EP1623195 - INTERFERENCE AND NOISE ESTIMATION IN AN OFDM SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.09.2019 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 12.10.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 06.06.2018 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 14.07.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.05.2021 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 30.06.2021 [2021/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states QUALCOMM INCORPORATED 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, CA 92121 / US | [2018/46] |
Former [2006/06] | For all designated states QUALCOMM INCORPORATED 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, California 92121 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SUTIVONG, Arak 12 Soi Prasatsuk, Yen-A-Kat Road Bangkok / TH | 02 /
NAGUIB, Ayman, Fawzy 991 Cranberry Drive Cupertino, CA 95014 / US | 03 /
AGRAWAL, Avneesh 7891 Doug Hill, 29 San Diego, CA 92127 / US | [2006/06] | Representative(s) | Tomkins & Co 5 Dartmouth Road Dublin 6 / IE | [2018/46] |
Former [2014/46] | Catesby, Olivia Joanne, et al Tomkins & Co. 5 Dartmouth Road Dublin 6 / IE | ||
Former [2006/06] | Gates, Marie Christina Esther, et al Tomkins & Co. 5 Dartmouth Road Dublin 6 / IE | Application number, filing date | 04752264.4 | 14.05.2004 | [2006/06] | WO2004US15204 | Priority number, date | US20030470724P | 14.05.2003 Original published format: US 470724 P | US20040809538 | 24.03.2004 Original published format: US 809538 | [2006/06] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2004104530 | Date: | 02.12.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/49] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1623195 | Date: | 08.02.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.12.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/06] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1623195 | Date: | 14.11.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/46] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 09.02.2006 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.07.2011 | Classification | IPC: | G01H1/00 | [2006/06] | CPC: |
H04L1/20 (EP,KR,US);
H04B17/336 (KR);
H04L27/2647 (EP,KR,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2018/46] |
Former [2006/06] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | STÖRUNGS- UND RAUSCHSCHÄTZUNG IN EINEM OFDM-SYSTEM | [2006/06] | English: | INTERFERENCE AND NOISE ESTIMATION IN AN OFDM SYSTEM | [2006/06] | French: | ESTIMATION DES INTERFERENCES ET DU BRUIT DANS UN SYSTEME MROF | [2006/06] | Entry into regional phase | 14.11.2005 | National basic fee paid | 14.11.2005 | Search fee paid | 14.11.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.11.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.11.2004 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 14.11.2005 | Examination requested [2006/06] | 17.10.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.07.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.11.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.06.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.10.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 04.10.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 04.10.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 17.07.2017 | Opposition(s) | 15.08.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 07.05.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 10.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 21.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 26.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 26.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 07.05.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 30.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 05.05.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | 07.05.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 15 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 14.11.2018 | CY | 14.11.2018 | CZ | 14.11.2018 | DK | 14.11.2018 | EE | 14.11.2018 | MC | 14.11.2018 | PL | 14.11.2018 | RO | 14.11.2018 | SE | 14.11.2018 | SI | 14.11.2018 | SK | 14.11.2018 | TR | 14.11.2018 | BG | 14.02.2019 | GR | 15.02.2019 | PT | 14.03.2019 | IE | 14.05.2019 | LU | 14.05.2019 | BE | 31.05.2019 | CH | 31.05.2019 | LI | 31.05.2019 | [2021/26] |
Former [2020/26] | AT | 14.11.2018 | |
CZ | 14.11.2018 | ||
DK | 14.11.2018 | ||
EE | 14.11.2018 | ||
MC | 14.11.2018 | ||
PL | 14.11.2018 | ||
RO | 14.11.2018 | ||
SE | 14.11.2018 | ||
SI | 14.11.2018 | ||
SK | 14.11.2018 | ||
TR | 14.11.2018 | ||
BG | 14.02.2019 | ||
GR | 15.02.2019 | ||
PT | 14.03.2019 | ||
IE | 14.05.2019 | ||
LU | 14.05.2019 | ||
BE | 31.05.2019 | ||
CH | 31.05.2019 | ||
LI | 31.05.2019 | ||
Former [2020/21] | AT | 14.11.2018 | |
CZ | 14.11.2018 | ||
DK | 14.11.2018 | ||
EE | 14.11.2018 | ||
MC | 14.11.2018 | ||
PL | 14.11.2018 | ||
RO | 14.11.2018 | ||
SE | 14.11.2018 | ||
SI | 14.11.2018 | ||
SK | 14.11.2018 | ||
TR | 14.11.2018 | ||
BG | 14.02.2019 | ||
GR | 15.02.2019 | ||
PT | 14.03.2019 | ||
IE | 14.05.2019 | ||
LU | 14.05.2019 | ||
CH | 31.05.2019 | ||
LI | 31.05.2019 | ||
Former [2020/17] | AT | 14.11.2018 | |
CZ | 14.11.2018 | ||
DK | 14.11.2018 | ||
EE | 14.11.2018 | ||
MC | 14.11.2018 | ||
PL | 14.11.2018 | ||
RO | 14.11.2018 | ||
SE | 14.11.2018 | ||
SI | 14.11.2018 | ||
SK | 14.11.2018 | ||
TR | 14.11.2018 | ||
BG | 14.02.2019 | ||
GR | 15.02.2019 | ||
PT | 14.03.2019 | ||
LU | 14.05.2019 | ||
CH | 31.05.2019 | ||
LI | 31.05.2019 | ||
Former [2020/11] | AT | 14.11.2018 | |
CZ | 14.11.2018 | ||
DK | 14.11.2018 | ||
EE | 14.11.2018 | ||
MC | 14.11.2018 | ||
PL | 14.11.2018 | ||
RO | 14.11.2018 | ||
SE | 14.11.2018 | ||
SI | 14.11.2018 | ||
SK | 14.11.2018 | ||
BG | 14.02.2019 | ||
GR | 15.02.2019 | ||
PT | 14.03.2019 | ||
LU | 14.05.2019 | ||
CH | 31.05.2019 | ||
LI | 31.05.2019 | ||
Former [2020/07] | AT | 14.11.2018 | |
CZ | 14.11.2018 | ||
DK | 14.11.2018 | ||
EE | 14.11.2018 | ||
MC | 14.11.2018 | ||
PL | 14.11.2018 | ||
RO | 14.11.2018 | ||
SE | 14.11.2018 | ||
SI | 14.11.2018 | ||
SK | 14.11.2018 | ||
BG | 14.02.2019 | ||
GR | 15.02.2019 | ||
PT | 14.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/50] | AT | 14.11.2018 | |
CZ | 14.11.2018 | ||
DK | 14.11.2018 | ||
EE | 14.11.2018 | ||
PL | 14.11.2018 | ||
RO | 14.11.2018 | ||
SE | 14.11.2018 | ||
SI | 14.11.2018 | ||
SK | 14.11.2018 | ||
BG | 14.02.2019 | ||
GR | 15.02.2019 | ||
PT | 14.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/40] | AT | 14.11.2018 | |
CZ | 14.11.2018 | ||
DK | 14.11.2018 | ||
EE | 14.11.2018 | ||
PL | 14.11.2018 | ||
RO | 14.11.2018 | ||
SE | 14.11.2018 | ||
SK | 14.11.2018 | ||
BG | 14.02.2019 | ||
GR | 15.02.2019 | ||
PT | 14.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/37] | AT | 14.11.2018 | |
CZ | 14.11.2018 | ||
DK | 14.11.2018 | ||
EE | 14.11.2018 | ||
PL | 14.11.2018 | ||
RO | 14.11.2018 | ||
SE | 14.11.2018 | ||
BG | 14.02.2019 | ||
GR | 15.02.2019 | ||
PT | 14.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/35] | AT | 14.11.2018 | |
CZ | 14.11.2018 | ||
DK | 14.11.2018 | ||
PL | 14.11.2018 | ||
SE | 14.11.2018 | ||
BG | 14.02.2019 | ||
GR | 15.02.2019 | ||
PT | 14.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/34] | AT | 14.11.2018 | |
DK | 14.11.2018 | ||
SE | 14.11.2018 | ||
BG | 14.02.2019 | ||
GR | 15.02.2019 | ||
PT | 14.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/26] | AT | 14.11.2018 | |
SE | 14.11.2018 | ||
BG | 14.02.2019 | ||
GR | 15.02.2019 | ||
PT | 14.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/24] | AT | 14.11.2018 | |
SE | 14.11.2018 | ||
BG | 14.02.2019 | ||
GR | 15.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/23] | AT | 14.11.2018 | |
BG | 14.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/22] | BG | 14.02.2019 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US6456653 (SAYEED ZULFIQUAR [US]) [X] 1-20 * column 1 - column 3; figures 1-4c ** column 6 * | International search | [Y]US2002191677 (CHEN HUNG-KUN [TW], et al); | [X]US2003039317 (TAYLOR DOUGLAS HAMILTON [CA], et al); | [Y]US2003058953 (LEE GOON SEOP [KR], et al); | [Y]US2003072392 (BEADLE EDWARD R [US], et al); | [Y]US2003081538 (WALTON JAY R [US], et al); | [Y]US2003087651 (RAUSCHMAYER DENNIS [US]); | [Y]US6563885 (MAGEE DAVID PATRICK [US], et al) | by applicant | US6456653 |