Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2005061050 | Global Dossier | 07.07.2005 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US83731904 | 30.04.2004 | US73087303 | 09.12.2003 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2004103469 | Global Dossier | 17.03.2005 | B1 | WO2004103469 | 02.12.2004 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US47126203 | 16.05.2003 | US83524504 | 29.04.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2004103465 | Global Dossier | 02.12.2004 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US47126203 | 16.05.2003 | US83554804 | 29.04.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2004103463 | Global Dossier | 07.04.2005 | B1 | WO2004103463 | 02.12.2004 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US47126203 | 16.05.2003 | US83523304 | 29.04.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2004052459 | Global Dossier | 19.08.2004 | B1 | WO2004052459 | 24.06.2004 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US50394603 | 20.09.2003 | US47126203 | 16.05.2003 | US50394503 | 20.09.2003 | US50785703 | 01.10.2003 | US43185402 | 09.12.2002 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2004052458 | Global Dossier | 10.09.2004 | B1 | WO2004052458 | 24.06.2004 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US50394603 | 20.09.2003 | US47126203 | 16.05.2003 | US50394503 | 20.09.2003 | US50785703 | 01.10.2003 | US43185402 | 09.12.2002 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2004052457 | Global Dossier | 26.08.2004 | B1 | WO2004052457 | 24.06.2004 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US50394603 | 20.09.2003 | US47126203 | 16.05.2003 | US50394503 | 20.09.2003 | US50785703 | 01.10.2003 | US43185402 | 09.12.2002 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2004052456 | Global Dossier | 26.08.2004 | B1 | WO2004052456 | 24.06.2004 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US50394603 | 20.09.2003 | US47126203 | 16.05.2003 | US50394503 | 20.09.2003 | US50785703 | 01.10.2003 | US43185402 | 09.12.2002 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2004052455 | Global Dossier | 02.09.2004 | B1 | WO2004052455 | 24.06.2004 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US50394603 | 20.09.2003 | US47126203 | 16.05.2003 | US50394503 | 20.09.2003 | US50785703 | 01.10.2003 | US43185402 | 09.12.2002 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2004052454 | Global Dossier | 19.08.2004 | B1 | WO2004052454 | 24.06.2004 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US50394603 | 20.09.2003 | US47126203 | 16.05.2003 | US50394503 | 20.09.2003 | US50785703 | 01.10.2003 | US43185402 | 09.12.2002 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2004052453 | Global Dossier | 02.09.2004 | B1 | WO2004052453 | 24.06.2004 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US50394603 | 20.09.2003 | US47126203 | 16.05.2003 | US50394503 | 20.09.2003 | US50785703 | 01.10.2003 | US43185402 | 09.12.2002 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2004052452 | Global Dossier | 19.08.2004 | B1 | WO2004052452 | 24.06.2004 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US50394603 | 20.09.2003 | US47126203 | 16.05.2003 | US50394503 | 20.09.2003 | US50785703 | 01.10.2003 | US43185402 | 09.12.2002 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8666497 | Global Dossier | 04.03.2014 | B2 | US2011054563 | 03.03.2011 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US50394603 | 20.09.2003 | US73169903 | 09.12.2003 | US47126203 | 16.05.2003 | US50394503 | 20.09.2003 | US50785703 | 01.10.2003 | US94280610 | 09.11.2010 | US43185402 | 09.12.2002 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8086313 | Global Dossier | 27.12.2011 | B2 | US2009292327 | 26.11.2009 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US83731904 | 30.04.2004 | US53625809 | 05.08.2009 | US50394603 | 20.09.2003 | US47126203 | 16.05.2003 | US50394503 | 20.09.2003 | US73087303 | 09.12.2003 | US50785703 | 01.10.2003 | US43185402 | 09.12.2002 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2008065173 | Global Dossier | 13.03.2008 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US93939007 | 13.11.2007 | US47126203 | 16.05.2003 | US83554804 | 29.04.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7881796 | Global Dossier | 01.02.2011 | B2 | US2008021511 | 24.01.2008 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US47126203 | 16.05.2003 | US83133307 | 31.07.2007 | US83523304 | 29.04.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2007185539 | Global Dossier | 09.08.2007 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US50394603 | 20.09.2003 | US47126203 | 16.05.2003 | US50394503 | 20.09.2003 | US73087303 | 09.12.2003 | US50785703 | 01.10.2003 | US43185402 | 09.12.2002 | US73582607 | 16.04.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2006195156 | Global Dossier | 31.08.2006 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US47126203 | 16.05.2003 | US50394503 | 20.09.2003 | US40407006 | 13.04.2006 | US83523204 | 29.04.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2006184220 | Global Dossier | 17.08.2006 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US47126203 | 16.05.2003 | US50394503 | 20.09.2003 | US40358506 | 13.04.2006 | US83523204 | 29.04.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2006184210 | Global Dossier | 17.08.2006 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US47126203 | 16.05.2003 | US50394503 | 20.09.2003 | US40357506 | 13.04.2006 | US83523204 | 29.04.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7596408 | Global Dossier | 29.09.2009 | B2 | US2005004620 | 06.01.2005 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US83731904 | 30.04.2004 | US50394603 | 20.09.2003 | US47126203 | 16.05.2003 | US50394503 | 20.09.2003 | US73087303 | 09.12.2003 | US50785703 | 01.10.2003 | US43185402 | 09.12.2002 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7317947 | Global Dossier | 08.01.2008 | B2 | US2005004619 | 06.01.2005 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US47126203 | 16.05.2003 | US83554804 | 29.04.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7263401 | Global Dossier | 28.08.2007 | B2 | US2005004618 | 06.01.2005 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US47126203 | 16.05.2003 | US83523304 | 29.04.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2005003268 | Global Dossier | 06.01.2005 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US47126203 | 16.05.2003 | US83524504 | 29.04.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7392089 | Global Dossier | 24.06.2008 | B2 | US2004176819 | 09.09.2004 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US50394603 | 20.09.2003 | US47126203 | 16.05.2003 | US50394503 | 20.09.2003 | US73188103 | 09.12.2003 | US50785703 | 01.10.2003 | US43185402 | 09.12.2002 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2004176818 | Global Dossier | 09.09.2004 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US50394603 | 20.09.2003 | US47126203 | 16.05.2003 | US50394503 | 20.09.2003 | US50785703 | 01.10.2003 | US73186903 | 09.12.2003 | US43185402 | 09.12.2002 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7212864 | Global Dossier | 01.05.2007 | B2 | US2004176817 | 09.09.2004 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US50394603 | 20.09.2003 | US47126203 | 16.05.2003 | US50394503 | 20.09.2003 | US73163803 | 09.12.2003 | US50785703 | 01.10.2003 | US43185402 | 09.12.2002 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2004176816 | Global Dossier | 09.09.2004 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US73087803 | 09.12.2003 | US50394603 | 20.09.2003 | US47126203 | 16.05.2003 | US50394503 | 20.09.2003 | US50785703 | 01.10.2003 | US43185402 | 09.12.2002 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8457744 | Global Dossier | 04.06.2013 | B2 | US2004176815 | 09.09.2004 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US50394603 | 20.09.2003 | US47126203 | 16.05.2003 | US50394503 | 20.09.2003 | US50785703 | 01.10.2003 | US43185402 | 09.12.2002 | US73087703 | 09.12.2003 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7242982 | Global Dossier | 10.07.2007 | B2 | US2004176814 | 09.09.2004 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US50394603 | 20.09.2003 | US47126203 | 16.05.2003 | US50394503 | 20.09.2003 | US73087303 | 09.12.2003 | US50785703 | 01.10.2003 | US43185402 | 09.12.2002 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7529586 | Global Dossier | 05.05.2009 | B2 | US2004176673 | 09.09.2004 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US73186703 | 09.12.2003 | US50394603 | 20.09.2003 | US47126203 | 16.05.2003 | US50394503 | 20.09.2003 | US50785703 | 01.10.2003 | US43185402 | 09.12.2002 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8397732 | Global Dossier | 19.03.2013 | B2 | US2004173221 | 09.09.2004 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US50394603 | 20.09.2003 | US47126203 | 16.05.2003 | US50394503 | 20.09.2003 | US73186803 | 09.12.2003 | US50785703 | 01.10.2003 | US43185402 | 09.12.2002 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7848817 | Global Dossier | 07.12.2010 | B2 | US2004172090 | 02.09.2004 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US50394603 | 20.09.2003 | US73169903 | 09.12.2003 | US47126203 | 16.05.2003 | US50394503 | 20.09.2003 | US50785703 | 01.10.2003 | US43185402 | 09.12.2002 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1626773 | Global Dossier | 11.03.2009 | B1 | EP1626773 | 22.02.2006 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US47126203 | 16.05.2003 | WO2004US15084 | 12.05.2004 | US83554804 | 29.04.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1626769 | Global Dossier | 22.02.2006 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2004US14862 | 12.05.2004 | US47126203 | 16.05.2003 | US50394503 | 20.09.2003 | US83523204 | 29.04.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1624927 | Global Dossier | 05.05.2010 | B1 | EP1624927 | 15.02.2006 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US47126203 | 16.05.2003 | US50394503 | 20.09.2003 | US83523204 | 29.04.2004 | WO2004US14806 | 12.05.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1624923 | Global Dossier | 29.09.2010 | B1 | EP1624923 | 15.02.2006 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US47126203 | 16.05.2003 | WO2004US14804 | 12.05.2004 | US83523304 | 29.04.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1578500 | Global Dossier | 28.09.2005 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US50394603 | 20.09.2003 | US47126203 | 16.05.2003 | US50394503 | 20.09.2003 | US50785703 | 01.10.2003 | US0338982 | 09.12.2003 | US43185402 | 09.12.2002 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1578499 | Global Dossier | 28.09.2005 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US50394603 | 20.09.2003 | US47126203 | 16.05.2003 | US50394503 | 20.09.2003 | US50785703 | 01.10.2003 | US0338981 | 09.12.2003 | US43185402 | 09.12.2002 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1578498 | Global Dossier | 28.09.2005 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US0338928 | 09.12.2003 | US50394603 | 20.09.2003 | US47126203 | 16.05.2003 | US50394503 | 20.09.2003 | US50785703 | 01.10.2003 | US43185402 | 09.12.2002 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1578497 | Global Dossier | 21.04.2010 | B1 | EP1578497 | 28.09.2005 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US0338927 | 09.12.2003 | US50394603 | 20.09.2003 | US47126203 | 16.05.2003 | US50394503 | 20.09.2003 | US50785703 | 01.10.2003 | US43185402 | 09.12.2002 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1578496 | Global Dossier | 28.09.2005 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US0338926 | 09.12.2003 | US50394603 | 20.09.2003 | US47126203 | 16.05.2003 | US50394503 | 20.09.2003 | US50785703 | 01.10.2003 | US43185402 | 09.12.2002 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1578495 | Global Dossier | 02.06.2010 | B1 | EP1578495 | 28.09.2005 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US0338938 | 09.12.2003 | US50394603 | 20.09.2003 | US47126203 | 16.05.2003 | US50394503 | 20.09.2003 | US50785703 | 01.10.2003 | US43185402 | 09.12.2002 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1578494 | Global Dossier | 26.05.2010 | B1 | EP1578494 | 28.09.2005 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US50394603 | 20.09.2003 | US47126203 | 16.05.2003 | US50394503 | 20.09.2003 | US0338940 | 09.12.2003 | US50785703 | 01.10.2003 | US43185402 | 09.12.2002 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1578493 | Global Dossier | 28.09.2005 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US0338939 | 09.12.2003 | US50394603 | 20.09.2003 | US47126203 | 16.05.2003 | US50394503 | 20.09.2003 | US50785703 | 01.10.2003 | US43185402 | 09.12.2002 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2003297735 | Global Dossier | 30.06.2004 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US50394603 | 20.09.2003 | US47126203 | 16.05.2003 | US50394503 | 20.09.2003 | US50785703 | 01.10.2003 | US0338981 | 09.12.2003 | US43185402 | 09.12.2002 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2003297725 | Global Dossier | 30.06.2004 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US0338928 | 09.12.2003 | US50394603 | 20.09.2003 | US47126203 | 16.05.2003 | US50394503 | 20.09.2003 | US50785703 | 01.10.2003 | US43185402 | 09.12.2002 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2003297724 | Global Dossier | 30.06.2004 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US0338927 | 09.12.2003 | US50394603 | 20.09.2003 | US47126203 | 16.05.2003 | US50394503 | 20.09.2003 | US50785703 | 01.10.2003 | US43185402 | 09.12.2002 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2003297723 | Global Dossier | 30.06.2004 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US0338926 | 09.12.2003 | US50394603 | 20.09.2003 | US47126203 | 16.05.2003 | US50394503 | 20.09.2003 | US50785703 | 01.10.2003 | US43185402 | 09.12.2002 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2003296340 | Global Dossier | 30.06.2004 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US50394603 | 20.09.2003 | US47126203 | 16.05.2003 | US50394503 | 20.09.2003 | US50785703 | 01.10.2003 | US0338982 | 09.12.2003 | US43185402 | 09.12.2002 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2003294596 | Global Dossier | 30.06.2004 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US50394603 | 20.09.2003 | US47126203 | 16.05.2003 | US50394503 | 20.09.2003 | US0338940 | 09.12.2003 | US50785703 | 01.10.2003 | US43185402 | 09.12.2002 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2003294595 | Global Dossier | 30.06.2004 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US0338939 | 09.12.2003 | US50394603 | 20.09.2003 | US47126203 | 16.05.2003 | US50394503 | 20.09.2003 | US50785703 | 01.10.2003 | US43185402 | 09.12.2002 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2003293454 | Global Dossier | 30.06.2004 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US0338938 | 09.12.2003 | US50394603 | 20.09.2003 | US47126203 | 16.05.2003 | US50394503 | 20.09.2003 | US50785703 | 01.10.2003 | US43185402 | 09.12.2002 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1626774 | Global Dossier | 22.02.2006 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US47126203 | 16.05.2003 | US50394503 | 20.09.2003 | WO2004US14803 | 12.05.2004 | US83523204 | 29.04.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ATE424885T | 15.03.2009 | T1 | Priority number | Date | US47126203 | 16.05.2003 | US83554804 | 29.04.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ATE464932T | 15.05.2010 | T1 | Priority number | Date | US0338927 | 09.12.2003 | US50394603 | 20.09.2003 | US47126203 | 16.05.2003 | US50394503 | 20.09.2003 | US50785703 | 01.10.2003 | US43185402 | 09.12.2002 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ATE466622T | 15.05.2010 | T1 | Priority number | Date | US47126203 | 16.05.2003 | US50394503 | 20.09.2003 | US83523204 | 29.04.2004 | WO2004US14806 | 12.05.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ATE468883T | 15.06.2010 | T1 | Priority number | Date | US50394603 | 20.09.2003 | US47126203 | 16.05.2003 | US50394503 | 20.09.2003 | US0338940 | 09.12.2003 | US50785703 | 01.10.2003 | US43185402 | 09.12.2002 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ATE469670T | 15.06.2010 | T1 | Priority number | Date | US0338938 | 09.12.2003 | US50394603 | 20.09.2003 | US47126203 | 16.05.2003 | US50394503 | 20.09.2003 | US50785703 | 01.10.2003 | US43185402 | 09.12.2002 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ATE482741T | 15.10.2010 | T1 | Priority number | Date | US47126203 | 16.05.2003 | WO2004US14804 | 12.05.2004 | US83523304 | 29.04.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE602004019908D1 | 23.04.2009 | D1 | Priority number | Date | US47126203 | 16.05.2003 | WO2004US15084 | 12.05.2004 | US83554804 | 29.04.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE602004027025D1 | 17.06.2010 | D1 | Priority number | Date | US47126203 | 16.05.2003 | US50394503 | 20.09.2003 | US83523204 | 29.04.2004 | WO2004US14806 | 12.05.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE602004029351D1 | 11.11.2010 | D1 | Priority number | Date | US47126203 | 16.05.2003 | WO2004US14804 | 12.05.2004 | US83523304 | 29.04.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE60332272D1 | 02.06.2010 | D1 | Priority number | Date | US0338927 | 09.12.2003 | US50394603 | 20.09.2003 | US47126203 | 16.05.2003 | US50394503 | 20.09.2003 | US50785703 | 01.10.2003 | US43185402 | 09.12.2002 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE60332764D1 | 08.07.2010 | D1 | Priority number | Date | US50394603 | 20.09.2003 | US47126203 | 16.05.2003 | US50394503 | 20.09.2003 | US0338940 | 09.12.2003 | US50785703 | 01.10.2003 | US43185402 | 09.12.2002 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE60332871D1 | 15.07.2010 | D1 | Priority number | Date | US0338938 | 09.12.2003 | US50394603 | 20.09.2003 | US47126203 | 16.05.2003 | US50394503 | 20.09.2003 | US50785703 | 01.10.2003 | US43185402 | 09.12.2002 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2322266T | 18.06.2009 | T3 | Priority number | Date | US47126203 | 16.05.2003 | US83554804 | 29.04.2004 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2004103468 | Global Dossier | 02.12.2004 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US47126203 | 16.05.2003 | US50394503 | 20.09.2003 | US83523204 | 29.04.2004 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2004103467 | Global Dossier | 02.12.2004 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US47126203 | 16.05.2003 | US50394503 | 20.09.2003 | US83523204 | 29.04.2004 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2004103466 | Global Dossier | 02.12.2004 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US47126203 | 16.05.2003 | US50394503 | 20.09.2003 | US83523204 | 29.04.2004 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2004103462 | Global Dossier | 17.02.2005 | B1 | WO2004103462 | 02.12.2004 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US47126203 | 16.05.2003 | US50394503 | 20.09.2003 | US83523204 | 29.04.2004 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2004103460 | Global Dossier | 02.12.2004 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US47126203 | 16.05.2003 | US50394503 | 20.09.2003 | US83523204 | 29.04.2004 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2005004637 | Global Dossier | 06.01.2005 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US47126203 | 16.05.2003 | US50394503 | 20.09.2003 | US83523204 | 29.04.2004 |