.08.2010 | ||
Former [2011/08] | AT | 14.04.2010 | |
DK | 14.04.2010 | ||
EE | 14.04.2010 | ||
FI | 14.04.2010 | ||
NL | 14.04.2010 | ||
PL | 14.04.2010 | ||
SE | 14.04.2010 | ||
SI | 14.04.2010 | ||
CY | 05.05.2010 | ||
GR | 15.07.2010 | ||
ES | 25.07.2010 | ||
PT | 16.08.2010 | ||
Former [2011/07] | AT | 14.04.2010 | |
DK | 14.04.2010 | ||
FI | 14.04.2010 | ||
NL | 14.04.2010 | ||
PL | 14.04.2010 | ||
SE | 14.04.2010 | ||
SI | 14.04.2010 | ||
CY | 05.05.2010 | ||
GR | 15.07.2010 | ||
ES | 25.07.2010 | ||
Former [2011/03] | AT | 14.04.2010 | |
FI | 14.04.2010 | ||
NL | 14.04.2010 | ||
PL | 14.04.2010 | ||
SE | 14.04.2010 | ||
SI | 14.04.2010 | ||
CY | 05.05.2010 | ||
GR | 15.07.2010 | ||
ES | 25.07.2010 | ||
Former [2011/01] | AT | 14.04.2010 | |
FI | 14.04.2010 | ||
NL | 14.04.2010 | ||
SE | 14.04.2010 | ||
SI | 14.04.2010 | ||
GR | 15.07.2010 | ||
ES | 25.07.2010 | ||
Former [2010/52] | AT | 14.04.2010 | |
FI | 14.04.2010 | ||
NL | 14.04.2010 | ||
SE | 14.04.2010 | ||
SI | 14.04.2010 | ||
ES | 25.07.2010 | ||
Former [2010/50] | AT | 14.04.2010 | |
FI | 14.04.2010 | ||
NL | 14.04.2010 | ||
SE | 14.04.2010 | ||
ES | 25.07.2010 | ||
Former [2010/46] | NL | 14.04.2010 | |
ES | 25.07.2010 | ||
Former [2010/45] | NL | 14.04.2010 | Cited in | International search | [A]GB2295647 (FORD MOTOR CO [GB]); | [A]DE19808873 (BAYERISCHE MOTOREN WERKE AG [DE]); | [A]FR2841602 (RENAULT SA [FR]) |