EP1618439 - FIRSTOUT SHUTDOWN TRACING FOR FUEL PROCESSOR CONTROL SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.10.2010 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.10.2012 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 21.11.2012 [2012/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TEXACO DEVELOPMENT CORPORATION 6001 Bollinger Canyon Road, Building T, Third Floor San Ramon California 94583 / US | [2006/04] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MIRKOVIC, Vesna, R. 2201 Land Street Pearland, TX 77584 / US | 02 /
WHEAT, William, S. 3507 Cornwall Ct Missouri City, TX 77459 / US | [2007/15] |
Former [2006/04] | 01 /
MIRKOVIC, Vesna, R. 2201 Land Street Pearland, TX 77584 / US | ||
02 /
WHEAT, William, S. 3413 Crosby Landing Missouri City, TX 77459 / US | Representative(s) | Nash, David Allan Haseltine Lake LLP Redcliff Quay 120 Redcliff Street Bristol BS1 6HU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2006/04] | Nash, David Allan HASELTINE LAKE, Redcliff Quay 120 Redcliff Street Bristol BS1 6HU / GB | Application number, filing date | 04749588.2 | 30.03.2004 | [2006/04] | WO2004US09939 | Priority number, date | US20030407259 | 04.04.2003 Original published format: US 407259 | [2006/04] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2004090649 | Date: | 21.10.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/43] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1618439 | Date: | 25.01.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.10.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/04] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1618439 | Date: | 09.12.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/50] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 09.02.2006 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.03.2007 | Classification | IPC: | G05B9/02, H01M8/06, G06F11/07 | [2007/16] | CPC: |
G05B9/02 (EP,US);
G05B21/00 (KR);
H01M8/04 (KR);
H01M8/04664 (EP,US);
H01M8/0612 (EP,US);
H01M8/04343 (EP,US);
H01M8/04373 (EP,US);
H01M8/04388 (EP,US);
H01M8/04425 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2006/17] | H01M8/00, H01M8/04, H01M2/02, H01M2/00, H01M10/44, G05B21/00 | ||
Former IPC [2006/04] | G05B1/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/04] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFOLGUNG DES ERSTEN ABSCHALTSIGNALS FÜR DAS STEUERSYSTEM EINES BRENNSTOFFPROZESSORS | [2009/27] | English: | FIRSTOUT SHUTDOWN TRACING FOR FUEL PROCESSOR CONTROL SYSTEM | [2006/04] | French: | DEPISTAGE DE LA TOUTE PREMIERE CONDITION D'ARRET POUR UN SYSTEME DE COMMANDE DE CONVERTISSEUR DE COMBUSTIBLE | [2006/04] |
Former [2006/04] | FIRSTOUT-HERUNTERFAHR-TRACING FÜR EIN BRENNSTOFFZELLENPROZESSORSTEUERSYSTEM | Entry into regional phase | 31.10.2005 | National basic fee paid | 31.10.2005 | Search fee paid | 31.10.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 31.10.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 31.10.2005 | Examination requested [2006/04] | 13.11.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 23.05.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.07.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.10.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 28.10.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 10.09.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/46] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 05.03.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 06.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 09.12.2009 | CZ | 09.12.2009 | EE | 09.12.2009 | PL | 09.12.2009 | RO | 09.12.2009 | SE | 09.12.2009 | SI | 09.12.2009 | SK | 09.12.2009 | TR | 09.12.2009 | BG | 09.03.2010 | GR | 10.03.2010 | LU | 30.03.2010 | CH | 31.03.2010 | LI | 31.03.2010 | MC | 31.03.2010 | PT | 09.04.2010 | HU | 10.06.2010 | [2012/47] |
Former [2012/43] | CY | 09.12.2009 | |
CZ | 09.12.2009 | ||
EE | 09.12.2009 | ||
PL | 09.12.2009 | ||
RO | 09.12.2009 | ||
SE | 09.12.2009 | ||
SI | 09.12.2009 | ||
SK | 09.12.2009 | ||
BG | 09.03.2010 | ||
GR | 10.03.2010 | ||
LU | 30.03.2010 | ||
CH | 31.03.2010 | ||
LI | 31.03.2010 | ||
MC | 31.03.2010 | ||
PT | 09.04.2010 | ||
HU | 10.06.2010 | ||
Former [2012/42] | CY | 09.12.2009 | |
CZ | 09.12.2009 | ||
EE | 09.12.2009 | ||
PL | 09.12.2009 | ||
RO | 09.12.2009 | ||
SE | 09.12.2009 | ||
SI | 09.12.2009 | ||
SK | 09.12.2009 | ||
BG | 09.03.2010 | ||
GR | 10.03.2010 | ||
CH | 31.03.2010 | ||
LI | 31.03.2010 | ||
MC | 31.03.2010 | ||
PT | 09.04.2010 | ||
HU | 10.06.2010 | ||
Former [2011/10] | CY | 09.12.2009 | |
CZ | 09.12.2009 | ||
EE | 09.12.2009 | ||
PL | 09.12.2009 | ||
RO | 09.12.2009 | ||
SE | 09.12.2009 | ||
SI | 09.12.2009 | ||
SK | 09.12.2009 | ||
BG | 09.03.2010 | ||
GR | 10.03.2010 | ||
CH | 31.03.2010 | ||
LI | 31.03.2010 | ||
MC | 31.03.2010 | ||
PT | 09.04.2010 | ||
Former [2010/50] | CY | 09.12.2009 | |
CZ | 09.12.2009 | ||
EE | 09.12.2009 | ||
PL | 09.12.2009 | ||
RO | 09.12.2009 | ||
SE | 09.12.2009 | ||
SI | 09.12.2009 | ||
SK | 09.12.2009 | ||
BG | 09.03.2010 | ||
GR | 10.03.2010 | ||
MC | 31.03.2010 | ||
PT | 09.04.2010 | ||
Former [2010/46] | CZ | 09.12.2009 | |
EE | 09.12.2009 | ||
PL | 09.12.2009 | ||
RO | 09.12.2009 | ||
SE | 09.12.2009 | ||
SI | 09.12.2009 | ||
SK | 09.12.2009 | ||
BG | 09.03.2010 | ||
GR | 10.03.2010 | ||
MC | 31.03.2010 | ||
PT | 09.04.2010 | ||
Former [2010/39] | CZ | 09.12.2009 | |
EE | 09.12.2009 | ||
PL | 09.12.2009 | ||
RO | 09.12.2009 | ||
SE | 09.12.2009 | ||
SI | 09.12.2009 | ||
SK | 09.12.2009 | ||
BG | 09.03.2010 | ||
PT | 09.04.2010 | ||
Former [2010/36] | CZ | 09.12.2009 | |
EE | 09.12.2009 | ||
PL | 09.12.2009 | ||
RO | 09.12.2009 | ||
SE | 09.12.2009 | ||
SI | 09.12.2009 | ||
BG | 09.03.2010 | ||
PT | 09.04.2010 | ||
Former [2010/35] | EE | 09.12.2009 | |
PL | 09.12.2009 | ||
RO | 09.12.2009 | ||
SE | 09.12.2009 | ||
SI | 09.12.2009 | ||
BG | 09.03.2010 | ||
PT | 09.04.2010 | ||
Former [2010/23] | PL | 09.12.2009 | |
SE | 09.12.2009 | ||
SI | 09.12.2009 | ||
Former [2010/22] | SE | 09.12.2009 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US5383201 (SATTERLEE CHRIS [US], et al) [Y] 1-49* column 1, line 64 - column 2, line 52 *; | [Y]EP1067614 (GEN MOTORS CORP [US]) [Y] 1-49 * the whole document * | International search | [A]US6534950 (LEBOE DAVID [CA]); | [A]US6682838 (STEVENS JAMES F [US]); | [A]US6759156 (WHEAT W SPENCER [US], et al); | [A]US6792341 (HUNT THOMAS HOWARD [US], et al); | [A]US6824577 (DESHPANDE VIJAY A [US]); | [A]US6887285 (DESHPANDE VIJAY A [US]) |