EP1624888 - MULTIVALENT MENINGOCOCCAL DERIVATIZED POLYSACCHARIDE-PROTEIN CONJUGATES AND CORRESPONDING VACCINE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.08.2017 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.03.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 08.04.2020 [2020/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sanofi Pasteur, Inc. Route 611 Discovery Drive Swiftwater, PA 18370 / US | [2016/41] |
Former [2006/07] | For all designated states Sanofi Pasteur, Inc. Route 611 Discovery Drive Swiftwater, PA 18370 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
RYALL, Robert, P. 411 Main Street Stroudsburg, PA 18360 / US | [2006/07] | Representative(s) | Wilding, James Roger, et al Mathys & Squire The Shard 32 London Bridge Street London SE1 9SG / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2016/41] | Wilding, James Roger, et al Mathys & Squire LLP The Shard 32 London Bridge Street London SE1 9SG / GB | ||
Former [2006/26] | Lawrence, Malcolm Graham, et al HLBBshaw Merlin House Falconry Court Baker's Lane Epping, Essex CM16 5DQ / GB | ||
Former [2006/07] | Furlong, Isla Jane, et al D Young & Co 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | Application number, filing date | 04751728.9 | 07.05.2004 | [2006/07] | WO2004US14466 | Priority number, date | US20030468581P | 07.05.2003 Original published format: US 468581 P | [2006/07] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2004103400 | Date: | 02.12.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/49] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1624888 | Date: | 15.02.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.12.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/07] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1624888 | Date: | 12.10.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/41] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 24.03.2005 | Classification | IPC: | A61K39/095 | [2006/07] | CPC: |
A61K39/095 (EP,US);
A61P31/04 (EP);
A61P37/02 (EP);
A61P37/04 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
A61K2039/55505 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2016/41] |
Former [2006/07] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | LT | 20.01.2006 | LV | 20.01.2006 | Title | German: | MULTIVALENTE DERIVATISIERTE MENINGOCOCCALE POLYSACCHARID-PROTEINKONJUGATE UND ENTSPRECHENDE VAKZINE | [2006/07] | English: | MULTIVALENT MENINGOCOCCAL DERIVATIZED POLYSACCHARIDE-PROTEIN CONJUGATES AND CORRESPONDING VACCINE | [2006/07] | French: | CONJUGUES DE POLYSACCHARIDES-PROTEINES DERIVATISES MENINGOCOCCIQUES MULTIVALENTS ET VACCIN CORRESPONDANT | [2006/07] | Entry into regional phase | 06.12.2005 | National basic fee paid | 06.12.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.12.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.12.2004 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 06.12.2005 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.12.2005 | Examination requested [2006/07] | 06.03.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.05.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.07.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 10.05.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.02.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 10.10.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 20.12.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.06.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 10.12.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.08.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.09.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 02.09.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 02.09.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP10183290.5 / EP2386313 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 06.03.2008 | Opposition(s) | 13.07.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/38] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 20.12.2012 | Request for further processing filed | 20.12.2012 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 17.01.2013 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 10.05.2010 | Request for further processing filed | 10.05.2010 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 27.05.2010 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.06.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.05.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.05.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 11.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 30.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 10.05.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 31.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 12.05.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 10.05.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2006 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   14.06.2006 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 07.05.2004 | AT | 12.10.2016 | CY | 12.10.2016 | CZ | 12.10.2016 | DK | 12.10.2016 | EE | 12.10.2016 | ES | 12.10.2016 | FI | 12.10.2016 | MC | 12.10.2016 | NL | 12.10.2016 | PL | 12.10.2016 | RO | 12.10.2016 | SE | 12.10.2016 | SI | 12.10.2016 | SK | 12.10.2016 | TR | 12.10.2016 | BG | 12.01.2017 | GR | 13.01.2017 | PT | 13.02.2017 | IE | 07.05.2017 | LU | 07.05.2017 | [2020/15] |
Former [2019/46] | HU | 07.05.2004 | |
AT | 12.10.2016 | ||
CY | 12.10.2016 | ||
CZ | 12.10.2016 | ||
DK | 12.10.2016 | ||
EE | 12.10.2016 | ||
ES | 12.10.2016 | ||
FI | 12.10.2016 | ||
MC | 12.10.2016 | ||
NL | 12.10.2016 | ||
PL | 12.10.2016 | ||
RO | 12.10.2016 | ||
SE | 12.10.2016 | ||
SI | 12.10.2016 | ||
SK | 12.10.2016 | ||
BG | 12.01.2017 | ||
GR | 13.01.2017 | ||
PT | 13.02.2017 | ||
IE | 07.05.2017 | ||
LU | 07.05.2017 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 07.05.2004 | |
AT | 12.10.2016 | ||
CZ | 12.10.2016 | ||
DK | 12.10.2016 | ||
EE | 12.10.2016 | ||
ES | 12.10.2016 | ||
FI | 12.10.2016 | ||
MC | 12.10.2016 | ||
NL | 12.10.2016 | ||
PL | 12.10.2016 | ||
RO | 12.10.2016 | ||
SE | 12.10.2016 | ||
SI | 12.10.2016 | ||
SK | 12.10.2016 | ||
BG | 12.01.2017 | ||
GR | 13.01.2017 | ||
PT | 13.02.2017 | ||
IE | 07.05.2017 | ||
LU | 07.05.2017 | ||
Former [2018/23] | AT | 12.10.2016 | |
CZ | 12.10.2016 | ||
DK | 12.10.2016 | ||
EE | 12.10.2016 | ||
ES | 12.10.2016 | ||
FI | 12.10.2016 | ||
MC | 12.10.2016 | ||
NL | 12.10.2016 | ||
PL | 12.10.2016 | ||
RO | 12.10.2016 | ||
SE | 12.10.2016 | ||
SI | 12.10.2016 | ||
SK | 12.10.2016 | ||
BG | 12.01.2017 | ||
GR | 13.01.2017 | ||
PT | 13.02.2017 | ||
IE | 07.05.2017 | ||
LU | 07.05.2017 | ||
Former [2018/17] | AT | 12.10.2016 | |
CZ | 12.10.2016 | ||
DK | 12.10.2016 | ||
EE | 12.10.2016 | ||
ES | 12.10.2016 | ||
FI | 12.10.2016 | ||
MC | 12.10.2016 | ||
NL | 12.10.2016 | ||
PL | 12.10.2016 | ||
RO | 12.10.2016 | ||
SE | 12.10.2016 | ||
SI | 12.10.2016 | ||
SK | 12.10.2016 | ||
BG | 12.01.2017 | ||
GR | 13.01.2017 | ||
PT | 13.02.2017 | ||
LU | 07.05.2017 | ||
Former [2018/06] | AT | 12.10.2016 | |
CZ | 12.10.2016 | ||
DK | 12.10.2016 | ||
EE | 12.10.2016 | ||
ES | 12.10.2016 | ||
FI | 12.10.2016 | ||
MC | 12.10.2016 | ||
NL | 12.10.2016 | ||
PL | 12.10.2016 | ||
RO | 12.10.2016 | ||
SE | 12.10.2016 | ||
SI | 12.10.2016 | ||
SK | 12.10.2016 | ||
BG | 12.01.2017 | ||
GR | 13.01.2017 | ||
PT | 13.02.2017 | ||
LU | 31.05.2017 | ||
Former [2017/52] | AT | 12.10.2016 | |
CZ | 12.10.2016 | ||
DK | 12.10.2016 | ||
EE | 12.10.2016 | ||
ES | 12.10.2016 | ||
FI | 12.10.2016 | ||
NL | 12.10.2016 | ||
PL | 12.10.2016 | ||
RO | 12.10.2016 | ||
SE | 12.10.2016 | ||
SI | 12.10.2016 | ||
SK | 12.10.2016 | ||
BG | 12.01.2017 | ||
GR | 13.01.2017 | ||
PT | 13.02.2017 | ||
LU | 31.05.2017 | ||
Former [2017/38] | AT | 12.10.2016 | |
CZ | 12.10.2016 | ||
DK | 12.10.2016 | ||
EE | 12.10.2016 | ||
ES | 12.10.2016 | ||
FI | 12.10.2016 | ||
NL | 12.10.2016 | ||
PL | 12.10.2016 | ||
RO | 12.10.2016 | ||
SE | 12.10.2016 | ||
SK | 12.10.2016 | ||
BG | 12.01.2017 | ||
GR | 13.01.2017 | ||
PT | 13.02.2017 | ||
LU | 31.05.2017 | ||
Former [2017/36] | AT | 12.10.2016 | |
CZ | 12.10.2016 | ||
DK | 12.10.2016 | ||
EE | 12.10.2016 | ||
ES | 12.10.2016 | ||
FI | 12.10.2016 | ||
NL | 12.10.2016 | ||
PL | 12.10.2016 | ||
RO | 12.10.2016 | ||
SE | 12.10.2016 | ||
SK | 12.10.2016 | ||
GR | 13.01.2017 | ||
PT | 13.02.2017 | ||
LU | 31.05.2017 | ||
Former [2017/35] | AT | 12.10.2016 | |
CZ | 12.10.2016 | ||
DK | 12.10.2016 | ||
EE | 12.10.2016 | ||
ES | 12.10.2016 | ||
FI | 12.10.2016 | ||
NL | 12.10.2016 | ||
PL | 12.10.2016 | ||
RO | 12.10.2016 | ||
SE | 12.10.2016 | ||
GR | 13.01.2017 | ||
PT | 13.02.2017 | ||
Former [2017/33] | AT | 12.10.2016 | |
DK | 12.10.2016 | ||
ES | 12.10.2016 | ||
FI | 12.10.2016 | ||
NL | 12.10.2016 | ||
PL | 12.10.2016 | ||
SE | 12.10.2016 | ||
GR | 13.01.2017 | ||
PT | 13.02.2017 | ||
Former [2017/29] | AT | 12.10.2016 | |
ES | 12.10.2016 | ||
FI | 12.10.2016 | ||
NL | 12.10.2016 | ||
PL | 12.10.2016 | ||
SE | 12.10.2016 | ||
GR | 13.01.2017 | ||
PT | 13.02.2017 | Cited in | International search | [X]US5965714 (RYALL ROBERT P [US]) [X] 1-65 * column 1, line 29 - line 33 * * column 2, paragraph LAST * * column 5, paragraph 3 - column 13, line 60 * * examples 7-9; table 1 *; | [X]US2003035806 (D AMBRA ANELLO J [US], et al) [X] 1-14 * examples 1-5 *; | [X] - "DOSE ESCALATION, SAFETY AND IMMUNOGENICITY STUDY OF A TETRAVALENT MENINGOCOCCAL POLYSACCHARIDE DIPHTHERIA CONJUGATE VACCINE IN TODDLERS", PEDIATRIC INFECTIOUS DISEASE JOURNAL, WILLIAMS & WILKINS, BALTIMORE, MD, US, (200210), vol. 21, no. 10, ISSN 0891-3668, pages 978 - 979, XP008015582 [X] 1-65 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1097/00006454-200210000-00019 | [X] - CAMPAGNE G ET AL, "SAFETY AND IMMUNOGENICITY OF THREE DOSES OF A NEISSERIA MENINGITIDIS A + C DIPHTHERIA CONJUGATE VACCINE IN INFANTS FROM NIGER", PEDIATRIC INFECTIOUS DISEASE JOURNAL, WILLIAMS & WILKINS, BALTIMORE, MD, US, (200002), vol. 19, no. 2, ISSN 0891-3668, pages 144 - 150, XP008015581 [X] 1-65 * abstract * * page 144, column R, paragraph 1 * * page 145, column L, paragraph 3; tables 3,4 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1097/00006454-200002000-00013 | [X] - PELTOLA H, "MENINGOCOCCAL VACCINES CURRENT STATUS AND FUTURE POSSIBILITIES", DRUGS, ADIS INTERNATIONAL LTD, AT, (199803), vol. 55, no. 3, ISSN 0012-6667, pages 347 - 366, XP008022620 [X] 1-65 * page 350, column R, paragraph 3 - page 351, column L, paragraph 1 * * page 359, column L, paragraph 3 - page 360, column L * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.2165/00003495-199855030-00003 | [PX] - HARRIS SHANNON L ET AL, "Disparity in functional activity between serum anticapsular antibodies induced in adults by immunization with an investigational group A and C Neisseria meningitidis-diphtheria toxoid conjugate vaccine and by a polysaccharide vaccine.", INFECTION AND IMMUNITY, (200306), vol. 71, no. 6, ISSN 0019-9567, pages 3402 - 3408, XP002309706 [PX] 1,21,45,48-50 * abstract * * page 3403, column L, paragraph 2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1128/IAI.71.6.3402-3408.2003 | [T] - CHIPPAUX J-P ET AL, "Immunogenicity, safety, and memory of different schedules of Neisseria meningitidis A/C-diphtheria toxoid conjugate vaccine in infants in Niger", VACCINE, BUTTERWORTH SCIENTIFIC. GUILDFORD, GB, (20040903), vol. 22, no. 25-26, ISSN 0264-410X, pages 3303 - 3311, XP004526904 [T] 1-65 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.vaccine.2004.02.028 |