EP1611470 - SPECKLE REDUCTION IN OPTICAL COHERENCE TOMOGRAPHY BY PATH LENGTH ENCODED ANGULAR COMPOUNDING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.08.2016 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.08.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BG | published on 19.09.2018 [2018/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states THE GENERAL HOSPITAL CORPORATION 55 Fruit Street Boston, MA 02114 / US | [2015/42] |
Former [2006/01] | For all designated states THE GENERAL HOSPITAL CORPORATION 55 Fruit Street Boston, MA 02114 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TEARNEY, Guillermo, J. 12 Fairmont Street Cambridge, MA 02139 / US | 02 /
IFTIMIA, Nicusor 151 Groton Road North Chelmsford, MA 0863 / US | 03 /
BOUMA, Brett, E. 12 Monmouth St. Quincy, MA 02171 / US | [2007/22] |
Former [2007/08] | 01 /
TEARNEY, Guillermo, J. 12 Fairmont Street Cambridge, MA 02139 / US | ||
02 /
IFTIMIA, Nicusor 102 cobble Hill Road LInoln RI 02864 / US | |||
03 /
BOUMA, Brett, E. 12 Monmouth St. Quincy, MA 02171 / US | |||
Former [2006/01] | 01 /
TEARNEY, Guillermo, J. 118 Kinnaird St., 3 Cambridge, MA 02139 / US | ||
02 /
IFTIMIA, Nicusor 102 cobble Hill Road LInoln RI 02864 / US | |||
03 /
BOUMA, Brett, E. 12 Monmouth St. Quincy, MA 02171 / US | Representative(s) | Maiwald GmbH Elisenhof Elisenstraße 3 80335 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2015/42] | Maiwald Patentanwalts GmbH Elisenhof Elisenstrasse 3 80335 München / DE | ||
Former [2011/50] | Maiwald Patentanwalts GmbH Elisenhof Elisenstrasse 3 80335 München / DE | ||
Former [2006/01] | Adler, Peter Lippert, Stachow & Partner Krenkelstrasse 3 01309 Dresden / DE | Application number, filing date | 04749658.3 | 31.03.2004 | [2006/01] | WO2004US10152 | Priority number, date | US20030459543P | 31.03.2003 Original published format: US 459543 P | US20030476600P | 06.06.2003 Original published format: US 476600 P | US20030514769P | 27.10.2003 Original published format: US 514769 P | [2006/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2004088361 | Date: | 14.10.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/42] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1611470 | Date: | 04.01.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.10.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1611470 | Date: | 14.10.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/42] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 07.04.2005 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.05.2009 | Classification | IPC: | G02B9/02 | [2006/01] | CPC: |
A61B5/0066 (EP,US);
A61B5/0059 (EP,US);
A61B5/6852 (EP,US);
G01B9/02028 (EP,US);
G01B9/02082 (EP,US);
G01B9/02087 (EP,US);
G01B9/02091 (EP,US);
G01N21/4795 (EP,US);
G02B27/48 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2015/42] |
Former [2006/01] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | SPECKLE-REDUKTION BEI DER OPTISCHEN KOHÄRENZTOMOGRAPHIE DURCH WEGLÄNGENCODIERTE WINKELZUSAMMENSETZUNG | [2006/01] | English: | SPECKLE REDUCTION IN OPTICAL COHERENCE TOMOGRAPHY BY PATH LENGTH ENCODED ANGULAR COMPOUNDING | [2006/01] | French: | REDUCTION DE GRANULARITE DANS LA TOMOGRAPHIE PAR COHERENCE OPTIQUE AU MOYEN D'UNE COMPOSITION ANGULAIRE PAR CODAGE DE LONGUEUR DE TRAJET | [2006/01] | Entry into regional phase | 19.10.2005 | National basic fee paid | 19.10.2005 | Search fee paid | 19.10.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.10.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.10.2005 | Examination requested [2006/01] | 12.08.2009 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.11.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 18.06.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 30.08.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.03.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08) | 28.11.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.07.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 15.01.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.04.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 24.10.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.01.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 03.07.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.04.2015 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 04.05.2015 | 04.05.2015 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 08.05.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.08.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 27.08.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 27.08.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP11188120.7 / EP2436307 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 06.11.2009 | Opposition(s) | 15.07.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/38] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 30.08.2010 | Request for further processing filed | 30.08.2010 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.07.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.03.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 28.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 26.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 27.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 27.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 27.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2006 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   27.07.2006 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 31.03.2004 | AT | 14.10.2015 | BE | 14.10.2015 | BG | 14.10.2015 | CY | 14.10.2015 | CZ | 14.10.2015 | DK | 14.10.2015 | EE | 14.10.2015 | ES | 14.10.2015 | FI | 14.10.2015 | IT | 14.10.2015 | MC | 14.10.2015 | NL | 14.10.2015 | PL | 14.10.2015 | RO | 14.10.2015 | SE | 14.10.2015 | SI | 14.10.2015 | SK | 14.10.2015 | TR | 14.10.2015 | GR | 15.01.2016 | PT | 15.02.2016 | CH | 31.03.2016 | IE | 31.03.2016 | LI | 31.03.2016 | LU | 31.03.2016 | [2018/38] |
Former [2018/33] | HU | 31.03.2004 | |
AT | 14.10.2015 | ||
BE | 14.10.2015 | ||
CY | 14.10.2015 | ||
CZ | 14.10.2015 | ||
DK | 14.10.2015 | ||
EE | 14.10.2015 | ||
ES | 14.10.2015 | ||
FI | 14.10.2015 | ||
IT | 14.10.2015 | ||
MC | 14.10.2015 | ||
NL | 14.10.2015 | ||
PL | 14.10.2015 | ||
RO | 14.10.2015 | ||
SE | 14.10.2015 | ||
SI | 14.10.2015 | ||
SK | 14.10.2015 | ||
TR | 14.10.2015 | ||
GR | 15.01.2016 | ||
PT | 15.02.2016 | ||
CH | 31.03.2016 | ||
IE | 31.03.2016 | ||
LI | 31.03.2016 | ||
LU | 31.03.2016 | ||
Former [2018/28] | HU | 31.03.2004 | |
AT | 14.10.2015 | ||
BE | 14.10.2015 | ||
CY | 14.10.2015 | ||
CZ | 14.10.2015 | ||
DK | 14.10.2015 | ||
EE | 14.10.2015 | ||
ES | 14.10.2015 | ||
FI | 14.10.2015 | ||
IT | 14.10.2015 | ||
MC | 14.10.2015 | ||
NL | 14.10.2015 | ||
PL | 14.10.2015 | ||
RO | 14.10.2015 | ||
SE | 14.10.2015 | ||
SI | 14.10.2015 | ||
SK | 14.10.2015 | ||
GR | 15.01.2016 | ||
PT | 15.02.2016 | ||
CH | 31.03.2016 | ||
IE | 31.03.2016 | ||
LI | 31.03.2016 | ||
LU | 31.03.2016 | ||
Former [2017/07] | AT | 14.10.2015 | |
BE | 14.10.2015 | ||
CZ | 14.10.2015 | ||
DK | 14.10.2015 | ||
EE | 14.10.2015 | ||
ES | 14.10.2015 | ||
FI | 14.10.2015 | ||
IT | 14.10.2015 | ||
MC | 14.10.2015 | ||
NL | 14.10.2015 | ||
PL | 14.10.2015 | ||
RO | 14.10.2015 | ||
SE | 14.10.2015 | ||
SI | 14.10.2015 | ||
SK | 14.10.2015 | ||
GR | 15.01.2016 | ||
PT | 15.02.2016 | ||
CH | 31.03.2016 | ||
IE | 31.03.2016 | ||
LI | 31.03.2016 | ||
LU | 31.03.2016 | ||
Former [2017/03] | AT | 14.10.2015 | |
BE | 14.10.2015 | ||
CZ | 14.10.2015 | ||
DK | 14.10.2015 | ||
EE | 14.10.2015 | ||
ES | 14.10.2015 | ||
FI | 14.10.2015 | ||
IT | 14.10.2015 | ||
MC | 14.10.2015 | ||
NL | 14.10.2015 | ||
PL | 14.10.2015 | ||
RO | 14.10.2015 | ||
SE | 14.10.2015 | ||
SI | 14.10.2015 | ||
SK | 14.10.2015 | ||
GR | 15.01.2016 | ||
PT | 15.02.2016 | ||
LU | 31.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/49] | AT | 14.10.2015 | |
CZ | 14.10.2015 | ||
DK | 14.10.2015 | ||
EE | 14.10.2015 | ||
ES | 14.10.2015 | ||
FI | 14.10.2015 | ||
IT | 14.10.2015 | ||
MC | 14.10.2015 | ||
NL | 14.10.2015 | ||
PL | 14.10.2015 | ||
RO | 14.10.2015 | ||
SE | 14.10.2015 | ||
SI | 14.10.2015 | ||
SK | 14.10.2015 | ||
GR | 15.01.2016 | ||
PT | 15.02.2016 | ||
BE | 31.03.2016 | ||
LU | 31.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/47] | AT | 14.10.2015 | |
CZ | 14.10.2015 | ||
DK | 14.10.2015 | ||
EE | 14.10.2015 | ||
ES | 14.10.2015 | ||
FI | 14.10.2015 | ||
IT | 14.10.2015 | ||
NL | 14.10.2015 | ||
PL | 14.10.2015 | ||
RO | 14.10.2015 | ||
SE | 14.10.2015 | ||
SK | 14.10.2015 | ||
GR | 15.01.2016 | ||
PT | 15.02.2016 | ||
BE | 31.03.2016 | ||
LU | 31.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/39] | AT | 14.10.2015 | |
CZ | 14.10.2015 | ||
DK | 14.10.2015 | ||
EE | 14.10.2015 | ||
ES | 14.10.2015 | ||
FI | 14.10.2015 | ||
IT | 14.10.2015 | ||
NL | 14.10.2015 | ||
PL | 14.10.2015 | ||
RO | 14.10.2015 | ||
SE | 14.10.2015 | ||
SK | 14.10.2015 | ||
GR | 15.01.2016 | ||
PT | 15.02.2016 | ||
BE | 31.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/36] | AT | 14.10.2015 | |
CZ | 14.10.2015 | ||
EE | 14.10.2015 | ||
ES | 14.10.2015 | ||
FI | 14.10.2015 | ||
IT | 14.10.2015 | ||
NL | 14.10.2015 | ||
PL | 14.10.2015 | ||
RO | 14.10.2015 | ||
SE | 14.10.2015 | ||
SK | 14.10.2015 | ||
GR | 15.01.2016 | ||
PT | 15.02.2016 | ||
BE | 31.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/34] | AT | 14.10.2015 | |
CZ | 14.10.2015 | ||
ES | 14.10.2015 | ||
FI | 14.10.2015 | ||
IT | 14.10.2015 | ||
NL | 14.10.2015 | ||
PL | 14.10.2015 | ||
SE | 14.10.2015 | ||
GR | 15.01.2016 | ||
PT | 15.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/24] | AT | 14.10.2015 | |
ES | 14.10.2015 | ||
FI | 14.10.2015 | ||
IT | 14.10.2015 | ||
NL | 14.10.2015 | ||
PL | 14.10.2015 | ||
SE | 14.10.2015 | ||
GR | 15.01.2016 | ||
PT | 15.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/23] | ES | 14.10.2015 | |
IT | 14.10.2015 | ||
NL | 14.10.2015 | ||
SE | 14.10.2015 | ||
Former [2016/22] | ES | 14.10.2015 | |
IT | 14.10.2015 | ||
NL | 14.10.2015 | ||
Former [2016/21] | ES | 14.10.2015 | |
IT | 14.10.2015 | ||
Former [2016/20] | ES | 14.10.2015 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US6037579 (CHAN KINPUI [JP], et al)[A] 1-23; | [XY]WO0138820 (HAAG AG STREIT [CH], et al) [X] 1-4,7-20,23 * page 7, line 25 - page 13, line 10; figures 1,2 * * page 15, line 1 - line 22; figure 4 * [Y] 5,6,21,22; | [X]WO03012405 (ROLLINS ANDREW M [US], et al) [X] 1-23 * page 12 - page 13; figures 2,3 * * page 15 - page 20; figures 4-8 * * page 30 - page 34; figures 13-16 *; | [DY] - BASHKANSKY M ET AL, "Statistics and reduction of speckle in optical tomography", OPTICS LETTERS, OSA, OPTICAL SOCIETY OF AMERICA, WASHINGTON, DC, US, (20000401), vol. 25, no. 8, ISSN 0146-9592, pages 545 - 547, XP002363428 [DY] 5,6,21,22 * page 545 - page 547 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1364/OL.25.000545 | [DY] - SCHMITT J M, "ARRAY DETECTION FOR SPECKLE REDUCTION IN OPTICAL COHERENCE MICROSCOPY", PHYSICS IN MEDICINE AND BIOLOGY, TAYLOR AND FRANCIS LTD. LONDON, GB, (19970701), vol. 42, no. 7, ISSN 0031-9155, pages 1427 - 1439, XP000656596 [DY] 5,6,21,22 * page 1427 - page 1438 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1088/0031-9155/42/7/015 | International search | [X]WO0133820 |