EP1626774 - IMPLANTABLE MEDICAL DEVICE WITH GRIPPABLE ACCESS STRUCTURE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 06.08.2010 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.08.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 08.09.2010 [2010/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Medtronic, Inc. 710 Medtronic Parkway Minneapolis, MN 55432-5604 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2008/41] | For all designated states MEDTRONIC, INC. 710 Medtronic Parkway Minneapolis MN 55432-5604 / US | ||
Former [2006/08] | For all designated states MEDTRONIC, INC. 710 Medtronic Parkway NE Minneapolis, Minnesota 55432-5604 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SINGHAL, Ruchika 17 South First Street, Apartment A1005 Minneapolis, MN 55401 / US | 02 /
WAHLSTRAND, Carl D. 6347 Langer Lane Lino Lakes, MN 55038 / US | 03 /
SKIME, Robert M. 2357 132nd Avenue N.W. Coon Rapids, MN 55448 / US | 04 /
SHARAN, Ashwini 11 Yearling Chase Mt. Laurel, NJ 08054 / US | [2006/08] | Representative(s) | Hughes, Andrea Michelle Dehns St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2006/08] | Hughes, Andrea Michelle Frank B. Dehn & Co., European Patent Attorneys, 179 Queen Victoria Street London EC4V 4EL / GB | Application number, filing date | 04751948.3 | 12.05.2004 | [2006/08] | WO2004US14803 | Priority number, date | US20030471262P | 16.05.2003 Original published format: US 471262 P | US20030503945P | 20.09.2003 Original published format: US 503945 P | US20040835232 | 29.04.2004 Original published format: US 835232 | [2006/08] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004103467 | Date: | 02.12.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/49] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1626774 | Date: | 22.02.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.12.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/08] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 02.12.2004 | Classification | IPC: | A61N1/36, A61N1/375 | [2006/08] | CPC: |
A61N1/37514 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/08] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | IMPLANTIERBARE MEDIZINISCHE VORRICHTUNG MIT GRIFFBARER ZUGRIFFSTRUKTUR | [2006/08] | English: | IMPLANTABLE MEDICAL DEVICE WITH GRIPPABLE ACCESS STRUCTURE | [2006/08] | French: | DISPOSITIF MEDICAL IMPLANTABLE AVEC STRUCTURE D'ACCES PREHENSIBLE | [2006/08] | Entry into regional phase | 12.12.2005 | National basic fee paid | 12.12.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.12.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.12.2004 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 12.12.2005 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.12.2005 | Examination requested [2006/08] | 20.11.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.03.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.11.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.03.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/36] | 20.04.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2010/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 07.05.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2010 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XA]WO0110369 (UNIV MELBOURNE [AU], et al) [X] 10,11 * pages 3-4; figure 1; claim 1 * [A] 1-9; | [XA]US6308101 (FALTYS MICHAEL A [US], et al) [X] 10,11 * column 6, line 20 - column 10, line 60 *[A] 1-9; | [Y]US2002013612 (WHITEHURST TODD K [US]) [Y] 1,5,6,8,10 * paragraphs [0065] - [0067]; figure 5 *; | [Y]WO03026739 (VERTIS NEUROSCIENCE INC [US], et al) [Y] 1,5,6,8,10 * paragraph [0142]; figure 37 *; | [XA]US6560486 (OSORIO IVAN [US], et al) [X] 10,11 * abstract * [A] 1-9 |