EP1604509 - LOAD VARIATION TOLERANT RADIO FREQUENCY (RF) AMPLIFIER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.07.2011 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.10.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 06.11.2013 [2013/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Skyworks Solutions, Inc. 5221 California Avenue M/S 41-1C Irvine, CA 92612 / US | [2010/36] |
Former [2005/50] | For all designated states Skyworks Solutions, Inc. 5221 California Avenue M/S 41-1C Irvine, CA 92612 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHANG, Shiaw, W. 2432 McCrea Road Thousand Oaks, CA 91362-1122 / US | 02 /
FINLAY, High, J. 13125 Thomasville Court Moorpark, CA 93021-2957 / US | 03 /
CHENG, Nai-Shuo 530 Shadow Lane Simi Valley, CA 93065 / US | 04 /
PARK, Bong-Seok 1690 Holly Circle Pleasanton, CA 94566 / US | [2006/19] |
Former [2006/03] | 01 /
CHANG, Shiaw, W. 2432 McCrea Road Thousand Oaks, CA 91362-1122 / US | ||
02 /
FINLAY, High, J. 13125 Thomasville Court Moorpark, CA 93021-2957 / US | |||
03 /
CHENG, Nai-Shuo 530 Shadow Lane Simi Valley, CA 93065 / US | |||
04 /
PARK, Bong-Seok 1630 Camino Olmo B Thousand Oaks, CA 91320 / US | |||
Former [2005/50] | 01 /
CHANG, Shiaw, W. 2432 McCrea Road Thousand Oaks, CA 1362-1122 / US | ||
02 /
FINLAY, High, J. 13125 Thomasville Court Moorpark, CA 93021-2957 / US | |||
03 /
CHENG, Nai-Shuo 530 Shadow Lane Simi Valley, CA 93065 / US | |||
04 /
PARK, Bong-Seok 1630 Camino Olmo B Thousand Oaks, CA 91320 / US | Representative(s) | REHBERG HÜPPE + PARTNER Patentanwälte PartG mbB Robert-Gernhardt-Platz 1 37073 Göttingen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/50] | Rehberg Hüppe + Partner Patentanwälte Nikolausberger Weg 62 37073 Göttingen / DE | Application number, filing date | 04749399.4 | 18.03.2004 | [2005/50] | WO2004US08147 | Priority number, date | US20030392344 | 18.03.2003 Original published format: US 392344 | [2005/50] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2004084422 | Date: | 30.09.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/40] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1604509 | Date: | 14.12.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.09.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/50] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1604509 | Date: | 08.09.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/36] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 26.05.2005 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.07.2008 | Classification | IPC: | H01B1/04 | [2008/35] | CPC: |
H04B5/00 (EP,US);
H03F3/20 (KR);
H03F1/08 (KR);
H03F3/602 (EP,US);
H04B1/0458 (EP,US);
H04B1/38 (KR);
H04B5/22 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2005/50] | H04M1/00, H04B1/38 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/50] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | LASTSCHWANKUNGSTOLERANTER HOCHFREQUENZ-(HF)-VERSTÄRKER | [2005/50] | English: | LOAD VARIATION TOLERANT RADIO FREQUENCY (RF) AMPLIFIER | [2005/50] | French: | AMPLIFICATEUR RADIOELECTRIQUE (RF) TOLERANT AUX VARIATIONS DE CHARGE | [2005/50] | Entry into regional phase | 16.09.2005 | National basic fee paid | 16.09.2005 | Search fee paid | 16.09.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.09.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.10.2004 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 16.09.2005 | Examination requested [2005/50] | 09.11.2005 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.11.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.02.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.03.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.07.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.03.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.07.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 26.07.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 09.06.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.04.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2007 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   27.04.2007 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 08.09.2010 | BE | 08.09.2010 | CY | 08.09.2010 | CZ | 08.09.2010 | DK | 08.09.2010 | EE | 08.09.2010 | FI | 08.09.2010 | HU | 08.09.2010 | IT | 08.09.2010 | NL | 08.09.2010 | PL | 08.09.2010 | RO | 08.09.2010 | SE | 08.09.2010 | SI | 08.09.2010 | SK | 08.09.2010 | TR | 08.09.2010 | BG | 08.12.2010 | GR | 09.12.2010 | ES | 19.12.2010 | PT | 10.01.2011 | IE | 18.03.2011 | LU | 18.03.2011 | CH | 31.03.2011 | LI | 31.03.2011 | MC | 31.03.2011 | [2013/45] |
Former [2013/44] | AT | 08.09.2010 | |
BE | 08.09.2010 | ||
CY | 08.09.2010 | ||
CZ | 08.09.2010 | ||
DK | 08.09.2010 | ||
EE | 08.09.2010 | ||
FI | 08.09.2010 | ||
IT | 08.09.2010 | ||
NL | 08.09.2010 | ||
PL | 08.09.2010 | ||
RO | 08.09.2010 | ||
SE | 08.09.2010 | ||
SI | 08.09.2010 | ||
SK | 08.09.2010 | ||
TR | 08.09.2010 | ||
BG | 08.12.2010 | ||
GR | 09.12.2010 | ||
ES | 19.12.2010 | ||
PT | 10.01.2011 | ||
IE | 18.03.2011 | ||
LU | 18.03.2011 | ||
CH | 31.03.2011 | ||
LI | 31.03.2011 | ||
MC | 31.03.2011 | ||
Former [2013/42] | AT | 08.09.2010 | |
BE | 08.09.2010 | ||
CY | 08.09.2010 | ||
CZ | 08.09.2010 | ||
DK | 08.09.2010 | ||
EE | 08.09.2010 | ||
FI | 08.09.2010 | ||
IT | 08.09.2010 | ||
NL | 08.09.2010 | ||
PL | 08.09.2010 | ||
RO | 08.09.2010 | ||
SE | 08.09.2010 | ||
SI | 08.09.2010 | ||
SK | 08.09.2010 | ||
BG | 08.12.2010 | ||
GR | 09.12.2010 | ||
ES | 19.12.2010 | ||
PT | 10.01.2011 | ||
IE | 18.03.2011 | ||
LU | 18.03.2011 | ||
CH | 31.03.2011 | ||
LI | 31.03.2011 | ||
MC | 31.03.2011 | ||
Former [2013/25] | AT | 08.09.2010 | |
BE | 08.09.2010 | ||
CY | 08.09.2010 | ||
CZ | 08.09.2010 | ||
DK | 08.09.2010 | ||
EE | 08.09.2010 | ||
FI | 08.09.2010 | ||
IT | 08.09.2010 | ||
NL | 08.09.2010 | ||
PL | 08.09.2010 | ||
RO | 08.09.2010 | ||
SE | 08.09.2010 | ||
SI | 08.09.2010 | ||
SK | 08.09.2010 | ||
GR | 09.12.2010 | ||
ES | 19.12.2010 | ||
PT | 10.01.2011 | ||
IE | 18.03.2011 | ||
LU | 18.03.2011 | ||
CH | 31.03.2011 | ||
LI | 31.03.2011 | ||
MC | 31.03.2011 | ||
Former [2012/08] | AT | 08.09.2010 | |
BE | 08.09.2010 | ||
CY | 08.09.2010 | ||
CZ | 08.09.2010 | ||
DK | 08.09.2010 | ||
EE | 08.09.2010 | ||
FI | 08.09.2010 | ||
IT | 08.09.2010 | ||
NL | 08.09.2010 | ||
PL | 08.09.2010 | ||
RO | 08.09.2010 | ||
SE | 08.09.2010 | ||
SI | 08.09.2010 | ||
SK | 08.09.2010 | ||
GR | 09.12.2010 | ||
ES | 19.12.2010 | ||
PT | 10.01.2011 | ||
IE | 18.03.2011 | ||
CH | 31.03.2011 | ||
LI | 31.03.2011 | ||
MC | 31.03.2011 | ||
Former [2012/07] | AT | 08.09.2010 | |
BE | 08.09.2010 | ||
CY | 08.09.2010 | ||
CZ | 08.09.2010 | ||
DK | 08.09.2010 | ||
EE | 08.09.2010 | ||
FI | 08.09.2010 | ||
IT | 08.09.2010 | ||
NL | 08.09.2010 | ||
PL | 08.09.2010 | ||
RO | 08.09.2010 | ||
SE | 08.09.2010 | ||
SI | 08.09.2010 | ||
SK | 08.09.2010 | ||
GR | 09.12.2010 | ||
ES | 19.12.2010 | ||
PT | 10.01.2011 | ||
CH | 31.03.2011 | ||
LI | 31.03.2011 | ||
MC | 31.03.2011 | ||
Former [2011/49] | AT | 08.09.2010 | |
BE | 08.09.2010 | ||
CY | 08.09.2010 | ||
CZ | 08.09.2010 | ||
DK | 08.09.2010 | ||
EE | 08.09.2010 | ||
FI | 08.09.2010 | ||
IT | 08.09.2010 | ||
NL | 08.09.2010 | ||
PL | 08.09.2010 | ||
RO | 08.09.2010 | ||
SE | 08.09.2010 | ||
SI | 08.09.2010 | ||
SK | 08.09.2010 | ||
GR | 09.12.2010 | ||
ES | 19.12.2010 | ||
PT | 10.01.2011 | ||
MC | 31.03.2011 | ||
Former [2011/40] | AT | 08.09.2010 | |
BE | 08.09.2010 | ||
CY | 08.09.2010 | ||
CZ | 08.09.2010 | ||
DK | 08.09.2010 | ||
EE | 08.09.2010 | ||
FI | 08.09.2010 | ||
IT | 08.09.2010 | ||
NL | 08.09.2010 | ||
PL | 08.09.2010 | ||
RO | 08.09.2010 | ||
SE | 08.09.2010 | ||
SI | 08.09.2010 | ||
SK | 08.09.2010 | ||
GR | 09.12.2010 | ||
ES | 19.12.2010 | ||
PT | 10.01.2011 | ||
Former [2011/32] | AT | 08.09.2010 | |
BE | 08.09.2010 | ||
CY | 08.09.2010 | ||
CZ | 08.09.2010 | ||
EE | 08.09.2010 | ||
FI | 08.09.2010 | ||
IT | 08.09.2010 | ||
NL | 08.09.2010 | ||
PL | 08.09.2010 | ||
RO | 08.09.2010 | ||
SE | 08.09.2010 | ||
SI | 08.09.2010 | ||
SK | 08.09.2010 | ||
GR | 09.12.2010 | ||
ES | 19.12.2010 | ||
PT | 10.01.2011 | ||
Former [2011/24] | AT | 08.09.2010 | |
CY | 08.09.2010 | ||
CZ | 08.09.2010 | ||
EE | 08.09.2010 | ||
FI | 08.09.2010 | ||
NL | 08.09.2010 | ||
PL | 08.09.2010 | ||
SE | 08.09.2010 | ||
SI | 08.09.2010 | ||
SK | 08.09.2010 | ||
GR | 09.12.2010 | ||
PT | 10.01.2011 | ||
Former [2011/23] | AT | 08.09.2010 | |
CY | 08.09.2010 | ||
CZ | 08.09.2010 | ||
EE | 08.09.2010 | ||
FI | 08.09.2010 | ||
NL | 08.09.2010 | ||
PL | 08.09.2010 | ||
SE | 08.09.2010 | ||
SI | 08.09.2010 | ||
SK | 08.09.2010 | ||
GR | 09.12.2010 | ||
Former [2011/17] | AT | 08.09.2010 | |
CY | 08.09.2010 | ||
FI | 08.09.2010 | ||
NL | 08.09.2010 | ||
PL | 08.09.2010 | ||
SE | 08.09.2010 | ||
SI | 08.09.2010 | ||
GR | 09.12.2010 | ||
Former [2011/15] | AT | 08.09.2010 | |
CY | 08.09.2010 | ||
FI | 08.09.2010 | ||
PL | 08.09.2010 | ||
SE | 08.09.2010 | ||
SI | 08.09.2010 | ||
GR | 09.12.2010 | ||
Former [2011/13] | AT | 08.09.2010 | |
CY | 08.09.2010 | ||
FI | 08.09.2010 | ||
PL | 08.09.2010 | ||
SI | 08.09.2010 | ||
Former [2011/10] | AT | 08.09.2010 | |
FI | 08.09.2010 | ||
PL | 08.09.2010 | ||
SI | 08.09.2010 | ||
Former [2011/08] | AT | 08.09.2010 | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]US5901345 (IKEDA HIKARU [JP], et al) [X] 1,2,10 * column 1, lines 9-11,49-65 * * column 3, line 57 - column 4, line 7 * * column 5, line 44 - column 6, line 35; figure 9 * [Y] 3; | [XY]US5966059 (SIGMON BERNARD EUGENE [US]) [X] 1,4-7,9-12,14 * column 2, line 57 - column 3, line 37 * * column 3, line 63 - column 4, line 4; figures 1,2 * [Y] 3,8,13; | [YA]WO02101918 (CONEXANT SYSTEMS INC [US]) [Y] 8,13 * page 14, line 9 - page 16, line 28; figure 4 *[A] 1,10 | International search | [Y]US4803443 (TAKAGI TADASHI [JP], et al); | [Y]US5786727 (SIGMON BERNARD EUGENE [US]); | [X]US5996059 (PORTEN JOSHUA [US], et al); | [YP]US6643500 (ERHAGE LARS [SE], et al); | [YP]US6650200 (CULLITON BRIAN E [US], et al) | by applicant | US5901345 | US5966059 | WO02101918 |