Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2005002935 | Global Dossier | 06.01.2005 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US82448104 | 15.04.2004 | US46334203 | 17.04.2003 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2006523711 | Global Dossier | 19.10.2006 | A | Priority number | Date | US46334203 | 17.04.2003 | WO2004US11767 | 16.04.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2004231748 | Global Dossier | 04.11.2004 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US46334203 | 17.04.2003 | WO2004US11767 | 16.04.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1620119 | Global Dossier | 01.02.2006 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US46334203 | 17.04.2003 | WO2004US11767 | 16.04.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | BRPI0409476 | 02.05.2006 | A | Priority number | Date | US46334203 | 17.04.2003 | WO2004US11767 | 16.04.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2521847 | 04.11.2004 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US46334203 | 17.04.2003 | WO2004US11767 | 16.04.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | MXPA05011050 | 17.03.2006 | A | Priority number | Date | US46334203 | 17.04.2003 | WO2004US11767 | 16.04.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | NO20054790L | 16.11.2005 | L | NO20054790D0 | 18.10.2005 | D0 | Priority number | Date | US46334203 | 17.04.2003 | WO2004US11767 | 16.04.2004 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2004093894 | Global Dossier | 19.05.2005 | A8 | WO2004093894 | 24.03.2005 | A3 | WO2004093894 | 04.11.2004 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US46334203 | 17.04.2003 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR20060017496 | Global Dossier | 23.02.2006 | A | Priority number | Date | US46334203 | 17.04.2003 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2007191489 | Global Dossier | 02.08.2007 | A | Priority number | Date | US46334203 | 17.04.2003 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN1809370 | 26.07.2006 | A | Priority number | Date | US46334203 | 17.04.2003 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CO5700783 | 30.11.2006 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US46334203 | 17.04.2003 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | RU2005135739 | 20.03.2006 | A | Priority number | Date | US46334203 | 17.04.2003 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ZA200508367 | 25.04.2007 | B | Priority number | Date | US46334203 | 17.04.2003 |