EP1616235 - EXTENSIBLE SENSOR MONITORING, ALERT PROCESSING AND NOTIFICATION SYSTEM AND METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.10.2010 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.10.2012 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 21.11.2012 [2012/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states American Power Conversion Corporation 132 Fairgrounds Road West Kingston, RI 02892 / US | [2008/19] |
Former [2006/03] | For all designated states Netbotz, Inc. 11044 Research Boulevard, Suite C-100 Austin, TX 78759 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PRIMM, Michael 10237 Matoca Way Austin, TX 78726 / US | 02 /
JEFTS, Richard, Jr. 6263 MacNeil Drive, Apartment 622 Austin, TX 78729 / US | [2006/03] | Representative(s) | Crump, Julian Richard John, et al Mintz Levin Cohn Ferris Glovsky & Popeo Intellectual Property LLP Alder Castle 10 Noble Street London EC2V 7JX / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/44] | Crump, Julian Richard John, et al Mintz Levin Cohn Ferris Glovsky & Popeo Intellectual Property LLP The Rectory 9 Ironmonger Lane London EC2V 8EY / GB | ||
Former [2006/08] | Crump, Julian Richard John, et al Mintz Levin Cohn Ferris Glovsky & Popeo Intellectual Property LLP The Rectory 9 Ironmonger Lane London EC2V 8EY / GB | ||
Former [2006/03] | Dunlop, Hugh Christopher, et al R G C Jenkins & Co. 26 Caxton Street London SW1H 0RJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 04750067.3 | 13.04.2004 | [2006/03] | WO2004US11353 | Priority number, date | US20030462852P | 14.04.2003 Original published format: US 462852 P | [2006/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2004092907 | Date: | 28.10.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/44] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1616235 | Date: | 18.01.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.10.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/03] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1616235 | Date: | 25.11.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/48] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 29.12.2005 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.05.2007 | Classification | IPC: | G08B29/00, G08B25/14 | [2007/22] | CPC: |
G08B29/14 (EP,US);
G08B13/19656 (EP,US);
G08B13/19671 (EP,US);
G08B13/19676 (EP,US);
G08B13/1968 (EP,US);
G08B13/19682 (EP,US);
G08B13/19691 (EP,US);
G08B13/19697 (EP,US);
G08B25/14 (EP,US);
G08B29/183 (EP,US);
G08B29/186 (EP,US);
H04L41/0681 (EP,US);
H04L43/00 (EP,US);
H04L41/0213 (EP,US);
H04L41/22 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2006/09] | G08B29/00 | ||
Former IPC [2006/03] | G06F1/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/03] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ERWEITERBARE SENSORÜBERWACHUNG, WARNUNGSVERARBEITUNGS- UND BENACHRICHTIGUNGSSYSTEM UND VERFAHREN | [2006/03] | English: | EXTENSIBLE SENSOR MONITORING, ALERT PROCESSING AND NOTIFICATION SYSTEM AND METHOD | [2006/03] | French: | PROCEDE ET SYSTEME EXTENSIBLES DE SURVEILLANCE DE CAPTEUR, DE TRAITEMENT D'ALERTE ET DE NOTIFICATION | [2006/03] | Entry into regional phase | 10.11.2005 | National basic fee paid | 10.11.2005 | Search fee paid | 10.11.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.11.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.10.2005 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.11.2005 | Examination requested [2006/03] | 13.08.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.12.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.08.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 16.10.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.06.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.09.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 30.09.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 26.08.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.04.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.04.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.04.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.04.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 25.11.2009 | BE | 25.11.2009 | CY | 25.11.2009 | CZ | 25.11.2009 | DK | 25.11.2009 | EE | 25.11.2009 | FI | 25.11.2009 | IT | 25.11.2009 | PL | 25.11.2009 | RO | 25.11.2009 | SE | 25.11.2009 | SI | 25.11.2009 | SK | 25.11.2009 | TR | 25.11.2009 | BG | 25.02.2010 | GR | 26.02.2010 | ES | 08.03.2010 | PT | 25.03.2010 | IE | 13.04.2010 | LU | 13.04.2010 | CH | 30.04.2010 | LI | 30.04.2010 | MC | 30.04.2010 | HU | 26.05.2010 | [2012/47] |
Former [2012/43] | AT | 25.11.2009 | |
BE | 25.11.2009 | ||
CY | 25.11.2009 | ||
CZ | 25.11.2009 | ||
DK | 25.11.2009 | ||
EE | 25.11.2009 | ||
FI | 25.11.2009 | ||
IT | 25.11.2009 | ||
PL | 25.11.2009 | ||
RO | 25.11.2009 | ||
SE | 25.11.2009 | ||
SI | 25.11.2009 | ||
SK | 25.11.2009 | ||
BG | 25.02.2010 | ||
GR | 26.02.2010 | ||
ES | 08.03.2010 | ||
PT | 25.03.2010 | ||
IE | 13.04.2010 | ||
LU | 13.04.2010 | ||
CH | 30.04.2010 | ||
LI | 30.04.2010 | ||
MC | 30.04.2010 | ||
HU | 26.05.2010 | ||
Former [2012/42] | AT | 25.11.2009 | |
BE | 25.11.2009 | ||
CY | 25.11.2009 | ||
CZ | 25.11.2009 | ||
DK | 25.11.2009 | ||
EE | 25.11.2009 | ||
FI | 25.11.2009 | ||
IT | 25.11.2009 | ||
PL | 25.11.2009 | ||
RO | 25.11.2009 | ||
SE | 25.11.2009 | ||
SI | 25.11.2009 | ||
SK | 25.11.2009 | ||
BG | 25.02.2010 | ||
GR | 26.02.2010 | ||
ES | 08.03.2010 | ||
PT | 25.03.2010 | ||
IE | 13.04.2010 | ||
CH | 30.04.2010 | ||
LI | 30.04.2010 | ||
MC | 30.04.2010 | ||
HU | 26.05.2010 | ||
Former [2011/15] | AT | 25.11.2009 | |
BE | 25.11.2009 | ||
CY | 25.11.2009 | ||
CZ | 25.11.2009 | ||
DK | 25.11.2009 | ||
EE | 25.11.2009 | ||
FI | 25.11.2009 | ||
IT | 25.11.2009 | ||
PL | 25.11.2009 | ||
RO | 25.11.2009 | ||
SE | 25.11.2009 | ||
SI | 25.11.2009 | ||
SK | 25.11.2009 | ||
BG | 25.02.2010 | ||
GR | 26.02.2010 | ||
ES | 08.03.2010 | ||
PT | 25.03.2010 | ||
IE | 13.04.2010 | ||
CH | 30.04.2010 | ||
LI | 30.04.2010 | ||
MC | 30.04.2010 | ||
Former [2011/10] | AT | 25.11.2009 | |
BE | 25.11.2009 | ||
CY | 25.11.2009 | ||
CZ | 25.11.2009 | ||
DK | 25.11.2009 | ||
EE | 25.11.2009 | ||
FI | 25.11.2009 | ||
PL | 25.11.2009 | ||
RO | 25.11.2009 | ||
SE | 25.11.2009 | ||
SI | 25.11.2009 | ||
SK | 25.11.2009 | ||
BG | 25.02.2010 | ||
GR | 26.02.2010 | ||
ES | 08.03.2010 | ||
PT | 25.03.2010 | ||
IE | 13.04.2010 | ||
CH | 30.04.2010 | ||
LI | 30.04.2010 | ||
MC | 30.04.2010 | ||
Former [2011/07] | AT | 25.11.2009 | |
BE | 25.11.2009 | ||
CY | 25.11.2009 | ||
CZ | 25.11.2009 | ||
DK | 25.11.2009 | ||
EE | 25.11.2009 | ||
FI | 25.11.2009 | ||
PL | 25.11.2009 | ||
RO | 25.11.2009 | ||
SE | 25.11.2009 | ||
SI | 25.11.2009 | ||
SK | 25.11.2009 | ||
BG | 25.02.2010 | ||
GR | 26.02.2010 | ||
ES | 08.03.2010 | ||
PT | 25.03.2010 | ||
IE | 13.04.2010 | ||
MC | 30.04.2010 | ||
Former [2010/50] | AT | 25.11.2009 | |
BE | 25.11.2009 | ||
CY | 25.11.2009 | ||
CZ | 25.11.2009 | ||
DK | 25.11.2009 | ||
EE | 25.11.2009 | ||
FI | 25.11.2009 | ||
PL | 25.11.2009 | ||
RO | 25.11.2009 | ||
SE | 25.11.2009 | ||
SI | 25.11.2009 | ||
SK | 25.11.2009 | ||
BG | 25.02.2010 | ||
GR | 26.02.2010 | ||
ES | 08.03.2010 | ||
PT | 25.03.2010 | ||
MC | 30.04.2010 | ||
Former [2010/39] | AT | 25.11.2009 | |
BE | 25.11.2009 | ||
CY | 25.11.2009 | ||
CZ | 25.11.2009 | ||
DK | 25.11.2009 | ||
EE | 25.11.2009 | ||
FI | 25.11.2009 | ||
PL | 25.11.2009 | ||
RO | 25.11.2009 | ||
SE | 25.11.2009 | ||
SI | 25.11.2009 | ||
SK | 25.11.2009 | ||
BG | 25.02.2010 | ||
ES | 08.03.2010 | ||
PT | 25.03.2010 | ||
Former [2010/36] | AT | 25.11.2009 | |
BE | 25.11.2009 | ||
CY | 25.11.2009 | ||
CZ | 25.11.2009 | ||
DK | 25.11.2009 | ||
EE | 25.11.2009 | ||
FI | 25.11.2009 | ||
PL | 25.11.2009 | ||
RO | 25.11.2009 | ||
SE | 25.11.2009 | ||
SI | 25.11.2009 | ||
BG | 25.02.2010 | ||
ES | 08.03.2010 | ||
PT | 25.03.2010 | ||
Former [2010/35] | AT | 25.11.2009 | |
BE | 25.11.2009 | ||
CY | 25.11.2009 | ||
DK | 25.11.2009 | ||
EE | 25.11.2009 | ||
FI | 25.11.2009 | ||
PL | 25.11.2009 | ||
RO | 25.11.2009 | ||
SE | 25.11.2009 | ||
SI | 25.11.2009 | ||
BG | 25.02.2010 | ||
ES | 08.03.2010 | ||
PT | 25.03.2010 | ||
Former [2010/33] | AT | 25.11.2009 | |
BE | 25.11.2009 | ||
CY | 25.11.2009 | ||
FI | 25.11.2009 | ||
PL | 25.11.2009 | ||
SE | 25.11.2009 | ||
SI | 25.11.2009 | ||
ES | 08.03.2010 | ||
PT | 25.03.2010 | ||
Former [2010/31] | AT | 25.11.2009 | |
BE | 25.11.2009 | ||
CY | 25.11.2009 | ||
FI | 25.11.2009 | ||
PL | 25.11.2009 | ||
SE | 25.11.2009 | ||
SI | 25.11.2009 | ||
PT | 25.03.2010 | ||
Former [2010/30] | AT | 25.11.2009 | |
CY | 25.11.2009 | ||
FI | 25.11.2009 | ||
PL | 25.11.2009 | ||
SE | 25.11.2009 | ||
SI | 25.11.2009 | ||
PT | 25.03.2010 | ||
Former [2010/25] | CY | 25.11.2009 | |
FI | 25.11.2009 | ||
PL | 25.11.2009 | ||
SE | 25.11.2009 | ||
SI | 25.11.2009 | ||
PT | 25.03.2010 | ||
Former [2010/23] | FI | 25.11.2009 | |
PL | 25.11.2009 | ||
SE | 25.11.2009 | ||
SI | 25.11.2009 | ||
PT | 25.03.2010 | ||
Former [2010/22] | FI | 25.11.2009 | |
SE | 25.11.2009 | ||
PT | 25.03.2010 | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]US4535598 (MOUNT GORDON L [US]) [X] 1-8 * column 1, line 54 - column 6, line 39; figure 1; claims 1-9 * [Y] 2,9-12; | [Y]JPH07270459 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD) [Y] 9-11* abstract *; | [X]WO0233980 (TTI TEAM TELECOM INTERNAT LTD [IL], et al) [X] 1,3-8,13 * abstract *; | [Y]US6505256 (YORK JUSTIN E [US]) [Y] 2,12 * abstract * * column 4, line 7 - column 5, line 7; figures 1-6 * | International search | [X]US5400246 (WILSON DENNIS A [US], et al) |