28.01.2011 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 02.03.2011 [2011/09] |
19.02.2010 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 24.03.2010 [2010/12] |
19.02.2010 |
Change - English title |
published on 24.03.2010 [2010/12] |
29.01.2010 |
Change - designated states |
published on 03.03.2010 [2010/09] |
28.01.2010 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
28.01.2010 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
11.09.2009 |
Change - inventor |
published on 14.10.2009 [2009/42] |
11.09.2009 |
Change - German title |
published on 14.10.2009 [2009/42] |
08.09.2009 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
04.09.2009 |
Change - French title |
published on 07.10.2009 [2009/41] |
12.08.2009 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
20.06.2009 |
Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
29.05.2009 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
26.01.2009 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
27.06.2008 |
Change - representative |
published on 30.07.2008 [2008/31] |
08.04.2008 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
24.08.2007 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
06.06.2007 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
06.04.2007 |
First examination report |
|
31.03.2007 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
07.12.2006 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
04.08.2006 |
Change - designated states |
published on 06.09.2006 [2006/36] |
04.08.2006 |
Change - extension states |
published on 06.09.2006 [2006/36] |
21.07.2006 |
First examination report |
|
15.07.2006 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
09.06.2006 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
06.01.2006 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 22.02.2006 [2006/08] |
06.01.2006 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 22.02.2006 [2006/08] |
08.11.2005 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
03.11.2005 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
28.07.2005 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
07.01.2005 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
26.10.2004 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
29.09.2004 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|