EP1610857 - GUIDE CATHETER AND METHOD OF MAKING SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 25.03.2011 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.03.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 27.04.2011 [2011/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Minnesota Medtec, Inc. 11760 Justen Circle, Unit B Maple Grove, MN 55369 / US | [2006/01] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PACKARD, Brian, M. 7191 96th Street NE Monticello, MN 55362 / US | [2006/01] | Representative(s) | McLeish, Nicholas Alistair Maxwell Boult Wade Tennant Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2006/01] | McLeish, Nicholas Alistair Maxwell Boult Wade Tennant Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | Application number, filing date | 04749765.6 | 05.04.2004 | [2006/01] | WO2004US10456 | Priority number, date | US20030460544P | 04.04.2003 Original published format: US 460544 P | [2006/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2004089437 | Date: | 21.10.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/43] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1610857 | Date: | 04.01.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.10.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/01] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 10.11.2005 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.05.2008 | Classification | IPC: | A61M25/00 | [2006/01] | CPC: |
A61M25/001 (EP,US);
A61M25/01 (EP,US);
A61M25/0045 (EP,US);
A61M25/005 (EP,US);
A61M29/02 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/01] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | FÜHRUNGSKATHETER UND HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN DAFÜR | [2006/01] | English: | GUIDE CATHETER AND METHOD OF MAKING SAME | [2006/01] | French: | CATHETER GUIDE ET PROCEDE POUR LE FABRIQUER | [2006/01] | Entry into regional phase | 17.10.2005 | National basic fee paid | 17.10.2005 | Search fee paid | 17.10.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.10.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.10.2005 | Examination requested [2006/01] | 03.11.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2011/17] | 07.12.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2011/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.04.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.04.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.10.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2007 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   30.05.2007 | 30.04.2009 | 06   M06   Fee paid on   26.10.2009 | 30.04.2010 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US4425919 (ALSTON JR WILLIAM W [US], et al) [X] 1-3 * column 4, line 6 - line 22; figure 1; claim 1 *; | [X]GB2154922 (COAL IND) [X] 7 * abstract *; | [X]EP0279358 (KOTHE LUTZ) [X] 5 * abstract *; | [X]US5019057 (TRUCKAI CSABA [US]) [X] 1,3 * abstract *; | [X]US5569220 (WEBSTER JR WILTON W [US]) [X] 1-6 * the whole document *; | [X]US2002049424 (FULFORD ANTHONY [GB]) [X] 8* abstract * | International search | [A]US4425919 (ALSTON JR WILLIAM W [US], et al); | [A]US5019057 (TRUCKAI CSABA [US]); | [A]US5569220 (WEBSTER JR WILTON W [US]); | [A]US4631052 (KENSEY KENNETH R [US]); | [A]US4729763 (HENRIE RODNEY A [US]); | [A]US4589412 (KENSEY KENNETH R [US]); | [A]US6319242 (PATTERSON GREG R [US], et al) |