EP1646891 - A METHOD OF IDENTIFYING AN OBJECT AND A TAG CARRYING IDENTIFICATION INFORMATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.09.2013 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2015 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU, LU | published on 19.08.2015 [2015/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Agency for Science, Technology and Research 20 Biopolis Way, No. 07-01 Centros Singapore 138668 / SG | [2006/16] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BURDEN, A.P. Sebastiano Caboto 10 35020 Albignasego / IT | 02 /
MORAN, P. M. 11 Biopolis Way No. 04-08, Helios Building Singapore 138667 / SG | [2008/30] |
Former [2006/16] | 01 /
MORAN, P.M., c/o Inst. of Materials Res. & Eng. 3 Research Link Singapore 117602 / SG | ||
02 /
BURDEN, A.P., c/o Inst.of Materials Res. & Eng. 3 Research Link Singapore 117602 / SG | Representative(s) | Schiweck Weinzierl Koch Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Ganghoferstraße 68 B 80339 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/45] | Schiweck, Weinzierl & Koch European Patent Attorneys Landsberger Straße 98 80339 München / DE | ||
Former [2011/18] | Schiweck, Weinzierl & Koch European Patent Attorneys Landsberger Straße 98 80339 München / DE | ||
Former [2008/28] | Viering, Jentschura & Partner Postfach 22 14 43 80504 München / DE | ||
Former [2006/16] | Viering, Jentschura & Partner Postfach 22 14 43 80504 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 04749238.4 | 16.07.2004 | [2006/16] | WO2004SG00216 | Priority number, date | US20030625235 | 22.07.2003 Original published format: US 625235 | [2006/16] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005008294 | Date: | 27.01.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/04] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1646891 | Date: | 19.04.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.01.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/16] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1646891 | Date: | 07.11.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/45] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | AU | 27.01.2005 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.01.2009 | Classification | IPC: | G01V15/00, G06K19/06 | [2006/16] | CPC: |
G06K19/12 (EP,US);
G06K19/06196 (EP,US);
G06K19/086 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/16] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUM IDENTIFIZIEREN EINES OBJEKTS UND EINES ETIKETTS, DAS IDENTIFIKATIONSINFORMATIONEN TRÄGT | [2006/16] | English: | A METHOD OF IDENTIFYING AN OBJECT AND A TAG CARRYING IDENTIFICATION INFORMATION | [2006/16] | French: | PROCEDE D'IDENTIFICATION D'UN OBJET ET D'UNE ETIQUETTE PORTANT DES INFORMATIONS D'IDENTIFICATION | [2006/16] | Entry into regional phase | 11.01.2006 | National basic fee paid | 11.01.2006 | Search fee paid | 11.01.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.01.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.01.2006 | Examination requested [2006/16] | 10.12.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.03.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.06.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 29.11.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.05.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.09.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 27.09.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 10.12.2009 | Opposition(s) | 08.08.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.07.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.07.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.07.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 02.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 25.07.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 23.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 16.07.2004 | AT | 07.11.2012 | BE | 07.11.2012 | CY | 07.11.2012 | CZ | 07.11.2012 | DK | 07.11.2012 | EE | 07.11.2012 | FI | 07.11.2012 | MC | 07.11.2012 | NL | 07.11.2012 | PL | 07.11.2012 | RO | 07.11.2012 | SE | 07.11.2012 | SI | 07.11.2012 | SK | 07.11.2012 | TR | 07.11.2012 | BG | 07.02.2013 | GR | 08.02.2013 | ES | 18.02.2013 | PT | 07.03.2013 | LU | 16.07.2013 | [2015/34] |
Former [2015/32] | AT | 07.11.2012 | |
BE | 07.11.2012 | ||
CY | 07.11.2012 | ||
CZ | 07.11.2012 | ||
DK | 07.11.2012 | ||
EE | 07.11.2012 | ||
FI | 07.11.2012 | ||
MC | 07.11.2012 | ||
NL | 07.11.2012 | ||
PL | 07.11.2012 | ||
RO | 07.11.2012 | ||
SE | 07.11.2012 | ||
SI | 07.11.2012 | ||
SK | 07.11.2012 | ||
TR | 07.11.2012 | ||
BG | 07.02.2013 | ||
GR | 08.02.2013 | ||
ES | 18.02.2013 | ||
PT | 07.03.2013 | ||
Former [2014/14] | AT | 07.11.2012 | |
BE | 07.11.2012 | ||
CY | 07.11.2012 | ||
CZ | 07.11.2012 | ||
DK | 07.11.2012 | ||
EE | 07.11.2012 | ||
FI | 07.11.2012 | ||
MC | 07.11.2012 | ||
NL | 07.11.2012 | ||
PL | 07.11.2012 | ||
RO | 07.11.2012 | ||
SE | 07.11.2012 | ||
SI | 07.11.2012 | ||
SK | 07.11.2012 | ||
BG | 07.02.2013 | ||
GR | 08.02.2013 | ||
ES | 18.02.2013 | ||
PT | 07.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/46] | AT | 07.11.2012 | |
BE | 07.11.2012 | ||
CY | 07.11.2012 | ||
CZ | 07.11.2012 | ||
DK | 07.11.2012 | ||
EE | 07.11.2012 | ||
FI | 07.11.2012 | ||
NL | 07.11.2012 | ||
PL | 07.11.2012 | ||
RO | 07.11.2012 | ||
SE | 07.11.2012 | ||
SI | 07.11.2012 | ||
SK | 07.11.2012 | ||
BG | 07.02.2013 | ||
GR | 08.02.2013 | ||
ES | 18.02.2013 | ||
PT | 07.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/37] | AT | 07.11.2012 | |
BE | 07.11.2012 | ||
CY | 07.11.2012 | ||
CZ | 07.11.2012 | ||
DK | 07.11.2012 | ||
EE | 07.11.2012 | ||
FI | 07.11.2012 | ||
NL | 07.11.2012 | ||
PL | 07.11.2012 | ||
RO | 07.11.2012 | ||
SE | 07.11.2012 | ||
SI | 07.11.2012 | ||
SK | 07.11.2012 | ||
BG | 07.02.2013 | ||
GR | 08.02.2013 | ||
PT | 07.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/35] | AT | 07.11.2012 | |
BE | 07.11.2012 | ||
CY | 07.11.2012 | ||
CZ | 07.11.2012 | ||
DK | 07.11.2012 | ||
EE | 07.11.2012 | ||
FI | 07.11.2012 | ||
NL | 07.11.2012 | ||
PL | 07.11.2012 | ||
SE | 07.11.2012 | ||
SI | 07.11.2012 | ||
SK | 07.11.2012 | ||
BG | 07.02.2013 | ||
GR | 08.02.2013 | ||
PT | 07.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/34] | AT | 07.11.2012 | |
BE | 07.11.2012 | ||
CY | 07.11.2012 | ||
DK | 07.11.2012 | ||
FI | 07.11.2012 | ||
NL | 07.11.2012 | ||
PL | 07.11.2012 | ||
SE | 07.11.2012 | ||
SI | 07.11.2012 | ||
BG | 07.02.2013 | ||
GR | 08.02.2013 | ||
PT | 07.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/31] | AT | 07.11.2012 | |
BE | 07.11.2012 | ||
CY | 07.11.2012 | ||
FI | 07.11.2012 | ||
NL | 07.11.2012 | ||
PL | 07.11.2012 | ||
SE | 07.11.2012 | ||
SI | 07.11.2012 | ||
GR | 08.02.2013 | ||
PT | 07.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/28] | BE | 07.11.2012 | |
CY | 07.11.2012 | ||
FI | 07.11.2012 | ||
NL | 07.11.2012 | ||
PL | 07.11.2012 | ||
SE | 07.11.2012 | ||
SI | 07.11.2012 | ||
GR | 08.02.2013 | ||
PT | 07.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/27] | BE | 07.11.2012 | |
CY | 07.11.2012 | ||
FI | 07.11.2012 | ||
NL | 07.11.2012 | ||
PL | 07.11.2012 | ||
SE | 07.11.2012 | ||
SI | 07.11.2012 | ||
GR | 08.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/26] | CY | 07.11.2012 | |
FI | 07.11.2012 | ||
NL | 07.11.2012 | ||
PL | 07.11.2012 | ||
SE | 07.11.2012 | ||
SI | 07.11.2012 | ||
GR | 08.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/24] | CY | 07.11.2012 | |
FI | 07.11.2012 | ||
NL | 07.11.2012 | ||
PL | 07.11.2012 | ||
SE | 07.11.2012 | ||
GR | 08.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/23] | CY | 07.11.2012 | |
FI | 07.11.2012 | ||
NL | 07.11.2012 | ||
PL | 07.11.2012 | ||
SE | 07.11.2012 | ||
Former [2013/22] | FI | 07.11.2012 | |
NL | 07.11.2012 | ||
SE | 07.11.2012 | ||
Former [2013/21] | SE | 07.11.2012 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]GB1216403 (GEN ELECTRIC [US]) [X] 1-32 * page 1, line 12 - line 15 * * page 3, line 10 - line 12 * * page 3, line 20 - line 23 * * page 3, line 27 - line 30 * * figures 1,2 *; | [X]US3651312 (BARNEY WALTER W) [X] 25-32* the whole document * | International search | [A]US4820912 (SAMYN JOHAN [BE]); | [A]US4985614 (PEASE KEVIN J [US], et al); | [A]US5139884 (DAIMON HIDEO [JP], et al); | [A]US5451759 (HOSHINO HIDEKAZU [JP], et al); | [A]US5756220 (HOSHINO HIDEKAZU [JP], et al); | [A]US5920628 (INDECK RONALD S [US], et al) |