EP1641355 - METHOD FOR PREPARATION OF A FOOD SAUCE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 09.04.2010 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.04.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 12.05.2010 [2010/19] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Welch Foods Inc. 3 Concord Farms, 575 Virginia Road Concord, MA 01742 / US | [2006/14] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kuhns, Barbara Ann 174 Mount Vernon Street, Unit E Lowell, MA 01851 / US | 02 /
Pace, Colin Brian 285 Foster Street Lowell, MA 01851 / US | [2006/14] | Representative(s) | Nithardt, Roland, et al Cabinet Nithardt & Associés S.A. 14 Boulevard Alfred Wallach B.P. 1445 68071 Mulhouse Cedex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2008/38] | Nithardt, Roland, et al Cabinet Nithardt & Associés S.A. 14 Boulevard Alfred Wallach B.P. 1445 68071 Mulhouse Cedex / FR | ||
Former [2006/14] | Nithardt, Roland, et al CABINET NITHARDT ET ASSOCIES 14 Boulevard Alfred Wallach BP 1445 68071 Mulhouse Cédex / FR | Application number, filing date | 04750281.0 | 15.04.2004 | [2006/14] | WO2004US11940 | Priority number, date | US20030417473 | 15.04.2003 Original published format: US 417473 | US20030659908 | 11.09.2003 Original published format: US 659908 | [2006/14] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2004091311 | Date: | 28.10.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/44] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1641355 | Date: | 05.04.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.10.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/14] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 02.06.2005 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.11.2009 | Classification | IPC: | A23L1/238, A23L1/212, A23L1/39, A23L1/0524 | [2009/49] | CPC: |
A23L23/00 (EP,US);
A23L19/09 (EP,US);
A23L21/12 (EP,US);
A23L21/15 (EP,US);
A23L29/231 (EP,US);
A23L29/269 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
A23V2002/00, A23V2250/50724, A23V2250/1578, A23V2250/5086, A23V2200/242 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2006/14] | A23L1/238 | Designated contracting states | FR [2006/29] |
Former [2006/14] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINER SAUCE FÜR NAHRUNGSMITTEL | [2006/14] | English: | METHOD FOR PREPARATION OF A FOOD SAUCE | [2006/14] | French: | PROCEDE POUR PREPARER UNE SAUCE ALIMENTAIRE | [2006/14] | Entry into regional phase | 14.11.2005 | National basic fee paid | 03.02.2006 | Search fee paid | 14.11.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.01.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.05.2005 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 16.01.2006 | Examination requested [2006/14] | 02.11.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/19] | 17.12.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2010/19] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.04.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.04.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.04.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 31.01.2006 | M01   Fee paid on   03.02.2006 | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2009 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0042710 (CADBURY TYPHOO LTD [GB]) [X] 12,17-19,32 * page 2 - page 7; examples 1-8; claims 1-18 *; | [DX]US4370354 (LEIPOLD DIANNE P) [DX] 12,17-19,32 * column 2, line 1 - column 3, line 17; examples 3,4; claims 1-8 *; | [A]JPS6087741 (HOUSE FOOD INDUSTRIAL CO)[A] 1-38; | [X]JPS60118162 (Q P CORP) [X] 12,17,18,32,38 * abstract *; | [X]EP0649601 (MCNEIL PPC INC [US]) [X] 12,18,19,32 * page 3, line 25 - page 4, line 56; example 1; claims 1-6 *; | [X]US5773071 (GAITHER KAREN S [US], et al) [X] 32 * column 2, line 1 - line 57 * * column 4, line 58 - column 5, line 10 * * column 6, line 50 - column 7, line 47; claims 1-17 *; | [X] - GERSONS L ET AL, "Development of a new jellied apple product.", FSTA, INTERNATIONAL FOOD INFORMATION SERVICE (IFIS), FRANkFURT-MAIN, DE, Database accession no. 75-1-01-j0017, XP002531158 [X] 32 * abstract * | [ ] - VOEDINGSMIDDELENTECHNOLOGIE, SPRENGER INST., WAGENINGEN, NETHERLANDS, (1974), vol. 7, no. 38, page 28 | International search | [X]US3556810 (MOIRANO ARTHUR L); | [Y]US4140807 (BRAVERMAN AMIEL); | [Y] - JAM TODAY! WITH POMONA'S UNIVERSAL PECTIN, (20010501), URL: http://wwwpermaculture.net/Pomona, (20041222), XP008104052 | [Y] - BRADY PAMELA, "Uncooked Jams and Jellies", (20010221), URL: http://www.uaex.edu/other_areas/publications/HTML/FSHED-54.asp, (20041220), XP008104013 | [Y] - CATHY'S CORNER, (20011027), URL: http://www.cathysbulkfoods.com/CornerOutput.cmf?CornNumber=C0009, (20041222), XP008104048 | [Y] - FRANK PAULA, "Fruit sauces and condiments", (200008), URL: http://www.foodproductdesign.com/archive/2000/0800ap.html, (20041222), XP008104049 | [Y] - "Making jam and jelly from frozen fruit", NDSU EXTENSION SERVICE, (199504), URL: http://www.ext.nodak.edu/extnews/askext/jamjelly/4343.htm, (20041221), XP008104050 |