Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2005002957 | Global Dossier | 06.01.2005 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US46858103 | 07.05.2003 | US84129404 | 07.05.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2006528936 | Global Dossier | 28.12.2006 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2004US14466 | 07.05.2004 | US46858103 | 07.05.2003 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2386313 | Global Dossier | 16.11.2011 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US46858103 | 07.05.2003 | EP04751728 | 07.05.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2524860 | Global Dossier | 13.09.2016 | C | CA2524860 | 02.12.2004 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2004US14466 | 07.05.2004 | US46858103 | 07.05.2003 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2014213504B | Global Dossier | 11.08.2016 | B2 | AU2014213504 | 04.09.2014 | A1 | Priority number | Date | AU2014213504 | 13.08.2014 | AU2012200061 | 05.01.2012 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2012200061B | Global Dossier | 15.05.2014 | B2 | AU2012200061 | 02.02.2012 | A1 | Priority number | Date | AU2010257242 | 16.12.2010 | AU2012200061 | 05.01.2012 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2010257242 | Global Dossier | 13.01.2011 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2004US14466 | 07.05.2004 | AU2010257242 | 16.12.2010 | AU2004240558 | 07.05.2004 | US46858103 | 07.05.2003 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2004240558 | Global Dossier | 02.12.2004 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2004US14466 | 07.05.2004 | US46858103 | 07.05.2003 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1624888 | Global Dossier | 12.10.2016 | B1 | EP1624888 | 15.02.2006 | A2 | Priority number | Date | WO2004US14466 | 07.05.2004 | US46858103 | 07.05.2003 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | BRPI0410341 | 25.05.2021 | B8 | BRPI0410341 | 16.07.2019 | B1 | BRPI0410341 | 30.05.2006 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2004US14466 | 07.05.2004 | US46858103 | 07.05.2003 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN104225587B | 21.07.2017 | B | CN104225587 | 24.12.2014 | A | Priority number | Date | CN200480019306 | 07.05.2004 | US46858103 | 07.05.2003 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | NZ609888 | 28.11.2014 | A | Priority number | Date | US46858103 | 07.05.2003 | NZ59606604 | 07.05.2004 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2004103400 | Global Dossier | 24.03.2005 | A3 | WO2004103400 | 02.12.2004 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US46858103 | 07.05.2003 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2014193929 | Global Dossier | 09.10.2014 | A | Priority number | Date | US46858103 | 07.05.2003 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2011042693 | Global Dossier | 03.03.2011 | A | Priority number | Date | US46858103 | 07.05.2003 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN1852733 | 25.10.2006 | A | Priority number | Date | US46858103 | 07.05.2003 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | HK1204574 | 27.11.2015 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US46858103 | 07.05.2003 | Type | Divisional application | EP2386313 |