EP1620199 - A REACTOR SYSTEM AND PROCESS FOR THE MANUFACTURE OF ETHYLENE OXIDE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 03.04.2020 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 18.09.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.04.2020 | Withdrawal of application | published on 06.05.2020 [2020/19] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Shell Internationale Research Maatschappij B.V. Carel van Bylandtlaan 30 2596 HR The Hague / NL | [2018/13] |
Former [2006/05] | For all designated states Shell Internationale Research Maatschappij B.V. Carel van Bylandtlaan 30 NL-2596 HR The Hague / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MCALLISTER, Paul, Michael 1538 Allston Houston, TX 77008 / US | 02 /
BOS, Alouisius, Nicolaas, Renee Badhuisweg 3 NL-1031 Amsterdam / NL | 03 /
RICHARD, Michael, Alan 4919 Waterdale Drive Fulshear, TX 77441 / US | 04 /
REKERS, Dominicus, Maria Badhuisweg 3 NL-1031 Amsterdam / NL | [2006/05] | Application number, filing date | 04751466.6 | 05.05.2004 | [2006/05] | WO2004US14087 | Priority number, date | US20030431035 | 07.05.2003 Original published format: US 431035 | US20040815276 | 01.04.2004 Original published format: US 815276 | [2006/05] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004101141 | Date: | 25.11.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/48] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1620199 | Date: | 01.02.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.11.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/05] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 25.11.2004 | Classification | IPC: | B01J19/30, B01J8/06, C07D301/10, B01J35/02, B01J23/50, B01J23/68 | [2006/05] | CPC: |
C07D301/10 (EP);
B01J19/30 (EP,KR);
B01J23/50 (KR);
B01J23/66 (EP);
B01J23/688 (EP);
B01J35/40 (EP);
B01J35/50 (EP);
B01J8/06 (KR);
B01J8/067 (EP);
B01J2219/30223 (EP);
B01J2219/30416 (EP);
B01J2219/30475 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/05] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | REAKTORSYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON ETHYLENEOXID | [2006/05] | English: | A REACTOR SYSTEM AND PROCESS FOR THE MANUFACTURE OF ETHYLENE OXIDE | [2006/05] | French: | SYSTEME ET PROCEDE DE REACTEUR POUR LA FABRICATION D'OXYDE D'ETHYLENE | [2006/05] | Entry into regional phase | 14.11.2005 | National basic fee paid | 14.11.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.11.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.12.2004 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 14.11.2005 | Examination requested [2006/05] | 08.02.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 28.07.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.09.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 04.03.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.11.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.04.2020 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2020/19] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 08.02.2010 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.05.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.05.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.05.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 19.05.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 10.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 29.02.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 10.05.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 27.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 12.05.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 10.05.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 10.05.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | 10.05.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 15 | 15.05.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 16 | 31.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 17 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US4511671 (SAITO NOBORU [JP], et al); | [X]US4645754 (TAMURA FUMIHIDE [JP], et al); | [X]US4656157 (HOFMANN FRIEDBERT [DE], et al); | [X]US2002010378 (KAKIMOTO YUKIHIKO [JP], et al); | [X]EP1277698 (KELLOGG BROWN & ROOT INC [US]) | Examination | US4186106 |