EP1628970 - HETEROCYCLE SUBSTITUTED CARBOXYLIC ACIDS AS INHIBITORS OF PROTEIN TYROSINE PHOSPHATASE-1B [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 02.04.2010 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.04.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 05.05.2010 [2010/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The Institutes of Pharmaceutical Discovery, LLC 23 Business Park Drive Branford CT 06405 / US | [2006/09] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WHITEHOUSE, Darren 40 Fishing Brook Road Westbrook, CT 06498 / US | 02 /
HU, Shaojing 900 Mix Avenue, Unit 121 Hamden, CT 06514 / US | 03 /
FANG, Haiquan 304 County Road Madison, CT 06443 / US | 04 /
COMBS, Kerry 188 North Whittlesey Avenue Wallingford, CT 06492 / US | 05 /
VAN ZANDT, Michael 91 Golden Hill Drive Guilford, CT 06437 / US | [2006/09] | Representative(s) | Adam, Holger Kraus & Weisert Patentanwälte PartGmbB Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15 80539 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2006/09] | Adam, Holger Kraus & Weisert, Patent- und Rechtsanwälte, Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15 80539 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 04751194.4 | 30.04.2004 | [2006/09] | WO2004US13702 | Priority number, date | US20030467214P | 30.04.2003 Original published format: US 467214 P | [2006/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2004099192 | Date: | 18.11.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/47] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1628970 | Date: | 01.03.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.11.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/09] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 13.01.2005 | Classification | IPC: | C07D405/10, C07D417/12, C07D405/12, C07D409/10, C07D401/14, C07D405/14, C07D417/10, A61P3/10, A61K31/4155 | [2006/09] | CPC: |
C07D401/14 (EP,US);
A61P3/04 (EP);
A61P3/06 (EP);
A61P3/10 (EP);
A61P35/00 (EP);
A61P37/02 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
A61P5/50 (EP);
A61P7/02 (EP);
A61P7/04 (EP);
A61P9/10 (EP);
A61P9/12 (EP);
C07D405/10 (EP,US);
C07D405/12 (EP,US);
C07D405/14 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/09] | Extension states | AL | 04.11.2005 | HR | 04.11.2005 | LT | 04.11.2005 | LV | 04.11.2005 | MK | 04.11.2005 | Title | German: | HETEROCYKLISCH SUBSTITUIERTE CARBONSÄUREN ALS HEMMER DER PROTEIN-TYROSINPHOSPHATASE-1B | [2006/09] | English: | HETEROCYCLE SUBSTITUTED CARBOXYLIC ACIDS AS INHIBITORS OF PROTEIN TYROSINE PHOSPHATASE-1B | [2006/09] | French: | ACIDES CARBOXYLIQUES SUBSTITUES PAR DES HETEROCYCLES COMME INHIBITEURS DE PROTEINE TYROSINE PHOSPHATASE-1B | [2006/09] | Entry into regional phase | 04.11.2005 | National basic fee paid | 04.11.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.11.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.11.2005 | Examination requested [2006/09] | 19.12.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.04.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.08.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.11.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/18] | 07.12.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2010/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.04.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.04.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.04.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2009 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]EP0445811 (TAKEDA CHEMICAL INDUSTRIES LTD [JP]) [X] 1-3 * claim 2; tables 1a,2a *; | [X]DE4407488 (BAYER AG [DE]) [X] 1-14,21-24,27,28 * examples 1e,3e,9m,10m,1t,13t,4t-8t,13t-22t,1-62; claim 1 *; | [X]EP0542059 (BAYER AG [DE]) [X] 1-3 * example XXXII; table 2 *; | [A]US6310081 (MALAMAS MICHAEL S [US], et al) [A] 1-38 * column 2 - column 4 *; | [A]WO0204459 (NOVO NORDISK AS [DK], et al) [A] 1-38 * the whole document *; | [A]WO0204458 (NOVO NORDISK AS [DK], et al) [A] 1-38 * claim 1 *; | [A] - BEBERNITZ G R ET AL, "The Effect of 1,3-Diaryl-[1H]-pyrazol-4-acetamides on Glucose Utilization in ob/ob Mice", JOURNAL OF MEDICINAL CHEMISTRY, AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY. WASHINGTON, US, (2001), vol. 44, no. 16, ISSN 0022-2623, pages 2601 - 2611, XP002254058 [A] 1-38 * compounds 11G, 11I, 11K, 11S * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/jm010032c |