EP1620739 - RECONFIGURABLE FABRIC FOR SOCs [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.05.2008 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.07.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): FR | published on 06.08.2008 [2008/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Dafca, Inc. 1671 Worcester Road, Suite 303 Framingham, MA 01701 / US | [2006/05] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ABRAMOVICI, Miron 135 North Road Berkeley Heights, NJ 07922 / US | 02 /
DUNLOP, Alfred E. 3713 Eastman Way, P.O. Box 124 Kattsill Bay, N.Y. 12844-0124 / US | [2006/05] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastrasse 30 81925 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/31] | HOFFMANN EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | ||
Former [2006/05] | HOFFMANN EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 04750858.5 | 28.04.2004 | [2006/05] | WO2004US13155 | Priority number, date | US20030425101 | 28.04.2003 Original published format: US 425101 | [2006/05] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004102210 | Date: | 25.11.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/48] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1620739 | Date: | 01.02.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.11.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/05] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1620739 | Date: | 11.07.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/28] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 25.11.2004 | Classification | IPC: | G01R31/3185 | [2006/05] | CPC: |
G01R31/318555 (EP,US);
G01R31/3185 (KR);
G01R31/318541 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, IT, NL [2007/01] |
Former [2006/31] | DE, FR, GB, IT | ||
Former [2006/05] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | REKONFIGURIERBARE ARCHITEKTUR FÜR SOCs | [2006/51] | English: | RECONFIGURABLE FABRIC FOR SOCs | [2006/05] | French: | STRUCTURE RECONFIGURABLE POUR SYSTEME SUR PUCE (SOC) | [2006/05] |
Former [2006/05] | UMKONFIGURIERBARES FELD FÜR SOCS | Entry into regional phase | 24.11.2005 | National basic fee paid | 24.11.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.11.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.12.2004 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 24.11.2005 | Examination requested [2006/05] | 17.02.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.06.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.06.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.11.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.12.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.04.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 16.04.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 14.04.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/25] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.04.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2007 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   30.05.2007 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | NL | 11.07.2007 | FR | 07.03.2008 | [2008/32] |
Former [2008/11] | NL | 11.07.2007 | Cited in | International search | [YX]US6484280 (MOBERLY DAVID S [US]) [Y] 1-43 * column 2, lines 7-23 * * column 3, line 26 - column 4, line 16 * [X] 44-51; | [Y]EP1296152 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [Y] 1-43 * column 2, paragraph 10 - column 9, paragraph 51; figure 1 *; | [DA] - KORANNE S, "A novel reconfigurable wrapper for testing of embedded core-based SOCs and its associated scheduling algorithm", JOURNAL OF ELECTRONIC TESTING: THEORY AND APPLICATIONS KLUWER ACADEMIC PUBLISHERS NETHERLANDS, (200209), vol. 18, no. 4-5, ISSN 0923-8174, pages 415 - 434, XP002298119 [DA] 1-51 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1023/A:1016593423844 | [A] - JING-RENG HUANG ET AL, "A self-test methodology for IP cores in bus-based programmable SoCs", 19TH IEEE PROCEEDINGS ON VLSI TEST SYMPOSIUM, VTS 2001, (20010429), pages 198 - 203, XP010542387 [A] 1-51 * page 199 - page 203; figures 2,4,6,7 * |