EP1625529 - SECURITY DEVICE WITH SPECULAR REFLECTIVE LAYER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 15.06.2007 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.06.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 18.07.2007 [2007/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Eastman Kodak Company 343 State Street Rochester, NY 14650-2201 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2006/07] | For all designated states EASTMAN KODAK COMPANY 343 State Street Rochester, New York 14650-2201 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BOURDELAIS, Robert, Paul c/o EASTMAN KODAK COMPANY Patent Legal Staff State Street Rochester, New York 14650-2201 / US | 02 /
KAMINSKY, Cheryl J. c/o EASTMAN KODAK COMPANY Patent Legal Staff State Street Rochester, New York 14650-2201 / US | 03 /
CHEN, Wen-Li A. c/o EASTMAN KODAK COMPANY Patent Legal Staff State Street Rochester, New York 14650-2201 / US | 04 /
LO, Yawcheng c/o EASTMAN KODAK COMPANY Patent Legal Staff State Street Rochester, New York 14650-2201 / US | [2006/07] | Representative(s) | Haile, Helen Cynthia Kodak Limited Patent Department (W160-G) Headstone Drive Harrow, Middlesex HA1 4TY / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2006/07] | Haile, Helen Cynthia Kodak Limited Patent Department, W92-3A, Headstone Drive Harrow Middlesex HA1 4TY / GB | Application number, filing date | 04750694.4 | 27.04.2004 | [2006/07] | WO2004US12864 | Priority number, date | US20030439662 | 16.05.2003 Original published format: US 439662 | [2006/07] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2004104913 | Date: | 02.12.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/49] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1625529 | Date: | 15.02.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.12.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/07] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 14.04.2005 | Classification | IPC: | G06K19/02, G06K19/06, B42D15/10 | [2006/07] | CPC: |
B42D25/00 (EP,US);
B42D25/45 (US);
B42D25/23 (US);
B42D25/328 (US);
B42D25/333 (US);
B42D2033/04 (EP);
B42D2033/30 (EP);
Y10T428/24802 (EP,US);
Y10T428/24851 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, GB [2006/34] |
Former [2006/07] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SICHERHEITSARTIKEL MIT SPIEGELND REFLEKTIERENDER SCHICHT | [2006/07] | English: | SECURITY DEVICE WITH SPECULAR REFLECTIVE LAYER | [2006/07] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE SECURITE A COUCHE DE REFLEXION SPECULAIRE | [2006/07] | Entry into regional phase | 31.10.2005 | National basic fee paid | 31.10.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 31.10.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 31.10.2005 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 31.10.2005 | Examination requested [2006/07] | 12.05.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.05.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.09.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.01.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2007/29] | 02.03.2007 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2007/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2007 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US4629647 (SANDER HELFRIED [DE]) [A] 1-3,7,11-13 * column 2, line 31 - line 41 * * column 5, line 65 - column 8, line 27; figure 1 *; | [Y]EP0420261 (GAO GES AUTOMATION ORG [DE]) [Y] 1-3,5,7,11,13,19 * column 14, line 56 - column 19, line 13; figures 7,8,10,11 *; | [XY]WO9106925 (AMBLEHURST LTD [GB]) [X] 1-3,7,11,19 * page 3, line 16 - page 13, line 13; figures 1,2,4,5 * [Y] 1-3,5,7,11,13,19; | [DA]US6291150 (CAMP ALPHONSE D [US], et al) [DA] 1,2,10,11 * column 2, line 18 - column 5, line 47 ** column 11, line 20 - line 62 *; | [X]WO0200446 (RUE DE INT LTD [GB], et al) [X] 1-3,5-8,11,12,15,16,19 * page 2, line 28 - page 4, line 25 * * page 6, line 30 - page 8, line 37; figures 1,2,5,6 *; | [A]EP1182054 (OVD KINEGRAM AG [CH]) [A] 1-3,5,7,11,12,15 * page 3, paragraph 18 * * page 6, paragraph 34 - paragraph 35; figures 2,11 * |