Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR101098268B | Global Dossier | 26.12.2011 | B1 | KR20050120701 | 22.12.2005 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2004US09939 | 30.03.2004 | US40725903 | 04.04.2003 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP4778891B | Global Dossier | 21.09.2011 | B2 | JP2006524629 | 02.11.2006 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2004US09939 | 30.03.2004 | US40725903 | 04.04.2003 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2004227796B | Global Dossier | 06.05.2010 | B2 | AU2004227796 | 21.10.2004 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2004US09939 | 30.03.2004 | US40725903 | 04.04.2003 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1618439 | Global Dossier | 09.12.2009 | B1 | EP1618439 | 18.04.2007 | A4 | EP1618439 | 25.01.2006 | A2 | Priority number | Date | WO2004US09939 | 30.03.2004 | US40725903 | 04.04.2003 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ATE451638T | 15.12.2009 | T1 | Priority number | Date | WO2004US09939 | 30.03.2004 | US40725903 | 04.04.2003 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | BRPI0409158 | 02.05.2006 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2004US09939 | 30.03.2004 | US40725903 | 04.04.2003 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2521281 | 21.10.2004 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2004US09939 | 30.03.2004 | US40725903 | 04.04.2003 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE602004024515D1 | 21.01.2010 | D1 | Priority number | Date | WO2004US09939 | 30.03.2004 | US40725903 | 04.04.2003 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DK1618439T | 26.04.2010 | T3 | Priority number | Date | WO2004US09939 | 30.03.2004 | US40725903 | 04.04.2003 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | HK1093120 | 23.02.2007 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2004US09939 | 30.03.2004 | US40725903 | 04.04.2003 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | MXPA05010576 | 23.11.2005 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2004US09939 | 30.03.2004 | US40725903 | 04.04.2003 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | NO331613B | 06.02.2012 | B1 | NO20055160L | 03.01.2006 | L | NO20055160D0 | 03.11.2005 | D0 | Priority number | Date | WO2004US09939 | 30.03.2004 | US40725903 | 04.04.2003 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2004090649 | Global Dossier | 09.02.2006 | A3 | WO2004090649 | 21.10.2004 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US40725903 | 04.04.2003 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7410710 | Global Dossier | 12.08.2008 | B2 | US2004197238 | 07.10.2004 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US40725903 | 04.04.2003 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN100521323C | 29.07.2009 | C | CN1826703 | 30.08.2006 | A | Priority number | Date | US40725903 | 04.04.2003 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2336916T | 19.04.2010 | T3 | Priority number | Date | US40725903 | 04.04.2003 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | MY137342 | 30.01.2009 | A | Priority number | Date | US40725903 | 04.04.2003 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | TWI359357B | 01.03.2012 | B | TW200500841 | 01.01.2005 | A | Priority number | Date | US40725903 | 04.04.2003 |