EP1620982 - METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR AUTOMATIC CONTACT DISTRIBUTION UTILIZING PRESENCE DETECTION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.01.2014 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2015 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU, LU | published on 19.08.2015 [2015/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Cisco Technology, Inc. 170 West Tasman Drive San Jose, CA 95134 / US | [2006/05] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SHAFFER, Shmuel 1211 Cowper Street Palo Alto, CA 94301 / US | 02 /
KHOURI, Joseph, F. 5925 Foligno Way San Jose, CA 95138-2226 / US | [2006/05] | Representative(s) | Kazi, Ilya, et al Mathys & Squire The Shard 32 London Bridge Street London SE1 9SG / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2013/10] | Kazi, Ilya, et al Mathys & Squire LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2SQ / GB | ||
Former [2006/05] | Kazi, Ilya, et al Mathys & Squire 120 Holborn London EC1N 2SQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 04750776.9 | 27.04.2004 | [2006/05] | WO2004US13026 | Priority number, date | US20030428401 | 02.05.2003 Original published format: US 428401 | [2006/05] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2004100427 | Date: | 18.11.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/47] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1620982 | Date: | 01.02.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.11.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/05] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1620982 | Date: | 06.03.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/10] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 06.12.2007 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.09.2011 | Classification | IPC: | H04L29/08, H04L29/06, H04M3/523 | [2011/43] | CPC: |
H04M3/523 (EP,US);
H04L65/1094 (EP);
H04L65/1096 (EP,US);
H04L67/54 (EP,US);
H04M3/42365 (EP);
H04M2207/203 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2006/05] | H04L21/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/05] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND SYSTEM ZUR AUTOMATISCHEN KONTAKTVERTEILUNG UNTER VERWENDUNG DER ANWESENHEITSDETEKTION | [2006/05] | English: | METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR AUTOMATIC CONTACT DISTRIBUTION UTILIZING PRESENCE DETECTION | [2006/05] | French: | PROCEDE ET SYSTEME DE REPARTITION AUTOMATIQUE DE CONTACTS UTILISANT LA DETECTION DE PRESENCE | [2006/05] | Entry into regional phase | 13.09.2005 | National basic fee paid | 13.09.2005 | Search fee paid | 13.09.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.09.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.09.2005 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.09.2005 | Examination requested [2006/05] | 26.09.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.01.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 21.01.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 26.09.2012 | Opposition(s) | 09.12.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/07] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.09.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.04.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 07.04.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 26.04.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 25.04.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 25.04.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 27.04.2004 | AT | 06.03.2013 | BE | 06.03.2013 | CY | 06.03.2013 | CZ | 06.03.2013 | DK | 06.03.2013 | EE | 06.03.2013 | FI | 06.03.2013 | IT | 06.03.2013 | MC | 06.03.2013 | NL | 06.03.2013 | PL | 06.03.2013 | RO | 06.03.2013 | SE | 06.03.2013 | SI | 06.03.2013 | SK | 06.03.2013 | TR | 06.03.2013 | IE | 27.04.2013 | LU | 27.04.2013 | CH | 30.04.2013 | LI | 30.04.2013 | BG | 06.06.2013 | GR | 07.06.2013 | ES | 17.06.2013 | PT | 08.07.2013 | [2015/34] |
Former [2015/32] | AT | 06.03.2013 | |
BE | 06.03.2013 | ||
CY | 06.03.2013 | ||
CZ | 06.03.2013 | ||
DK | 06.03.2013 | ||
EE | 06.03.2013 | ||
FI | 06.03.2013 | ||
IT | 06.03.2013 | ||
MC | 06.03.2013 | ||
NL | 06.03.2013 | ||
PL | 06.03.2013 | ||
RO | 06.03.2013 | ||
SE | 06.03.2013 | ||
SI | 06.03.2013 | ||
SK | 06.03.2013 | ||
TR | 06.03.2013 | ||
IE | 27.04.2013 | ||
CH | 30.04.2013 | ||
LI | 30.04.2013 | ||
BG | 06.06.2013 | ||
GR | 07.06.2013 | ||
ES | 17.06.2013 | ||
PT | 08.07.2013 | ||
Former [2014/20] | AT | 06.03.2013 | |
BE | 06.03.2013 | ||
CY | 06.03.2013 | ||
CZ | 06.03.2013 | ||
DK | 06.03.2013 | ||
EE | 06.03.2013 | ||
FI | 06.03.2013 | ||
IT | 06.03.2013 | ||
MC | 06.03.2013 | ||
NL | 06.03.2013 | ||
PL | 06.03.2013 | ||
RO | 06.03.2013 | ||
SE | 06.03.2013 | ||
SI | 06.03.2013 | ||
SK | 06.03.2013 | ||
IE | 27.04.2013 | ||
CH | 30.04.2013 | ||
LI | 30.04.2013 | ||
BG | 06.06.2013 | ||
GR | 07.06.2013 | ||
ES | 17.06.2013 | ||
PT | 08.07.2013 | ||
Former [2014/11] | AT | 06.03.2013 | |
BE | 06.03.2013 | ||
CY | 06.03.2013 | ||
CZ | 06.03.2013 | ||
DK | 06.03.2013 | ||
EE | 06.03.2013 | ||
FI | 06.03.2013 | ||
IT | 06.03.2013 | ||
MC | 06.03.2013 | ||
NL | 06.03.2013 | ||
PL | 06.03.2013 | ||
RO | 06.03.2013 | ||
SE | 06.03.2013 | ||
SI | 06.03.2013 | ||
SK | 06.03.2013 | ||
CH | 30.04.2013 | ||
LI | 30.04.2013 | ||
BG | 06.06.2013 | ||
GR | 07.06.2013 | ||
ES | 17.06.2013 | ||
PT | 08.07.2013 | ||
Former [2014/09] | AT | 06.03.2013 | |
BE | 06.03.2013 | ||
CY | 06.03.2013 | ||
CZ | 06.03.2013 | ||
DK | 06.03.2013 | ||
EE | 06.03.2013 | ||
FI | 06.03.2013 | ||
MC | 06.03.2013 | ||
NL | 06.03.2013 | ||
PL | 06.03.2013 | ||
RO | 06.03.2013 | ||
SE | 06.03.2013 | ||
SI | 06.03.2013 | ||
SK | 06.03.2013 | ||
CH | 30.04.2013 | ||
LI | 30.04.2013 | ||
BG | 06.06.2013 | ||
GR | 07.06.2013 | ||
ES | 17.06.2013 | ||
PT | 08.07.2013 | ||
Former [2014/08] | AT | 06.03.2013 | |
BE | 06.03.2013 | ||
CY | 06.03.2013 | ||
CZ | 06.03.2013 | ||
EE | 06.03.2013 | ||
FI | 06.03.2013 | ||
MC | 06.03.2013 | ||
NL | 06.03.2013 | ||
PL | 06.03.2013 | ||
RO | 06.03.2013 | ||
SE | 06.03.2013 | ||
SI | 06.03.2013 | ||
SK | 06.03.2013 | ||
CH | 30.04.2013 | ||
LI | 30.04.2013 | ||
BG | 06.06.2013 | ||
GR | 07.06.2013 | ||
ES | 17.06.2013 | ||
PT | 08.07.2013 | ||
Former [2014/03] | AT | 06.03.2013 | |
BE | 06.03.2013 | ||
CY | 06.03.2013 | ||
CZ | 06.03.2013 | ||
EE | 06.03.2013 | ||
FI | 06.03.2013 | ||
MC | 06.03.2013 | ||
NL | 06.03.2013 | ||
PL | 06.03.2013 | ||
RO | 06.03.2013 | ||
SE | 06.03.2013 | ||
SI | 06.03.2013 | ||
SK | 06.03.2013 | ||
BG | 06.06.2013 | ||
GR | 07.06.2013 | ||
ES | 17.06.2013 | ||
PT | 08.07.2013 | ||
Former [2013/52] | AT | 06.03.2013 | |
BE | 06.03.2013 | ||
CY | 06.03.2013 | ||
CZ | 06.03.2013 | ||
EE | 06.03.2013 | ||
FI | 06.03.2013 | ||
NL | 06.03.2013 | ||
PL | 06.03.2013 | ||
RO | 06.03.2013 | ||
SE | 06.03.2013 | ||
SI | 06.03.2013 | ||
SK | 06.03.2013 | ||
BG | 06.06.2013 | ||
GR | 07.06.2013 | ||
ES | 17.06.2013 | ||
PT | 08.07.2013 | ||
Former [2013/50] | AT | 06.03.2013 | |
BE | 06.03.2013 | ||
CZ | 06.03.2013 | ||
EE | 06.03.2013 | ||
FI | 06.03.2013 | ||
NL | 06.03.2013 | ||
PL | 06.03.2013 | ||
RO | 06.03.2013 | ||
SE | 06.03.2013 | ||
SI | 06.03.2013 | ||
SK | 06.03.2013 | ||
BG | 06.06.2013 | ||
GR | 07.06.2013 | ||
ES | 17.06.2013 | ||
PT | 08.07.2013 | ||
Former [2013/49] | AT | 06.03.2013 | |
BE | 06.03.2013 | ||
CZ | 06.03.2013 | ||
EE | 06.03.2013 | ||
FI | 06.03.2013 | ||
NL | 06.03.2013 | ||
RO | 06.03.2013 | ||
SE | 06.03.2013 | ||
SI | 06.03.2013 | ||
SK | 06.03.2013 | ||
BG | 06.06.2013 | ||
GR | 07.06.2013 | ||
ES | 17.06.2013 | ||
PT | 08.07.2013 | ||
Former [2013/48] | AT | 06.03.2013 | |
BE | 06.03.2013 | ||
EE | 06.03.2013 | ||
FI | 06.03.2013 | ||
NL | 06.03.2013 | ||
SE | 06.03.2013 | ||
SI | 06.03.2013 | ||
BG | 06.06.2013 | ||
GR | 07.06.2013 | ||
ES | 17.06.2013 | ||
PT | 08.07.2013 | ||
Former [2013/47] | AT | 06.03.2013 | |
BE | 06.03.2013 | ||
FI | 06.03.2013 | ||
SE | 06.03.2013 | ||
SI | 06.03.2013 | ||
BG | 06.06.2013 | ||
GR | 07.06.2013 | ||
ES | 17.06.2013 | ||
PT | 08.07.2013 | ||
Former [2013/44] | AT | 06.03.2013 | |
BE | 06.03.2013 | ||
FI | 06.03.2013 | ||
SE | 06.03.2013 | ||
SI | 06.03.2013 | ||
BG | 06.06.2013 | ||
GR | 07.06.2013 | ||
ES | 17.06.2013 | ||
Former [2013/37] | AT | 06.03.2013 | |
FI | 06.03.2013 | ||
SE | 06.03.2013 | ||
SI | 06.03.2013 | ||
BG | 06.06.2013 | ||
GR | 07.06.2013 | ||
ES | 17.06.2013 | ||
Former [2013/36] | AT | 06.03.2013 | |
SE | 06.03.2013 | ||
BG | 06.06.2013 | ||
ES | 17.06.2013 | ||
Former [2013/34] | SE | 06.03.2013 | |
BG | 06.06.2013 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4451705 (BURKE EDMUND T [US], et al) [A] 1-29* column 1, line 10 - line 30; claim 1 *; | [A]WO0072535 (MCI WORLDCOM INC [US]) [A] 1-29 * claims 1,4,6,12,13,14 * | International search | US4694483 [ ] (CHEUNG EDWARD H [CA]); | [A]US5499291 (KEPLEY GARRY D [US]); | US5526416 [ ] (DEZONNO ANTHONY J [US], et al); | US5724420 [ ] (TORGRIM WILLARD J [US]); | US5991645 [ ] (YUEN BARRY K [US], et al); | US6266666 [ ] (IRELAND EVAN [US], et al); | US6295354 [ ] (DEZONNO ANTHONY J [US]) |